EP2013241 - FLUORINATED TRANSITION METAL CATALYSTS AND FORMATION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.02.2014 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.02.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.03.2014 [2014/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fina Technology, Inc. P.O. Box 674412 Houston, TX 77267-4412 / US | [2009/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ABBAS, Razavi Domaine De la Brisee 35 B-7000 Mons / BE | 02 /
MARIN, Vladimir 8803 Bexar Drive Houston, TX 77064 / US | 03 /
LOPEZ, Margarito 1615 Buckingham Drive Pasadena, TX 77504 / US | [2009/03] | Representative(s) | Leyder, Francis Total Research & Technology Feluy Zone Industrielle C 7181 Seneffe / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/03] | Leyder, Francis Total Petrochemicals Research Feluy Zone Industrielle C 7181 Seneffe (Feluy) / BE | Application number, filing date | 07756122.3 | 27.04.2007 | [2009/03] | WO2007US10334 | Priority number, date | US20060414424 | 28.04.2006 Original published format: US 414424 | [2009/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007127426 | Date: | 08.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/45] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2013241 | Date: | 14.01.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.11.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.08.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C08F4/02, C08F4/6592, B01J31/22 | [2009/03] | CPC: |
C08F10/00 (EP,US);
B01J29/00 (KR);
B01J27/12 (KR);
C08F4/02 (KR);
C08F4/44 (KR);
C08F110/02 (EP,US);
C08F110/06 (EP,US);
C08F2410/07 (EP);
C08F4/65912 (EP,US);
C08F4/65927 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08F10/00, C08F4/65916 (EP,US);
C08F110/02, C08F2500/12 (US,EP);
C08F110/06, C08F2500/15, C08F2500/20, C08F2500/04 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/03] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FLUORIERTE ÜBERGANGSMETALLKATALYSATOREN UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2009/03] | English: | FLUORINATED TRANSITION METAL CATALYSTS AND FORMATION THEREOF | [2009/03] | French: | CATALYSEURS À MÉTAL DE TRANSITION FLUORÉS ET FORMATION DE CEUX-CI | [2009/03] | Entry into regional phase | 30.10.2008 | National basic fee paid | 30.10.2008 | Search fee paid | 30.10.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.10.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.10.2008 | Examination requested [2009/03] | 08.01.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.09.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.06.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.10.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/12] | 12.11.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/12] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.10.2009 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 16.07.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 16.07.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2013 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0123433 (PHILLIPS PETROLEUM CO [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * page 13, line 2 - page 14, line 15 * * claim - *; | [A]US6368999 (SPECA ANTHONY N [US]) [A] 1-16 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0025] * * abstract *; | [A]US2005054790 (MAWSON SIMON [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * paragraphs [0206] , [0208] , [0218] * * claim - *; | [Y]US2005165183 (MCCULLOUGH LAUGHLIN G [US], et al) [Y] 1-16 * claim - *; | [A]WO2005075525 (TOTAL PETROCHEMICALS RES FELUY [BE], et al) [A] 1-16 * claim - *; | [A]US2005266982 (HOLTCAMP MATTHEW W [US]) [A] 1-16 * paragraphs [0274] , [ 275] , [0280] ** abstract *; | [XY]US2005288462 (JENSEN MICHAEL D [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7-16 * paragraphs [0129] , [0151] , [0316] * * paragraph [0122] - paragraph [0124] * * claim - * [Y] 1-16 | International search | [A]US5070053 (CULROSS CLAUDE C [US], et al); | [Y]US2005288462 (JENSEN MICHAEL D [US], et al) | Examination | FR2769245 | WO0158587 | US2004014596 |