EP2022266 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PROVIDING LOCATION SPECIFIC SOUND IN A TELEPRESENCE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 14.09.2018 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 17.10.2018 [2018/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cisco Technology, Inc. 170 West Tasman Avenue San Jose, CA 95134 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/07] | For all designated states Cisco Technology, Inc. 170 West Tasman Avenue San Jose CA 95134 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRAHAM, Philip R. 638 Quince Lane Milpitas, CA 95035 / US | 02 /
HARRELL, Randy K. 15180 Blackberry Hill Road Los Gatos, CA 95030 / US | 03 /
MCLAUGHLIN, Hugh J. 2440 Villa Nueva Way Mountain View, CA 94040 / US | 04 /
MARECHAL, Philip E. 1841 Doane Avenue Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | 05 /
RICHMAN, Marc L. 926 San Carlos Avenue El Granada, CA 94018 / US | 06 /
ABED, Tark 637 Greer Road Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | 07 /
YU, Feng Hao 2680 Fayette Drive Apartment No. 509 Mountain View, CA 94040 / US | [2009/07] | Representative(s) | Kazi, Ilya Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/07] | Kazi, Ilya Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 07755660.3 | 19.04.2007 | [2009/07] | WO2007US09469 | Priority number, date | US20060794016P | 20.04.2006 Original published format: US 794016 P | US20060483469 | 10.07.2006 Original published format: US 483469 | [2009/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007123946 | Date: | 01.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/44] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2022266 | Date: | 11.02.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.11.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.12.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.09.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/14 | [2009/07] | CPC: |
H04N7/15 (EP,US);
H04N7/142 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/07] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG VON ORTSSPEZIFISCHEM TON IN EINEM TELEPRÄSENZSYSTEM | [2009/07] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PROVIDING LOCATION SPECIFIC SOUND IN A TELEPRESENCE SYSTEM | [2009/07] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE POUR PRODUIRE UN SON SPECIFIQUE D'UN EMPLACEMENT DANS UN SYSTEME DE TELEPRESENCE | [2009/07] | Entry into regional phase | 29.10.2008 | National basic fee paid | 29.10.2008 | Search fee paid | 29.10.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.10.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.10.2008 | Examination requested [2009/07] | 31.03.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.04.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.09.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/42] | 24.01.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.01.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]FR2761562 (FRANCE TELECOM [FR]) [X] 1,3,5-9,11-13 * page 7, line 22 - page 10, line 9 * * page 13, line 17 - page 15, line 20 * * figures 1-4 * [I] 2,4,10; | [A]US2004204194 (AKAI HIROSHI [JP], et al) [A] 2,6,12 * paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0100] *; | [A]US2005231587 (ROOT TIMOTHY [US], et al) [A] 2* paragraph [0040] *; | [X]EP1613124 (POLYCOM INC [US]) [X] 1,3,4,7-10,13 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0040] * * figures 1,2,6 * | International search | [Y]US3793489 (SANK J); | [Y]US5136652 (JIBBE MAHMOUD K [US], et al); | [Y]US5940118 (VAN SCHYNDEL ANDRE J [CA]); | [Y]US5956100 (GORSKI JIM [US]); | [Y]US2002186528 (HUANG YU-FU [TW]); | [Y]US2003072460 (GONOPOLSKIY ALEKSANDR L [US], et al); | [X]US2005081160 (WEE SUSIE J [US], et al); | [Y]US2005110867 (SCHULZ KARSTEN [AU]); | [Y]US6963653 (MILES RONALD [US]); | [Y]US2005268823 (BAKKER MITCHELL R [US], et al) | by applicant | FR2761562 | EP1613124 |