EP1974486 - TECHNIQUES FOR DETECTING LOOP-FREE PATHS THAT CROSS ROUTING INFORMATION BOUNDARIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.07.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.07.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.08.2016 [2016/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cisco Technology, Inc. 170 West Tasman Drive San Jose, CA 95134 / US | [2008/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RETANA, Alvaro 9001 Shellwood Ct. Raleigh, North Carolina 27617 / US | 02 /
WHITE, Russell 5900 Copperwood Lande Holly Springs, North Carolina 27540 / US | 03 /
ROY, Abhay 369 Howard Dr Santa Clara, California 95051 / US | 04 /
MIRTORABI, Sina 1566 Vista Club Cir 301 Santa Clara, California 95054 / US | [2011/12] |
Former [2008/40] | 01 /
RENTANA, Alvaro 9001 Shellwood Ct. Raleigh, North Carolina 27617 / US | ||
02 /
WHITE, Russell 5900 Copperwood Lande Holly Springs, North Carolina 27540 / US | |||
03 /
ROY, Abhay 369 Howard Dr Santa Clara, California 95051 / US | |||
04 /
MIRTORABI, Sina 1566 Vista Club Cir 301 Santa Clara, California 95054 / US | Representative(s) | Kazi, Ilya, et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | Kazi, Ilya, et al Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 07756320.3 | 09.01.2007 | [2008/40] | WO2007US60289 | Priority number, date | US20060333221 | 17.01.2006 Original published format: US 333221 | [2008/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007117727 | Date: | 18.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/42] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1974486 | Date: | 01.10.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.10.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 30.10.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.12.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/00, H04L12/26, H04L12/28, H04L12/705, H04L12/715 | [2015/02] | CPC: |
H04L45/18 (EP,US);
H04L45/00 (EP,US);
H04L45/04 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/50] | H04L1/00, H04L12/26, H04L12/28, H04L12/56 | ||
Former IPC [2008/40] | H04J1/16, H04L12/56 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/40] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ERKENNUNG ROUTING-INFORMATIONSGRENZEN ÜBERSCHREITENDER SCHLEIFENFREIER PFADE | [2008/40] | English: | TECHNIQUES FOR DETECTING LOOP-FREE PATHS THAT CROSS ROUTING INFORMATION BOUNDARIES | [2008/40] | French: | TECHNIQUES DE DÉTECTION DE CHEMINS SANS BOUCLE COUPANT DES LIMITES D'INFORMATIONS D'ACHEMINEMENT | [2008/40] | Entry into regional phase | 30.06.2008 | National basic fee paid | 30.06.2008 | Search fee paid | 30.06.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.06.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.06.2008 | Examination requested [2008/40] | 11.06.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.10.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.02.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/34] | 04.04.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2016/34] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.10.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6487167 (SHAIO JACK [US]) [A] 1-25 * column 1, line 61 - column 5, line 27 *; | [A]US2003142680 (OGUCHI NAOKI [JP]) [A] 1-25 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0059] - paragraph [0076] * * claims 11,12 *; | [A] - MURTHY S ET AL, "Loop-free Internet routing using hierarchical routing trees", INFOCOM '97. SIXTEENTH ANNUAL JOINT CONFERENCE OF THE IEEE COMPUTER AN D COMMUNICATIONS SOCIETIES. DRIVING THE INFORMATION REVOLUTION., PROCE EDINGS IEEE KOBE, JAPAN 7-11 APRIL 1997, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, US, (19970407), vol. 1, doi:10.1109/INFCOM.1997.635119, ISBN 978-0-8186-7780-9, pages 101 - 108, XP010252019 [A] 1-25 * page 102, paragraph Section 3 "HIPR" - page 105 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/INFCOM.1997.635119 | International search | [Y]US2003218988 (HAN MIN-HO [KR], et al); | [Y]US2004081154 (KOUVELAS ISIDOR [US]); | [Y]US2004085912 (XU ZHICHEN [US], et al); | [YP]US2006165009 (NGUYEN LUC T [US], et al) |