EP1991149 - SELF CHARGING AIRWAY IMPLANTS AND METHODS OF MAKING AND USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.01.2013 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.01.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.02.2013 [2013/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pavad Medical, Inc. 40539 Encyclopedia Circle Fremont, CA 94538 / US | [2008/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BHAT, Nikhil, D. 2942 Cheswycke Terrace 357 Fremont, California 94536 / US | 02 /
HEGDE, Anant, V. 1115 Silver Maple Lane Hayward, Ca 94544 / US | [2010/03] |
Former [2008/47] | 01 /
BHAT, Nikhil, D. 2942 Cheswycke Terrace 357 Fremont, California 94536 / US | ||
02 /
HEGDE, Anant, V. 36105 Toulouse Street Newark, California 94560 / US | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07757075.2 | 15.02.2007 | [2008/47] | WO2007US62262 | Priority number, date | US20060743308P | 16.02.2006 Original published format: US 743308 P | [2008/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007098375 | Date: | 30.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/35] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1991149 | Date: | 19.11.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.08.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61B18/18 | [2008/47] | CPC: |
A61F5/566 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/47] | Title | German: | SELBSTAUFLADENDE ATEMWEGSIMPLANTATSENSOREN UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG DAFÜR | [2008/47] | English: | SELF CHARGING AIRWAY IMPLANTS AND METHODS OF MAKING AND USING THE SAME | [2008/47] | French: | IMPLANTS AUTO-CHARGEURS POUR VOIES AERIENNES ET PROCEDES POUR LEUR FABRICATION ET LEUR UTILISATION | [2008/47] | Entry into regional phase | 16.09.2008 | National basic fee paid | 16.09.2008 | Search fee paid | 16.09.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.09.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.09.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/47] | 01.09.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/09] | 10.10.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2010 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   08.03.2010 | 28.02.2011 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   29.06.2011 | 29.02.2012 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2005115572 (BROOKS STEPHEN N [US], et al); | [Y]US6721597 (BARDY GUST H [US], et al); | [Y]US6729744 (MAH PAT Y [CN]); | [Y]US2004045555 (NELSON LIONEL M [US], et al) |