EP2011326 - MAINTENANCE OF ACCURATE COLOR PERFORMANCE OF DISPLAYS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.01.2011 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.01.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.02.2011 [2011/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/02] | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester NY 14650-2201 / US | ||
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EDGE, Christopher 1890 Jefferson Avenue St Paul, Minnesota 55105 / US | 02 /
PEARSON, Dallas Keith 2189 Hale Avenue North Oakdale, Minnesota 55128 / US | [2009/02] | Representative(s) | Weber, Etienne Nicolas Kodak Boite n 2 Zone d'activité SAONEOR 12 rue Alfred Kastler 71530 Fragnes / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/02] | Weber, Etienne Nicolas Kodak Industrie Département Brevets - Espace Entreprises- Bât 61/1, ZI Nord 71102 Chalon-sur-Saône Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 07755254.5 | 10.04.2007 | [2009/02] | WO2007US08922 | Priority number, date | US20060412566 | 27.04.2006 Original published format: US 412566 | [2009/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007127057 | Date: | 08.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/45] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2011326 | Date: | 07.01.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.11.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/60, G09G5/02 | [2009/02] | CPC: |
H04N1/6033 (EP,US);
G01J3/02 (EP,US);
G01J3/46 (EP,US);
G01J3/462 (EP,US);
G01J3/50 (EP,US);
G01J3/506 (EP,US);
G09G3/006 (EP,US);
H04N1/40006 (EP,US);
G09G2320/0693 (EP,US);
G09G5/02 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2009/21] |
Former [2009/02] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ERHALTUNG DER PRÄZISEN FARBLEISTUNG VON ANZEIGEN | [2009/02] | English: | MAINTENANCE OF ACCURATE COLOR PERFORMANCE OF DISPLAYS | [2009/02] | French: | MAINTENANCE DES PERFORMANCES DE COULEURS PRÉCISES POUR DES AFFICHAGES | [2009/02] | Entry into regional phase | 08.10.2008 | National basic fee paid | 08.10.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.10.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.10.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.10.2008 | Examination requested [2009/02] | 28.11.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 07.01.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 14.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.08.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/07] | 28.09.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0785672 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [X] 1-5,21-23 * page 3, line 37 - page 4, line 53; figures 2,3 *; | [X]US5877787 (EDGE CHRISTOPHER J [US]) [X] 1,3,4,18,21,23 * column 12, line 28 - column 13, line 51; figure 3 *; | [A]EP1150159 (GRETAG MACBETH AG [CH]) [A] 1-5,15-18,21-23,27 * paragraphs [0034] , [0045]; figures 3,8 *; | [A]US6628826 (GILMAN PAUL B [US], et al) [A] 9,17,18,26 * column 6, lines 24-53; figure 3A *; | [A]US6615729 (HAUCK AXEL [DE], et al) [A] * column 2, line 64 - column 3, line 13 *; | [A]US2004150835 (FRICK BEAT [CH], et al) [A] * paragraphs [0044] , [0061]; figure 3 *; | [A]US2004183813 (EDGE CHRISTOPHER J [US]) [A] * paragraphs [0003] - [0008] - [0026] - [0033] * |