EP2032146 - METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS RELATED TO TR4 [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.07.2012 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.08.2012 [2012/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states University of Rochester 601 Elmwood Avenue, Box OTT Rochester, NY 14642 / US | [2009/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Yi-fen 182 Raleigh Street Rochester, NY 14620 / US | 02 /
CHANG, Chawnshang 19 Sandy Lane Pittsford, NY 14534 / US | [2009/11] | Representative(s) | Leißler-Gerstl, Gabriele Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Pilgersheimer Strasse 20 81543 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/11] | Leissler-Gerstl, Gabriele Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte Pilgersheimer Strasse 20 81543 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07756240.3 | 09.05.2007 | [2009/11] | WO2007US11159 | Priority number, date | US20060798974P | 09.05.2006 Original published format: US 798974 P | [2009/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007133571 | Date: | 22.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/47] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2032146 | Date: | 11.03.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.11.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 20.03.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.01.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61K35/00, A61K38/00, A61K48/00, G01N33/574 | [2010/07] | CPC: |
G01N33/57434 (EP,US);
A61K31/355 (EP,US);
A61K31/713 (EP,US);
A61K38/1783 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61P43/00 (EP);
G01N33/5011 (EP,US);
G01N33/57496 (EP,US);
G01N2333/723 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/355, A61K2300/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/11] | A61K35/00, A61K38/00, A61K48/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/11] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN FÜR TR4 | [2009/11] | English: | METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS RELATED TO TR4 | [2009/11] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET COMPOSITIONS LIÉS À TR4 | [2009/11] | Entry into regional phase | 09.12.2008 | National basic fee paid | 09.12.2008 | Search fee paid | 09.12.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.12.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/11] | 02.03.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.04.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/33] | 21.05.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2010 | 04   M06   Not yet paid | 31.05.2011 | 05   M06   Not yet paid | 31.05.2012 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2003235860 (CHANG CHAWNSHANG [US]) [A] 1-2,4-5,14,17 * the whole document * * paragraphs [0050] , [0051] , [0065] , [0078] , [0427] * * claim 73 *; | [A]WO03033529 (MAX DELBRUECK CENTRUM [DE], et al) [A] 1-2,4-5,14,17 * the whole document * * claim 1 *; | [A]US2004171823 (NADLER STEVEN G [US], et al) [A] 1-2,4-5,14,17 * the whole document * * paragraph [0009] * * page 43; table 2 * * claims 6,9,13 *; | [A] - LEE Y-F ET AL, "Modulation of the retinoic acid-induced cell apoptosis and differentiation by the human TR4 orphan nuclear receptor", BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, ACADEMIC PRESS INC. ORLANDO, FL, US, (20041022), vol. 323, no. 3, ISSN 0006-291X, pages 876 - 883, XP004566393 [A] 1-2,4-5,14,17 * the whole document * * page 881 * * figure 6 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bbrc.2004.08.176 | [A] - INUI S ET AL, "Induction of TR4 orphan receptor by retinoic acid in human HaCaT keratinocytes.", THE JOURNAL OF INVESTIGATIVE DERMATOLOGY APR 1999, (199904), vol. 112, no. 4, ISSN 0022-202X, pages 426 - 431, XP002560655 [A] 1-2,4-5,14,17 * the whole document * * figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1523-1747.1999.00548.x | [A] - KIM E ET AL, "Disruption of TR4 Orphan Nuclear Receptor Reduces the Expression of Liver Apolipoprotein E/C-I/C-ii Gene Cluster", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF BIOLOCHEMICAL BIOLOGISTS, BIRMINGHAM, US, (20031121), vol. 278, no. 47, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 46919 - 46926, XP003007419 [A] 1-2,4-5,14,17 * the whole document * * page 46919, column 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M304088200 | [A] - KORITSCHONER N P ET AL, "The nuclear orphan receptor TR4 promotes proliferation of myeloid progenitor cells", CELL GROWTH AND DIFFERENTIATION, THE ASSOCIATION, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, (20011101), vol. 12, no. 11, ISSN 1044-9523, pages 563 - 572, XP002235923 [A] 1-2,4-5,14,17 * the whole document * * abstract * * page 569, column 1, paragraph 3 * | [A] - LEE Y-F ET AL, "Recent advances in the TR2 and TR4 orphan receptors of the nuclear receptor superfamily", JOURNAL OF STEROID BIOCHEMISTRY AND MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE LTD., OXFORD, GB, (20020101), vol. 81, no. 4-5, ISSN 0960-0760, pages 291 - 308, XP002982626 [A] 1-2,4-5,14,17 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0960-0760(02)00118-8 | [T] - Anonymous, "Antioxidants", (20091215), Wikipedia website, URL: http://en.wikipedia.org/wiki/Antioxidant, (20091216), XP002560656 [T] 1-2,4-5,14,17 * the whole document * | International search | [X]US2003235860 (CHANG CHAWNSHANG [US]); | [X]US2004171823 (NADLER STEVEN G [US], et al); | [Y]US2004248971 (YEH SHUYUAN [US], et al) | [X] - LEE ET AL., "Modulation of the retinoic acid-induced cell apoptosis and differentiation by the human TR4 orphan nuclear receptor", BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. RES. COMM., (2004), vol. 323, pages 876 - 883, XP004566393 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bbrc.2004.08.176 |