EP2013758 - DYNAMIC AUTHENTICATION IN SECURED WIRELESS NETWORKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.06.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ruckus Wireless, Inc. 350 West Java Drive Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US | [2013/36] |
Former [2009/03] | For all designated states Ruckus Wireless, Inc. 880 West Maude Avenue, Suite 101 Sunnyvale, CA 94085 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOU, Tyan-Shu c/o Ruckus Wireless, Inc. 350 West Java Drive Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US | 02 /
SHEU, Ming c/o Ruckus Wireless, Inc. 350 West Java Drive Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US | 03 /
YANG, Bo-Chieh c/o Ruckus Wireless, Inc. 350 West Java Drive Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US | 04 /
LIN, Tian-Yuan c/o Ruckus Wireless, Inc. 350 West Java Drive Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US | 05 /
KUO, Ted Tsei c/o Ruckus Wireless, Inc. 350 West Java Drive Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US | [2013/43] |
Former [2009/03] | 01 /
JOU, Tyan-Shu c/o Ruckus Wireless, Inc. 880 West Maude Avenue Suite 101 Sunnyvale, California 94085 / US | ||
02 /
SHEU, Ming c/o Ruckus Wireless, Inc. 880 West Maude Avenue Suite 101 Sunnyvale, California 94085 / US | |||
03 /
YANG, Bo-Chieh c/o Ruckus Wireless, Inc. 880 West Maude Avenue Suite 101 Sunnyvale, California 94085 / US | |||
04 /
LIN, Tian-Yuan c/o Ruckus Wireless, Inc. 880 West Maude Avenue Suite 101 Sunnyvale, California 94085 / US | |||
05 /
KUO, Ted Tsei c/o Ruckus Wireless, Inc. 880 West Maude Avenue Suite 101 Sunnyvale, California 94085 / US | Representative(s) | Käck, Stefan, et al Kahler Käck Mollekopf Partnerschaft von Patentanwälten mbB Vorderer Anger 239 86899 Landsberg/Lech / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/31] | Käck, Stefan, et al Kahler Käck Mollekopf Vorderer Anger 239 86899 Landsberg am Lech / DE | ||
Former [2009/03] | Käck, Jürgen Patentanwälte Kahler Käck Mollekopf Vorderer Anger 239 86899 Landsberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 07755678.5 | 18.04.2007 | [2009/03] | WO2007US09503 | Priority number, date | US20060794625P | 24.04.2006 Original published format: US 794625 P | US20060796845P | 02.05.2006 Original published format: US 796845 P | [2009/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007127120 | Date: | 08.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/45] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2013758 | Date: | 14.01.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.11.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2013758 | Date: | 03.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G06F15/173, G06F21/00, H04W8/18, H04W12/04, H04W12/06, H04W12/08, // H04L29/06 | [2016/10] | CPC: |
H04L63/06 (EP,US);
H04L63/08 (EP,US);
H04L63/0869 (EP,US);
H04L63/0876 (EP,US);
H04W12/041 (EP,US);
H04W12/068 (EP,US);
H04W12/069 (EP,US);
H04W12/08 (EP,US);
H04L63/101 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2012/04] | G06F15/173, G06F21/00, // H04L29/06 | ||
Former IPC [2009/03] | G06F15/173 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/31] |
Former [2009/03] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DYNAMISCHE AUTHENTIFIZIERUNG IN SICHEREN DRAHTLOSEN NETZWERKEN | [2009/03] | English: | DYNAMIC AUTHENTICATION IN SECURED WIRELESS NETWORKS | [2009/03] | French: | AUTHENTIFICATION DYNAMIQUE DANS DES RESEAUX SANS FIL SECURISES | [2009/03] | Entry into regional phase | 21.11.2008 | National basic fee paid | 21.11.2008 | Search fee paid | 21.11.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.11.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/03] | 17.07.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.02.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.05.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.06.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 22.06.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.06.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.10.2012 | Opposition(s) | 04.05.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.04.2007 | AT | 03.08.2016 | BE | 03.08.2016 | CY | 03.08.2016 | CZ | 03.08.2016 | DK | 03.08.2016 | EE | 03.08.2016 | ES | 03.08.2016 | FI | 03.08.2016 | IT | 03.08.2016 | LT | 03.08.2016 | LV | 03.08.2016 | MC | 03.08.2016 | NL | 03.08.2016 | PL | 03.08.2016 | RO | 03.08.2016 | SE | 03.08.2016 | SI | 03.08.2016 | SK | 03.08.2016 | TR | 03.08.2016 | BG | 03.11.2016 | GR | 04.11.2016 | IS | 03.12.2016 | PT | 05.12.2016 | IE | 18.04.2017 | LU | 18.04.2017 | MT | 18.04.2017 | CH | 30.04.2017 | LI | 30.04.2017 | FR | 02.05.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/46] | HU | 18.04.2007 | |
AT | 03.08.2016 | ||
BE | 03.08.2016 | ||
CY | 03.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2016 | ||
DK | 03.08.2016 | ||
EE | 03.08.2016 | ||
ES | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
IT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LV | 03.08.2016 | ||
MC | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
PL | 03.08.2016 | ||
RO | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
SI | 03.08.2016 | ||
SK | 03.08.2016 | ||
BG | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
IE | 18.04.2017 | ||
LU | 18.04.2017 | ||
MT | 18.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
FR | 02.05.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 18.04.2007 | |
AT | 03.08.2016 | ||
BE | 03.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2016 | ||
DK | 03.08.2016 | ||
EE | 03.08.2016 | ||
ES | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
IT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LV | 03.08.2016 | ||
MC | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
PL | 03.08.2016 | ||
RO | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
SI | 03.08.2016 | ||
SK | 03.08.2016 | ||
BG | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
IE | 18.04.2017 | ||
LU | 18.04.2017 | ||
MT | 18.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
FR | 02.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 03.08.2016 | |
BE | 03.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2016 | ||
DK | 03.08.2016 | ||
EE | 03.08.2016 | ||
ES | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
IT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LV | 03.08.2016 | ||
MC | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
PL | 03.08.2016 | ||
RO | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
SI | 03.08.2016 | ||
SK | 03.08.2016 | ||
BG | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
IE | 18.04.2017 | ||
LU | 18.04.2017 | ||
MT | 18.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
FR | 02.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 03.08.2016 | |
BE | 03.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2016 | ||
DK | 03.08.2016 | ||
EE | 03.08.2016 | ||
ES | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
IT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LV | 03.08.2016 | ||
MC | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
PL | 03.08.2016 | ||
RO | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
SI | 03.08.2016 | ||
SK | 03.08.2016 | ||
BG | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
IE | 18.04.2017 | ||
LU | 18.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
FR | 02.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | AT | 03.08.2016 | |
BE | 03.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2016 | ||
DK | 03.08.2016 | ||
EE | 03.08.2016 | ||
ES | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
IT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LV | 03.08.2016 | ||
MC | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
PL | 03.08.2016 | ||
RO | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
SI | 03.08.2016 | ||
SK | 03.08.2016 | ||
BG | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
LU | 18.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
FR | 02.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | AT | 03.08.2016 | |
BE | 03.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2016 | ||
DK | 03.08.2016 | ||
EE | 03.08.2016 | ||
ES | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
IT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LV | 03.08.2016 | ||
MC | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
PL | 03.08.2016 | ||
RO | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
SI | 03.08.2016 | ||
SK | 03.08.2016 | ||
BG | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
FR | 02.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/06] | AT | 03.08.2016 | |
BE | 03.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2016 | ||
DK | 03.08.2016 | ||
EE | 03.08.2016 | ||
ES | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
IT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LV | 03.08.2016 | ||
MC | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
PL | 03.08.2016 | ||
RO | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
SI | 03.08.2016 | ||
SK | 03.08.2016 | ||
BG | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 03.08.2016 | |
BE | 03.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2016 | ||
DK | 03.08.2016 | ||
EE | 03.08.2016 | ||
ES | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
IT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LV | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
PL | 03.08.2016 | ||
RO | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
SI | 03.08.2016 | ||
SK | 03.08.2016 | ||
BG | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/32] | AT | 03.08.2016 | |
BE | 03.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2016 | ||
DK | 03.08.2016 | ||
EE | 03.08.2016 | ||
ES | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
IT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LV | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
PL | 03.08.2016 | ||
RO | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
SK | 03.08.2016 | ||
BG | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | AT | 03.08.2016 | |
ES | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
IT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LV | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
PL | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 03.08.2016 | |
ES | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
IT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
PL | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 03.08.2016 | |
IT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
PL | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 03.08.2016 | |
IT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 03.08.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]EP1724691 (GLOBAL FRIENDSHIP INC [JP]) [XP] 1-19 * paragraphs [0001] , [0008] - [0010] - [0031] , [0033] , [0036] , [0040] , [0048] , [0049]; figure 1 *; | WO2005086012 [ ] (GLOBAL FRIENDSHIP INC [JP], et al); | [X]US6772331 (HIND JOHN RAITHEL [US], et al) [X] 1-19 * column 7, line 55 - column 8, line 3 * * column 9, lines 32-37 * * column 10, lines 18-29 * | International search | [Y]US6950523 (BRICKELL ERNIE [US], et al); | [Y]US2006080741 (NAIR MARK [US]); | [Y]US2006080415 (TU EDGAR A [US]); | [Y]US2005268107 (HARRIS WILLIAM H [US], et al) | by applicant | EP1724691 | WO2005086012 | US6772331 | US20060796845 |