Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5049341B | Global Dossier | 17.10.2012 | B2 | JP2009539177 | 12.11.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US42199606 | 02.06.2006 | WO2007US06598 | 15.03.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2007257446B | Global Dossier | 22.09.2011 | B2 | AU2007257446 | 13.12.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US42199606 | 02.06.2006 | WO2007US06598 | 15.03.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2033099 | Global Dossier | 15.02.2017 | B1 | EP2033099 | 05.12.2012 | A4 | EP2033099 | 11.03.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US42199606 | 02.06.2006 | WO2007US06598 | 15.03.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0712431 | 10.07.2012 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US42199606 | 02.06.2006 | WO2007US06598 | 15.03.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2652221 | 29.04.2014 | C | CA2652221 | 13.12.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US42199606 | 02.06.2006 | WO2007US06598 | 15.03.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101460933B | 28.03.2012 | B | CN101460933 | 17.06.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US42199606 | 02.06.2006 | WO2007US06598 | 15.03.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2008015225 | 12.12.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US42199606 | 02.06.2006 | WO2007US06598 | 15.03.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007142715 | Global Dossier | 13.12.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US42199606 | 02.06.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7730538 | Global Dossier | 01.06.2010 | B2 | US2007283438 | 06.12.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US42199606 | 02.06.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101153031B | Global Dossier | 04.06.2012 | B1 | KR20090014367 | 10.02.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US42199606 | 02.06.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | MY149872 | 31.10.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US42199606 | 02.06.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2434267 | 20.11.2011 | C2 | RU2008147406 | 10.06.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | US42199606 | 02.06.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI434195B | 11.04.2014 | B | TW200817963 | 16.04.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US42199606 | 02.06.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA200900022 | 31.03.2010 | B | Priority number | Date | US42199606 | 02.06.2006 |