EP1996692 - LIQUID TREATMENT UNITIZED DOSE COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 28.02.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 29.09.2021 [2021/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [2020/14] |
Former [2013/45] | For all designated states The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | ||
Former [2008/49] | For all designated states The Procter and Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PANANDIKER, Rajan Keshav 4360 Tylers Estates Drive West Chester, Ohio 45069 / US | 02 /
VETTER, Kerry Andrew 2769 Mahoning Court Cincinnati, Ohio 45233-4236 / US | 03 /
DUNLOP, David Scott 4364 South Mallard Cove Mason, Ohio 45040 / US | 04 /
BRAECKMAN, Karl Ghislain Rue de la Chapelle 59 B-6280 Gerpinnes / BE | [2008/49] | Representative(s) | P&G Patent Belgium UK N.V. Procter & Gamble Services Company S.A. Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | [2020/14] |
Former [2013/38] | Pickford, James Lawrence Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited Whitley Road Longbenton Newcastle upon Tyne NE12 9TS / GB | ||
Former [2008/49] | Goodier, Claire-Louise NV Procter & Gamble Services SA, Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | Application number, filing date | 07753553.2 | 20.03.2007 | [2008/49] | WO2007US06933 | Priority number, date | US20060784826P | 22.03.2006 Original published format: US 784826 P | US20060815781P | 22.06.2006 Original published format: US 815781 P | [2008/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007111888 | Date: | 04.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1996692 | Date: | 03.12.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.10.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1996692 | Date: | 06.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/45] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1996692 | Date: | 01.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C11D17/00, C11D17/04, C11D1/74, C11D3/00, C11D3/12, C11D3/20, C11D3/22, C11D3/37, C11D3/382, C11D3/40, C11D3/42 | [2013/22] | CPC: |
C11D3/40 (EP,US);
C11D1/74 (EP,US);
C11D17/0013 (EP,US);
C11D17/003 (EP,US);
C11D17/043 (EP,US);
C11D3/0015 (EP,US);
C11D3/0089 (EP,US);
C11D3/12 (EP,US);
C11D3/124 (EP,US);
C11D3/1293 (EP,US);
C11D3/2093 (EP,US);
C11D3/221 (EP,US);
C11D3/222 (EP,US);
C11D3/225 (EP,US);
C11D3/227 (EP,US);
C11D3/3723 (EP,US);
C11D3/373 (EP,US);
C11D3/3734 (EP,US);
C11D3/3742 (EP,US);
C11D3/3749 (EP,US);
C11D3/3765 (EP,US);
C11D3/3773 (EP,US);
C11D3/3776 (EP,US);
C11D3/382 (EP,US);
C11D3/42 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2008/49] | C11D17/00, C11D17/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2020/14] |
Former [2008/49] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | FLÜSSIGE BEHANDLUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNG IN EINER EINHEITSDOSIS | [2008/49] | English: | LIQUID TREATMENT UNITIZED DOSE COMPOSITION | [2008/49] | French: | COMPOSITION DE TRAITEMENT LIQUIDE EN DOSES UNITAIRES | [2008/49] | Entry into regional phase | 18.09.2008 | National basic fee paid | 18.09.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.09.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.09.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/49] | 01.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.01.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.05.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.09.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 13.09.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.09.2011 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
05.08.2014
ADMISSIBLE Colgate-Palmolive Company 300 Park Avenue New York NY 10022-7499 / US Opponent's representative Jenkins, Peter David Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | 02
06.08.2014
ADMISSIBLE Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/37] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
05.08.2014
ADMISSIBLE Colgate-Palmolive Company 300 Park Avenue New York NY 10022-7499 / US Opponent's representative Jenkins, Peter David Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | ||
02
06.08.2014
ADMISSIBLE Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | 15.09.2014 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 15.01.2015 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 15.01.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 15.02.2016 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 15.02.2016 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 17.07.2019 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 03.01.2020 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 19.02.2020 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 14.04.2016 | Appeal received No. T0910/16 | 19.05.2016 | Statement of grounds filed | 17.07.2019 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected | 17.07.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 23.07.2019 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.11.2013 | BE | 06.11.2013 | BG | 06.11.2013 | CY | 06.11.2013 | DK | 06.11.2013 | EE | 06.11.2013 | FI | 06.11.2013 | LT | 06.11.2013 | LV | 06.11.2013 | MC | 06.11.2013 | MT | 06.11.2013 | NL | 06.11.2013 | RO | 06.11.2013 | SE | 06.11.2013 | SI | 06.11.2013 | SK | 06.11.2013 | TR | 06.11.2013 | GR | 07.02.2014 | IS | 06.03.2014 | PT | 06.03.2014 | IE | 20.03.2014 | LU | 20.03.2014 | CH | 31.03.2014 | LI | 31.03.2014 | CZ | 20.03.2018 | IT | 20.03.2018 | PL | 20.03.2018 | HU | 21.03.2018 | ES | 21.03.2019 | [2021/39] |
Former [2019/35] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
BE | 06.11.2013 | ||
BG | 06.11.2013 | ||
CY | 06.11.2013 | ||
DK | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
MC | 06.11.2013 | ||
MT | 06.11.2013 | ||
NL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
SI | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
TR | 06.11.2013 | ||
GR | 07.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
IE | 20.03.2014 | ||
LU | 20.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2018 | ||
IT | 20.03.2018 | ||
PL | 20.03.2018 | ||
HU | 21.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
BE | 06.11.2013 | ||
BG | 06.11.2013 | ||
CY | 06.11.2013 | ||
DK | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
MC | 06.11.2013 | ||
MT | 06.11.2013 | ||
NL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
SI | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
TR | 06.11.2013 | ||
GR | 07.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
IE | 20.03.2014 | ||
LU | 20.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2018 | ||
IT | 20.03.2018 | ||
HU | 21.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
BE | 06.11.2013 | ||
BG | 06.11.2013 | ||
CY | 06.11.2013 | ||
DK | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
MC | 06.11.2013 | ||
MT | 06.11.2013 | ||
NL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
SI | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
TR | 06.11.2013 | ||
GR | 07.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
IE | 20.03.2014 | ||
LU | 20.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2018 | ||
HU | 21.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
BE | 06.11.2013 | ||
BG | 06.11.2013 | ||
CY | 06.11.2013 | ||
DK | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
MC | 06.11.2013 | ||
MT | 06.11.2013 | ||
NL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
SI | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
TR | 06.11.2013 | ||
GR | 07.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
IE | 20.03.2014 | ||
LU | 20.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2018 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
BE | 06.11.2013 | ||
BG | 06.11.2013 | ||
CY | 06.11.2013 | ||
DK | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
MC | 06.11.2013 | ||
MT | 06.11.2013 | ||
NL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
SI | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
TR | 06.11.2013 | ||
GR | 07.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
IE | 20.03.2014 | ||
LU | 20.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/31] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
BE | 06.11.2013 | ||
BG | 06.11.2013 | ||
CY | 06.11.2013 | ||
DK | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
MC | 06.11.2013 | ||
MT | 06.11.2013 | ||
NL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
SI | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
GR | 07.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
IE | 20.03.2014 | ||
LU | 20.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
BE | 06.11.2013 | ||
BG | 06.11.2013 | ||
DK | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
MC | 06.11.2013 | ||
MT | 06.11.2013 | ||
NL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
SI | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
GR | 07.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
IE | 20.03.2014 | ||
LU | 20.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/27] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
BE | 06.11.2013 | ||
BG | 06.11.2013 | ||
DK | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
MC | 06.11.2013 | ||
MT | 06.11.2013 | ||
NL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
SI | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
IE | 20.03.2014 | ||
LU | 20.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
BE | 06.11.2013 | ||
BG | 06.11.2013 | ||
DK | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
MT | 06.11.2013 | ||
NL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
SI | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
IE | 20.03.2014 | ||
LU | 20.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
BE | 06.11.2013 | ||
DK | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
MT | 06.11.2013 | ||
NL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
SI | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
IE | 20.03.2014 | ||
LU | 20.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/14] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
BE | 06.11.2013 | ||
DK | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
NL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
SI | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
IE | 20.03.2014 | ||
LU | 20.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
BE | 06.11.2013 | ||
DK | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
NL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
IE | 20.03.2014 | ||
LU | 20.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/07] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
BE | 06.11.2013 | ||
DK | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
NL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
IE | 20.03.2014 | ||
LU | 20.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
BE | 06.11.2013 | ||
DK | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
NL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
LU | 20.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
BE | 06.11.2013 | ||
DK | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
NL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
BE | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
NL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
BE | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
NL | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
BE | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
NL | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
BE | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
NL | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/25] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
NL | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
NL | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | FI | 06.11.2013 | |
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
NL | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 06.11.2013 | |
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
NL | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 06.11.2013 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP1260578 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [X] 1-27* paragraph [0076]; claim - *; | [X]EP1595939 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [X] 1-27 * paragraphs [0045] , [0050]; claim - *; | [X]WO2006007899 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [X] 1-27 * page 21, line 20; claim - * | by applicant | US7022656 | Opposition | US3532635 | US4648983 | EP0463780 | US5089148 | WO0212432 | WO02057402 | US2003199414 | US2004002438 | US2005048014 | US2005158268 | WO2006012465 | WO2006057905 | EP1666579 | - "excerpt", URL: WWW.OPTEK.COM/TURBIDITY_MEASUREMENTS_UNITS.ASP |