EP2033099 - COMBINING VIRUS CHECKING AND REPLICATION FILTRATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.12.2017 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.01.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | [2015/12] |
Former [2009/11] | For all designated states Microsoft Corporation One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRIES, Robert M. One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | 02 /
SOMJI, Shiraz M. One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | [2009/11] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2017/07] |
Former [2009/11] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07753241.4 | 15.03.2007 | [2009/11] | WO2007US06598 | Priority number, date | US20060421996 | 02.06.2006 Original published format: US 421996 | [2009/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007142715 | Date: | 13.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2033099 | Date: | 11.03.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.12.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2033099 | Date: | 15.02.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 13.12.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/56, G06F11/14 | [2016/34] | CPC: |
G06F21/562 (EP,US);
G06F12/16 (KR);
G06F11/1448 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/49] | G06F21/00, G06F11/14 | ||
Former IPC [2009/11] | G06F12/16, G06F21/22 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/07] |
Former [2009/11] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOMBINIEREN VON VIRUSPRÜFUNG UND DUPLIKATIONSFILTRIERUNG | [2009/11] | English: | COMBINING VIRUS CHECKING AND REPLICATION FILTRATION | [2009/11] | French: | COMBINAISON DE LA VÉRIFICATION D'UN VIRUS ET DE LA FILTRATION DE LA RÉPLICATION | [2009/11] | Entry into regional phase | 29.12.2008 | National basic fee paid | 29.12.2008 | Search fee paid | 29.12.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.12.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/11] | 08.02.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.08.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.12.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 27.12.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.12.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.08.2016 | Opposition(s) | 16.11.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 06.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.03.2007 | AT | 15.02.2017 | CY | 15.02.2017 | CZ | 15.02.2017 | DK | 15.02.2017 | EE | 15.02.2017 | ES | 15.02.2017 | FI | 15.02.2017 | IT | 15.02.2017 | LT | 15.02.2017 | LV | 15.02.2017 | MC | 15.02.2017 | PL | 15.02.2017 | RO | 15.02.2017 | SE | 15.02.2017 | SI | 15.02.2017 | SK | 15.02.2017 | TR | 15.02.2017 | IE | 15.03.2017 | LU | 15.03.2017 | MT | 15.03.2017 | BE | 31.03.2017 | CH | 31.03.2017 | LI | 31.03.2017 | BG | 15.05.2017 | GR | 16.05.2017 | IS | 15.06.2017 | PT | 15.06.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 15.03.2007 | |
AT | 15.02.2017 | ||
CY | 15.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
DK | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
IT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
MC | 15.02.2017 | ||
PL | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SI | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
TR | 15.02.2017 | ||
IE | 15.03.2017 | ||
LU | 15.03.2017 | ||
MT | 15.03.2017 | ||
BE | 31.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 15.03.2007 | |
AT | 15.02.2017 | ||
CY | 15.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
DK | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
IT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
MC | 15.02.2017 | ||
PL | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SI | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
IE | 15.03.2017 | ||
LU | 15.03.2017 | ||
MT | 15.03.2017 | ||
BE | 31.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 15.03.2007 | |
AT | 15.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
DK | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
IT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
MC | 15.02.2017 | ||
PL | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SI | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
IE | 15.03.2017 | ||
LU | 15.03.2017 | ||
MT | 15.03.2017 | ||
BE | 31.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 15.02.2017 | |
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
DK | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
IT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
MC | 15.02.2017 | ||
PL | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SI | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
IE | 15.03.2017 | ||
LU | 15.03.2017 | ||
MT | 15.03.2017 | ||
BE | 31.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 15.02.2017 | |
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
DK | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
IT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
MC | 15.02.2017 | ||
PL | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SI | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
IE | 15.03.2017 | ||
LU | 15.03.2017 | ||
BE | 31.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | AT | 15.02.2017 | |
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
DK | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
IT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
MC | 15.02.2017 | ||
PL | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SI | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
IE | 15.03.2017 | ||
LU | 15.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 15.02.2017 | |
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
DK | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
IT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
MC | 15.02.2017 | ||
PL | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
LU | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 15.02.2017 | |
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
DK | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
IT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
MC | 15.02.2017 | ||
PL | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 15.02.2017 | |
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
IT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | AT | 15.02.2017 | |
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | AT | 15.02.2017 | |
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]EP1202148 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [I] 1-11,15 * paragraphs [0001] , [0006] , [0009] , [0012] , [0021] - [0029] * * figure 2 * [A] 12-14; | [IA]US2005114614 (ANDERSON ANDREW V [US], et al) [I] 12-14 * paragraphs [0012] , [0015] , [0040] , [0056] - [0061] - [0063] , [0064] * * figure 2 * [A] 1-11,15; | [A]US2002038296 (MARGOLUS NORMAN H [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0018] - [0021] - [0030] , [0054] , [0068] , [0078] , [0079] , [0151] * * figure 3 *; | [A]US2004107199 (DALRYMPLE PHILIP W [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0001] , [0014] , [0032] , [0034] , [0035] , [0038] - [0040] - [0052] , [0043] , [0062] * * figures 2, 3 *; | [A]US2005114411 (CHILDS PHILIP L [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0006] , [0030] - [0032] *; | [A]US2006101263 (COSTEA MIHAI [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0007] , [0019] , [0024] , [0029] , [0040] , [0046] , [0048] , [0053] *; | [A]US6625623 (MIDGLEY CHRISTOPHER [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 2, line 22 - column 2, line 56 * * column 8, line 3 - column 8, line 11 * * column 12, line 56 - column 12, line 63 * * column 17, line 4 - column 17, line 64 *; | [A]US2005055559 (BUCHER TIM [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0003] , [0009] , [0011] , [0012] , [0034] , [0035] * | International search | [A]US5956481 (WALSH JAMES E [US], et al); | [A]KR20040083409 (SAFEI CO LTD); | [A]US6931552 (PRITCHARD JAMES B [US], et al); | [A]KR20010044706 (SAFE TECHNOLOGY CO LTD [KR]) | by applicant | EP1202148 | US2005114614 | US2002038296 |