EP2011328 - RECONFIGURABLE SELF-CALIBRATING VIDEO NOISE REDUCER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.11.2017 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.12.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.11.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.12.2017 [2017/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Marvell World Trade Ltd. L'Horizon Gunsite Road Brittons Hill St. Michael 14027 / BB | [2017/03] |
Former [2009/02] | For all designated states Marvell World Trade Ltd. L'Horizon, Gunsite Road Brittons Hill St. Michael BB14027 / BB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PATHAK, Bharat 2, 5th Cross, Shankarappa Lane Lal Bahadur Shastry Nagar Bangalore PIN-560017 / IN | 02 /
BALRAM, Nikhil 387 Foxborough Drive Mountain View, California 94041 / US | [2017/03] |
Former [2009/02] | 01 /
PATHAK, Bharat 2, 5th Cross, Shankarappa Lane Lal Bahadur Shastry Nagar Bangalore PIN-560017 / IN | ||
02 /
BALRAM, Nikhil 387 Foxborough Drive Mountain View, California 94041 / US | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2017/03] |
Former [2009/02] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07755026.7 | 05.04.2007 | [2009/02] | WO2007US08614 | Priority number, date | US20060400505 | 07.04.2006 Original published format: US 400505 | [2009/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007117623 | Date: | 18.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/42] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2011328 | Date: | 07.01.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.10.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2011328 | Date: | 18.01.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G06T5/50, H04N17/04, G06T5/00, H04N5/21, H04N17/00 | [2016/38] | CPC: |
H04N5/21 (EP,KR,US);
G06T5/00 (KR);
G06T5/50 (EP,US);
G06T5/70 (EP,US);
H04N17/00 (EP,US);
H04N17/04 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2009/02] | H04N5/21, H04N17/00, G06T5/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2017/03] |
Former [2009/19] | DE, FR, GB | ||
Former [2009/02] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | NEUKONFIGURIERBARER SELBSTKALIBRIERENDER VIDEORAUSCHDÄMPFER | [2009/02] | English: | RECONFIGURABLE SELF-CALIBRATING VIDEO NOISE REDUCER | [2009/02] | French: | REDUCTEUR DE BRUIT VIDEO RECONFIGURABLE A ETALONNAGE AUTOMATIQUE | [2009/02] | Entry into regional phase | 05.11.2008 | National basic fee paid | 05.11.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.11.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/02] | 08.11.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 16.12.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 29.12.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.04.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.08.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.05.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 06.06.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.12.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 07.12.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.12.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.04.2012 | Opposition(s) | 19.10.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0735747 (THOMSON MULTIMEDIA SA [FR]) [A] 1,3-14,16-19 * abstract *; | [A]US6067125 (MAY WILLIAM D [US]) [A] 1,5,6,12,13 * abstract *; | [XY]WO0135636 (ST MICROELECTRONICS ASIA [SG], et al) [X] 1,3-6,9-14 * abstract * * page 4, line 3 - page 8, line 14 * [Y] 2,7,8,15-20; | [Y]US2002034337 (SHEKTER JONATHAN MARTIN [CA]) [Y] 2,15,20 * abstract *; | [A]US2002186894 (FERGUSON KEVIN M [US]) [A] 1,3-14,16-19 * abstract *; | [A]US2003123750 (YU PIL-HO [KR]) [A] 1,3,5,6,9,12,13* abstract *; | [YA]US2003156301 (KEMPF JEFFREY [US], et al) [Y] 18,19 * abstract * [A] 1,3-14,16,17; | [Y]US6975758 (NICOLAS MARINA MARIE PIERRE [FR]) [Y] 7,8,16,17 * column 3, lines 1-28 *; | [A]US2006050783 (LE DINH CHON T [CA], et al) [A] 1,3-14,16-19 * abstract * | by applicant | WO0135636 | US2002186894 |