EP1997181 - PEM HAVING IMPROVED INERTNESS AGAINST PEROXIDE RADICALS AND CORRESPONDING MEMBRANE ELECTRODE ASSEMBLIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.07.2014 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/49] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | ||
Former [2008/30] | For all designated states E.I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAIFORD, Kimberly, Gheysen 28 Stonebridge Drive Hockessin, Delaware 19707 / US | 02 /
SIDDIQUI, Junaid, Ahmed 5720 Turkey Oak Road Richmond, Virginia 23237 / US | [2008/49] | Representative(s) | Hirsch, Marc-Roger Hirsch & Associés 58, Avenue Marceau 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/36] | Hirsch, Marc-Roger Hirsch & Associés 58, Avenue Marceau 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2008/49] | Hirsch, Marc-Roger Cabinet Hirsch & Associates Law Office 58, avenue Marceau 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 07752620.0 | 07.03.2007 | [2008/49] | WO2007US05934 | Priority number, date | US20060782134P | 13.03.2006 Original published format: US 782134 P | [2008/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007108950 | Date: | 27.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/39] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1997181 | Date: | 03.12.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.09.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1997181 | Date: | 04.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/92, H01M8/10, H01M4/86, H01M4/88, H01M4/90 | [2013/18] | CPC: |
H01M8/1004 (EP,US);
H01M4/86 (KR);
C08J5/22 (KR);
H01M4/8605 (EP,US);
H01M4/88 (KR);
H01M4/881 (EP,US);
H01M4/8846 (EP,US);
H01M4/8857 (EP,US);
H01M4/90 (EP,US);
H01M4/9016 (EP,US);
H01M4/92 (KR);
H01M4/921 (EP,US);
H01M8/0289 (EP,US);
H01M8/1023 (EP,US);
H01M8/1039 (EP,US);
H01M8/1051 (EP,US);
H01M8/1058 (EP,US);
H01M2300/0082 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2008/49] | H01M8/10, H01M8/06, H01M4/86, H01M4/88, H01M4/90 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/49] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PEM MIT ERHÖHTER INERTHEIT GEGENÜBER PEROXIDRADIKALEN UND ENTSPRECHENDE MEMBRANELEKTRODENANORDNUNGEN | [2013/18] | English: | PEM HAVING IMPROVED INERTNESS AGAINST PEROXIDE RADICALS AND CORRESPONDING MEMBRANE ELECTRODE ASSEMBLIES | [2008/49] | French: | MEMBRANE ECHANGEUSE DE PROTONS STABLE VIS-À-VIS DES RADICAUX PEROXYDE ET ENSEMBLE ELECTRODE DE MEMBRANE | [2013/18] |
Former [2008/49] | PEM MIT ERHÖHTER TRÄGHEIT GEGENÜBER PEROXIDRADIKALEN UND ENTSPRECHENDE MEMBRANELEKTRODENANORDNUNGEN | ||
Former [2008/49] | MEMBRANE A ECHANGE DE PROTONS STABLE ET ENSEMBLE ELECTRODE DE MEMBRANE | Entry into regional phase | 15.09.2008 | National basic fee paid | 15.09.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.09.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/49] | 24.11.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.09.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 10.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.11.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.05.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.07.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 23.07.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP11151346.1 / EP2362476 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.01.2009 | Opposition(s) | 05.06.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/33] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 10.11.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 10.11.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.03.2007 | AT | 04.09.2013 | BE | 04.09.2013 | BG | 04.09.2013 | CY | 04.09.2013 | CZ | 04.09.2013 | DK | 04.09.2013 | EE | 04.09.2013 | ES | 04.09.2013 | FI | 04.09.2013 | IT | 04.09.2013 | LT | 04.09.2013 | LV | 04.09.2013 | MC | 04.09.2013 | MT | 04.09.2013 | NL | 04.09.2013 | PL | 04.09.2013 | RO | 04.09.2013 | SE | 04.09.2013 | SI | 04.09.2013 | SK | 04.09.2013 | TR | 04.09.2013 | GR | 05.12.2013 | IS | 04.01.2014 | PT | 06.01.2014 | IE | 07.03.2014 | LU | 07.03.2014 | CH | 31.03.2014 | LI | 31.03.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 07.03.2007 | |
AT | 04.09.2013 | ||
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
BG | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
DK | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
ES | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
IT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
MC | 04.09.2013 | ||
MT | 04.09.2013 | ||
NL | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
IE | 07.03.2014 | ||
LU | 07.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/27] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
BG | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
DK | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
ES | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
IT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
MC | 04.09.2013 | ||
MT | 04.09.2013 | ||
NL | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
IE | 07.03.2014 | ||
LU | 07.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
BG | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
DK | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
ES | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
IT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
MT | 04.09.2013 | ||
NL | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
IE | 07.03.2014 | ||
LU | 07.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
DK | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
ES | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
IT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
MT | 04.09.2013 | ||
NL | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
IE | 07.03.2014 | ||
LU | 07.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
DK | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
ES | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
IT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
NL | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
IE | 07.03.2014 | ||
LU | 07.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/07] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
DK | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
ES | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
IT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
NL | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
IE | 07.03.2014 | ||
LU | 07.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
DK | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
ES | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
IT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
NL | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
LU | 07.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
DK | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
ES | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
IT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
NL | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/38] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
ES | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
IT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
NL | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
ES | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
NL | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
ES | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
NL | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
NL | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
NL | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | CY | 19.06.2013 | |
AT | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CY | 19.06.2013 | |
AT | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CY | 19.06.2013 | |
AT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 04.09.2013 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2005071779 (DU PONT [US], et al) [A] 1-41 * examples 1-9 *; | [A]EP1271682 (BASF AG [DE]) [A] 1-41 * paragraphs [0012] - [0014] - [0022] - [0025] *; | [A]US2004043283 (CIPOLLINI NED E [US], et al) [A] 1-41 * paragraph [0027] * * claims 1,2,4 *; | [A]DE19946694 (AISIN SEIKI [JP]) [A] 1-41 * claims 1-4 * * examples 1,2,4,5 *; | [A]JP2001118591 (TOYOTA CENTRAL RES & DEV) [A] 1-41 * abstract * * paragraph [0040] *; | [A]US2006019140 (KAWAZOE HISAO [JP], et al) [A] 1-41 * paragraphs [0004] , [0016] , [0020] , [0050] * * examples 1-11 *; | [A]US2005136308 (ANDREWS NEIL R [CA], et al) [A] 1-41 * paragraphs [0010] , [0015] , [0021] - [0023] - [0054] - [0058] *; | [A]EP1302522 (DUPONT AIR PROD NANOMATERIALS [US]) [A] 10,22,29,34 * paragraphs [0012] , [0013] * * example 1 * | Examination | EP1997173 | WO03078056 | US2005095355 | by applicant | EP1271682 | DE19946694 | WO03078056 | US2005095355 | US5547551 | US6110333 |