EP1998843 - DUAL AIR REGULATED SPRAY APPLICATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.01.2016 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.05.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 08.06.2016 [2016/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Covidien LP 15 Hampshire Street Mansfield, MA 02048 / US | [2012/52] |
Former [2008/50] | For all designated states Tyco Healthcare Group, LP 195 McDermott Road North Haven, CT 06473 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TARINELLI, Danyel 1390 Bartholomew Road Middletown, CT 06457 / US | [2008/50] | Representative(s) | Soames, Candida Jane, et al Maschio & Soames IP Limited 30 Carlton Crescent Southampton SO15 2EW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/11] | Soames, Candida Jane, et al Maschio & Soames IP Limited 20 Carlton Crescent Southampton, SO15 2ET / GB | ||
Former [2011/45] | Soames, Candida Jane, et al Edwards Wildman Innovations LLP 10 Carlton Crescent Southampton SO15 2EZ / GB | ||
Former [2011/09] | Soames, Candida Jane, et al Edwards Angell Palmer & Dodge Innovations LLP 10 Carlton Crescent Southampton SO15 2EZ / GB | ||
Former [2008/50] | Alcock, David D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 07754173.8 | 27.03.2007 | [2008/50] | WO2007US07614 | Priority number, date | US20060389816 | 27.03.2006 Original published format: US 389816 | [2008/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007126845 | Date: | 08.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/45] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1998843 | Date: | 10.12.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.11.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1998843 | Date: | 11.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.04.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.04.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61M37/00 | [2008/50] | CPC: |
A61M35/003 (EP,US);
A61M37/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT [2009/18] |
Former [2008/50] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | DOPPELT REGULIERTER LUFTSPRÜHAPPLIKATOR | [2008/50] | English: | DUAL AIR REGULATED SPRAY APPLICATOR | [2008/50] | French: | APPLICATEUR D'AÉROSOL DOUBLE RÉGULÉ PAR AIR | [2008/50] | Entry into regional phase | 16.10.2008 | National basic fee paid | 16.10.2008 | Search fee paid | 16.10.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.10.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.10.2008 | Examination requested [2008/50] | 28.10.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 03.12.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HU, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 07.11.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.10.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.01.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 29.01.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.01.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.10.2014 | Opposition(s) | 14.12.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 11.03.2015 | IT | 11.03.2015 | IE | 27.03.2015 | GB | 11.06.2015 | [2016/23] |
Former [2016/07] | ES | 11.03.2015 | |
IT | 11.03.2015 | ||
IE | 27.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | ES | 11.03.2015 | |
IT | 11.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/33] | ES | 11.03.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2002198564 (PICHON DEAN M [US], et al) [X] 1-7,9,13-15,18,20 * the whole document * [I] 8; | [X]US5386928 (BLETTE RUSSELL E [US]) [X] 1,4-7,15,16 * column 2, line 46 - column 3, line 9; figures 1-3 * * column 6, line 32 - column 7, line 8; figures 7,6 *; | [X]EP1113839 (BAXTER INT [US]) [X] 1,2,4-7 * paragraph [0040] * * paragraph [0076] - paragraph [0079]; figure 4A *; | [X]US4040420 (SPEER SPENCER J) [X] 1,4-7,10,12 * column 2, line 67 - column 3, line 23; figures 1-2 * * column 5, line 38 - column 6, line 11; figure 5 * | International search | [X]US2004159715 (LEACH MICHAEL D [US]); | [Y]US2004059283 (KIRWAN JOHN M [US], et al); | [Y]US5605541 (HOLM NIELS-ERIK [DK]); | [Y]US6132396 (ANTANAVICH RICHARD D [US], et al); | [Y]US2003225380 (REDL HEINZ [AT], et al) |