EP2012586 - USES AND COMPOSITIONS FOR TREATMENT OF ANKYLOSING SPONDYLITIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.12.2014 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 07.01.2015 [2015/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AbbVie Biotechnology Ltd Clarendon House 2, Church Street HM 11 Hamilton / BM | [2013/38] |
Former [2009/03] | For all designated states Abbott Biotechnology Ltd. Clarendon House 2 Church Street Hamilton HM 11 / BM | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WONG, Robert, L. 12 Riggs Court Basking Ridge, NJ 07920 / US | 02 /
KUPPER, Hartmut Lilienstrasse 43 67112 Mutterstadt / DE | 03 /
LUO, Michelle 1208 Virginia Ave. Libertyville, IL 60048 / US | 04 /
SIEPER, Joachim Bernerstrasse 21 A 12205 Berlin / DE | 05 /
MAKSYMOWYCH, Walter, P. 562 Heritage Medical Research Center, University of Alberta Edmonton, Alberta T6G 252 / CA | 06 /
DAVIS, John 298 Juanity Way San Francisco, CA 94127-1736 / US | 07 /
VAN DER HEIJDE, Desiree Korte Raarberg 46 Meersen 6231 KR / NL | [2009/03] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Modiano Josif Pisanty & Staub Ltd Thierschstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Modiano Josif Pisanty & Staub Ltd Thierschstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/03] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Modiano Josif Pisanty & Staub Ltd Thierschstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07755151.3 | 10.04.2007 | [2009/03] | WO2007US08787 | Priority number, date | US20060790909P | 10.04.2006 Original published format: US 790909 P | US20060809770P | 30.05.2006 Original published format: US 809770 P | US20060815489P | 20.06.2006 Original published format: US 815489 P | US20060858376P | 10.11.2006 Original published format: US 858376 P | US20070909683P | 02.04.2007 Original published format: US 909683 P | [2009/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007120626 | Date: | 25.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/43] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2012586 | Date: | 14.01.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.10.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 23.10.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/395 | [2010/27] | CPC: |
C07K16/241 (EP,US);
A61K49/0004 (US);
A61K2039/505 (EP,US);
A61K2039/545 (US);
C07K2317/21 (EP,US);
C07K2317/565 (US);
C07K2317/92 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2009/03] | A01N37/18, C07K1/00, C07K16/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/03] | Extension states | BA | 10.11.2008 | HR | 10.11.2008 | MK | 10.11.2008 | RS | 10.11.2008 | Title | German: | ANWENDUNGEN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON MORBUS BECHTEREW | [2009/03] | English: | USES AND COMPOSITIONS FOR TREATMENT OF ANKYLOSING SPONDYLITIS | [2009/03] | French: | UTILISATIONS ET COMPOSITIONS POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE LA SPONDYLARTHRITE ANKYLOSANTE | [2009/03] | Entry into regional phase | 10.11.2008 | National basic fee paid | 10.11.2008 | Search fee paid | 10.11.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.11.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.11.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 10.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/03] | 14.02.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.06.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.12.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.08.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.11.2014 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 25.11.2014 | 25.11.2014 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 26.11.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/02] | Divisional application(s) | EP13172513.7 / EP2708242 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.06.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2005249735 (LE JUNMING [US] ET AL) [A] 1,3,6-9 * the whole document *; | [X] - HAIBEL HILDRUN ET AL, "Adalimumab reduces spinal symptoms in active ankylosing spondylitis: clinical and magnetic resonance imaging results of a fifty-two-week open-label trial.", ARTHRITIS AND RHEUMATISM FEB 2006 LNKD- PUBMED:16447247, (200602), vol. 54, no. 2, ISSN 0004-3591, pages 678 - 681, XP002583872 [X] 1,3,6-9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/ART.21563 | [X] - HAIBEL H ET AL, "Adalimumab in the treatment of active ankylosing spondylitis: Results of an open-label, 52-week trial", ANNALS OF THE RHEUMATIC DISEASES, & ANNUAL EUROPEAN CONGRESS OF RHEUMATOLOGY; VIENNA, AUSTRIA; JUNE 08 11, 2005, (200507), vol. 64, no. Suppl. 3, ISSN 0003-4967, page 316, XP009133948 [X] 6-9 * the whole document * | [X] - M03-606 STUDY GRP, "Efficacy of adalimumab in active ankylosing spondylitis (AS) - Results of the Canadian AS study", ARTHRITIS & RHEUMATISM, & 69TH ANNUAL SCIENTIFIC MEETING OF THE AMERICAN-COLLEGE-OF-RHEUMATOLOG Y/40TH ANNUAL SCIENTIFIC MEETIN; SAN DIEGO, CA, USA; NOVEMBER 12 -17, 2005, (200509), vol. 52, no. 9, Suppl. S, ISSN 0004-3591, page S217, XP009133939 [X] 6-9 * the whole document * | [X] - DAVIS J ET AL, "Major clinical response and partial remission in ankylosing spondylitis subjects treated with adalimumab: The ATLAS trial.", ARTHRITIS & RHEUMATISM, & 69TH ANNUAL SCIENTIFIC MEETING OF THE AMERICAN-COLLEGE-OF-RHEUMATOLOG Y/40TH ANNUAL SCIENTIFIC MEETIN; SAN DIEGO, CA, USA; NOVEMBER 12 -17, 2005, (200509), vol. 52, no. 9, Suppl. S, ISSN 0004-3591, pages S208 - S209, XP009133946 [X] 6-9 * the whole document * | [X] - ATLAS STUDY GRP, "Adalimumab therapy results in significant reduction of signs and symptoms in subjects with Ankylosing spondylitis: The ATLAS trial.", ARTHRITIS & RHEUMATISM, & 69TH ANNUAL SCIENTIFIC MEETING OF THE AMERICAN-COLLEGE-OF-RHEUMATOLOG Y/40TH ANNUAL SCIENTIFIC MEETIN; SAN DIEGO, CA, USA; NOVEMBER 12 -17, 2005, (200509), vol. 52, no. 9, Suppl. S, page S281, XP009133984 [X] 6-9 * the whole document * | [X] - VAN DER HEIJDE D ET AL, "Adalimumab improves health-related quality of life in patients with active ankylosing spondylitis - The ATLAS trial.", ARTHRITIS & RHEUMATISM, & 69TH ANNUAL SCIENTIFIC MEETING OF THE AMERICAN-COLLEGE-OF-RHEUMATOLOGY/40TH ANNUAL SCIENTIFIC MEETING; SAN DIEGO, CA, USA; NOVEMBER 12 -17, 2005, (200509), vol. 52, no. 9, Suppl. S, ISSN 0004-3591, page S211, XP002584157 [X] 6-9 * the whole document * | [X] - LUC MATHIEU ET AL, "Patients without biological inflammation are responders to anti-TNF-alpha in axial ankylosing spondylitis", ARTHRITIS & RHEUMATISM, & 69TH ANNUAL SCIENTIFIC MEETING OF THE AMERICAN-COLLEGE-OF-RHEUMATOLOG Y/40TH ANNUAL SCIENTIFIC MEETIN; SAN DIEGO, CA, USA; NOVEMBER 12 -17, 2005, (200509), vol. 52, no. 9, Suppl. S, ISSN 0004-3591, page S216, XP009133940 [X] 6-9 * the whole document * | [A] - BOULOS PAULINE ET AL, "Pharmacological treatment of ankylosing spondylitis: a systematic review.", DRUGS 2005 LNKD- PUBMED:16225367, (2005), vol. 65, no. 15, ISSN 0012-6667, pages 2111 - 2127, XP009133932 [A] 1,3,6-9 * the whole document * | [A] - DAVIS J C, "Understanding the role of tumor necrosis factor inhibition in ankylosing spondylitis", SEMINARS IN ARTHRITIS AND RHEUMATISM,, (20050201), vol. 34, no. 4, ISSN 0049-0172, pages 668 - 677, XP004732603 [A] 1,3,6-9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.semarthrit.2004.08.005 | [A] - WENDLING DANIEL ET AL, "Anti-TNF-alpha therapy in ankylosing spondylitis.", EXPERT OPINION ON PHARMACOTHERAPY JUL 2004 LNKD- PUBMED:15212600, (200407), vol. 5, no. 7, ISSN 1465-6566, pages 1497 - 1507, XP009133938 [A] 1,3,6-9 * the whole document * | [A] - EFTHIMIOU P ET AL, "ROLE OF BIOLOGICAL AGENTS IN IMMUNE-MEDIATED INFLAMMATORY DISEASES", SOUTHERN MEDICAL JOURNAL, SOUTHERN MEDICAL ASSOCIATION, US LNKD- DOI:10.1097/01.SMJ.0000153119.37032.8B, (20050201), vol. 98, no. 2, ISSN 0038-4348, pages 192 - 204, XP009063672 [A] 1,3,6-9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/01.SMJ.0000153119.37032.8B | [A] - BRAUN J ET AL, "BIOLOGIC THERAPIES IN THE SPONDYLOARTHRITIS: NEW OPPORTUNITIES, NEW CHALLENGES", CURRENT OPINION IN RHEUMATOLOGY, CURRENT SCIENCE, LONDON, GB LNKD- DOI:10.1097/00002281-200307000-00005, (20030701), vol. 15, no. 4, ISSN 1040-8711, pages 394 - 407, XP008019243 [A] 1,3,6-9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/00002281-200307000-00005 | International search | [Y]WO9729131 (Salfeld) [Y] 20-23, 55-58, 62-65 * . See throughout. * | [X] - CHEROUVIM E.P. et al., "Infliximab therapy for patients with active and refractory spodylarhropathies at the dose of 3 mg/kg.", J. Clin. Rheumatol., (20040801), vol. 10, pages 162 - 168, XP008130677 [X] 1-5, 7-19, 24-54, 59-61 6, 20-23, 55-58, 62-65 * . See throughout. * | [Y] - DE KEYSER et al., "Anti-TNF-alpha therapy in ankylosing spondylitis.", Cytokine., vol. 93, pages 294 - 298, XP008130678 [Y] 23, 58, 65 * . See Abstract. * |