Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2024358728 | ![]() | 31.10.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514688581 | 16.04.2015 | US201916265006 | 01.02.2019 | US202418765739 | 08.07.2024 | US201916427621 | 31.05.2019 | US201313954770 | 30.07.2013 | US202017004047 | 27.08.2020 | US202016789777 | 13.02.2020 | US77453206 | 16.02.2006 | US82388806 | 29.08.2006 | US201213453682 | 23.04.2012 | US201916595633 | 08.10.2019 | US202217869351 | 20.07.2022 | US67612007 | 16.02.2007 | US201715599203 | 18.05.2017 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2023008130 | ![]() | 12.01.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514688581 | 16.04.2015 | US201916265006 | 01.02.2019 | US201916427621 | 31.05.2019 | US201313954770 | 30.07.2013 | US202017004047 | 27.08.2020 | US202016789777 | 13.02.2020 | US77453206 | 16.02.2006 | US82388806 | 29.08.2006 | US201213453682 | 23.04.2012 | US201916595633 | 08.10.2019 | US202217869351 | 20.07.2022 | US67612007 | 16.02.2007 | US201715599203 | 18.05.2017 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2021000847 | ![]() | 07.01.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514688581 | 16.04.2015 | US201916265006 | 01.02.2019 | US82388806 | 29.08.2006 | US201916427621 | 31.05.2019 | US201213453682 | 23.04.2012 | US201313954770 | 30.07.2013 | US201916595633 | 08.10.2019 | US202017004047 | 27.08.2020 | US67612007 | 16.02.2007 | US202016789777 | 13.02.2020 | US201715599203 | 18.05.2017 | US77453206 | 16.02.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2020179418 | ![]() | 11.06.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514688581 | 16.04.2015 | US201916265006 | 01.02.2019 | US82388806 | 29.08.2006 | US201916427621 | 31.05.2019 | US201213453682 | 23.04.2012 | US201313954770 | 30.07.2013 | US201916595633 | 08.10.2019 | US67612007 | 16.02.2007 | US202016789777 | 13.02.2020 | US201715599203 | 18.05.2017 | US77453206 | 16.02.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2020046745 | ![]() | 13.02.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514688581 | 16.04.2015 | US201916265006 | 01.02.2019 | US82388806 | 29.08.2006 | US201916427621 | 31.05.2019 | US201213453682 | 23.04.2012 | US201313954770 | 30.07.2013 | US201916595633 | 08.10.2019 | US67612007 | 16.02.2007 | US201715599203 | 18.05.2017 | US77453206 | 16.02.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2019282594 | ![]() | 19.09.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514688581 | 16.04.2015 | US201916265006 | 01.02.2019 | US82388806 | 29.08.2006 | US201916427621 | 31.05.2019 | US201213453682 | 23.04.2012 | US201313954770 | 30.07.2013 | US67612007 | 16.02.2007 | US201715599203 | 18.05.2017 | US77453206 | 16.02.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2019160081 | ![]() | 30.05.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514688581 | 16.04.2015 | US201916265006 | 01.02.2019 | US82388806 | 29.08.2006 | US201213453682 | 23.04.2012 | US201313954770 | 30.07.2013 | US67612007 | 16.02.2007 | US201715599203 | 18.05.2017 | US77453206 | 16.02.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2017258819 | ![]() | 14.09.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514688581 | 16.04.2015 | US82388806 | 29.08.2006 | US201213453682 | 23.04.2012 | US201313954770 | 30.07.2013 | US67612007 | 16.02.2007 | US201715599203 | 18.05.2017 | US77453206 | 16.02.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9682092 | ![]() | 20.06.2017 | B2 | US2015216885 | 06.08.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514688581 | 16.04.2015 | US82388806 | 29.08.2006 | US201213453682 | 23.04.2012 | US201313954770 | 30.07.2013 | US67612007 | 16.02.2007 | US77453206 | 16.02.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9029353 | ![]() | 12.05.2015 | B2 | US2013316979 | 28.11.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US82388806 | 29.08.2006 | US201213453682 | 23.04.2012 | US201313954770 | 30.07.2013 | US67612007 | 16.02.2007 | US77453206 | 16.02.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8501712 | ![]() | 06.08.2013 | B2 | US2012264714 | 18.10.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US82388806 | 29.08.2006 | US201213453682 | 23.04.2012 | US67612007 | 16.02.2007 | US77453206 | 16.02.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8168614 | ![]() | 01.05.2012 | B2 | US2007293457 | 20.12.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US82388806 | 29.08.2006 | US67612007 | 16.02.2007 | US77453206 | 16.02.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20150113219 | ![]() | 07.10.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US82388806 | 29.08.2006 | WO2007US62350 | 16.02.2007 | US77453206 | 16.02.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20150013941 | ![]() | 05.02.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US82388806 | 29.08.2006 | WO2007US62350 | 16.02.2007 | US77453206 | 16.02.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20140082842 | ![]() | 02.07.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US82388806 | 29.08.2006 | WO2007US62350 | 16.02.2007 | US77453206 | 16.02.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20130120552 | ![]() | 04.11.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US82388806 | 29.08.2006 | WO2007US62350 | 16.02.2007 | US77453206 | 16.02.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101819869B | ![]() | 17.01.2018 | B1 | KR20170012570 | 02.02.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US82388806 | 29.08.2006 | WO2007US62350 | 16.02.2007 | US77453206 | 16.02.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101622870B | ![]() | 19.05.2016 | B1 | KR20150004937 | 13.01.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US82388806 | 29.08.2006 | WO2007US62350 | 16.02.2007 | US77453206 | 16.02.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5419466B | ![]() | 19.02.2014 | B2 | JP2009531292 | 03.09.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US82388806 | 29.08.2006 | WO2007US62350 | 16.02.2007 | US77453206 | 16.02.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL241792 | ![]() | 29.08.2019 | B | Priority number | Date | US82388806 | 29.08.2006 | WO2007US62350 | 16.02.2007 | US77453206 | 16.02.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2719388 | ![]() | 10.04.2019 | B1 | EP2719388 | 16.04.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP07757149 | 16.02.2007 | US82388806 | 29.08.2006 | WO2007US62350 | 16.02.2007 | US77453206 | 16.02.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2642583 | ![]() | 23.08.2016 | C | CA2642583 | 23.08.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US82388806 | 29.08.2006 | WO2007US62350 | 16.02.2007 | US77453206 | 16.02.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2007214421B | ![]() | 29.11.2012 | B2 | AU2007214421 | 23.08.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US82388806 | 29.08.2006 | WO2007US62350 | 16.02.2007 | US77453206 | 16.02.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1988779 | ![]() | 24.06.2015 | B1 | EP1988779 | 22.12.2010 | A4 | EP1988779 | 12.11.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US82388806 | 29.08.2006 | WO2007US62350 | 16.02.2007 | US77453206 | 16.02.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0708051 | 17.05.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US82388806 | 29.08.2006 | WO2007US62350 | 16.02.2007 | US77453206 | 16.02.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2933994 | 23.08.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CA2642583 | 16.02.2007 | US82388806 | 29.08.2006 | US77453206 | 16.02.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101420854B | 07.08.2013 | B | CN101420854 | 29.04.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US82388806 | 29.08.2006 | WO2007US62350 | 16.02.2007 | US77453206 | 16.02.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103479654B | 09.02.2018 | B | CN103479654 | 01.01.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | CN200780013339 | 16.02.2007 | US82388806 | 29.08.2006 | US77453206 | 16.02.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CY1116817T | 15.03.2017 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP07757149 | 16.02.2007 | US82388806 | 29.08.2006 | US77453206 | 16.02.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CY1121899T | 14.10.2020 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP07757149 | 16.02.2007 | US82388806 | 29.08.2006 | WO2007US62350 | 16.02.2007 | US77453206 | 16.02.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK1988779T | 10.10.2016 | T5 | DK1988779T | 13.07.2015 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US82388806 | 29.08.2006 | WO2007US62350 | 16.02.2007 | US77453206 | 16.02.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK2719388T | 13.05.2019 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP07757149 | 16.02.2007 | US82388806 | 29.08.2006 | US77453206 | 16.02.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2542342T | 04.08.2015 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US82388806 | 29.08.2006 | WO2007US62350 | 16.02.2007 | US77453206 | 16.02.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1121344 | 24.04.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US82388806 | 29.08.2006 | WO2007US62350 | 16.02.2007 | US77453206 | 16.02.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HRP20150710T | 14.08.2015 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP07757149 | 16.02.2007 | US82388806 | 29.08.2006 | WO2007US62350 | 16.02.2007 | US77453206 | 16.02.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL193230 | 29.10.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US82388806 | 29.08.2006 | WO2007US62350 | 16.02.2007 | US77453206 | 16.02.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ME02188 | 20.02.2016 | B | Priority number | Date | EP07757149 | 16.02.2007 | US82388806 | 29.08.2006 | WO2007US62350 | 16.02.2007 | US77453206 | 16.02.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2008010381 | 05.03.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US82388806 | 29.08.2006 | WO2007US62350 | 16.02.2007 | US77453206 | 16.02.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX360301 | 29.10.2018 | B | Priority number | Date | US82388806 | 29.08.2006 | WO2007US62350 | 16.02.2007 | US77453206 | 16.02.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ570257 | 25.11.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US82388806 | 29.08.2006 | WO2007US62350 | 16.02.2007 | US77453206 | 16.02.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL1988779T | 30.10.2015 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP07757149 | 16.02.2007 | US82388806 | 29.08.2006 | WO2007US62350 | 16.02.2007 | US77453206 | 16.02.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL2719388T | 29.11.2019 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP07757149 | 16.02.2007 | US82388806 | 29.08.2006 | EP13179945 | 16.02.2007 | WO2007US62350 | 16.02.2007 | US77453206 | 16.02.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | RS54108 | 31.12.2015 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US82388806 | 29.08.2006 | WO2007US62350 | 16.02.2007 | US77453206 | 16.02.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2508113 | 27.02.2014 | C2 | RU2008137086 | 27.03.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | US82388806 | 29.08.2006 | WO2007US62350 | 16.02.2007 | US77453206 | 16.02.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | SI1988779T | 31.08.2015 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP07757149 | 16.02.2007 | US82388806 | 29.08.2006 | WO2007US62350 | 16.02.2007 | US77453206 | 16.02.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | SI2719388T | 28.06.2019 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US82388806 | 29.08.2006 | EP13179945 | 16.02.2007 | US77453206 | 16.02.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA200806754 | 28.05.2014 | B | Priority number | Date | US82388806 | 29.08.2006 | WO2007US62350 | 16.02.2007 | US77453206 | 16.02.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007095638 | ![]() | 31.07.2008 | A3 | WO2007095638 | 23.08.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US82388806 | 29.08.2006 | US77453206 | 16.02.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20080110751 | ![]() | 19.12.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US82388806 | 29.08.2006 | US77453206 | 16.02.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6266708B | ![]() | 24.01.2018 | B2 | JP2016190865 | 10.11.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US82388806 | 29.08.2006 | US77453206 | 16.02.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2015147795 | ![]() | 20.08.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US82388806 | 29.08.2006 | US77453206 | 16.02.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2013253097 | ![]() | 19.12.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US82388806 | 29.08.2006 | US77453206 | 16.02.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2728455T | 24.10.2019 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US82388806 | 29.08.2006 | US77453206 | 16.02.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HUE025048T | 28.01.2016 | T2 | Priority number | Date | US82388806 | 29.08.2006 | US77453206 | 16.02.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HUE044941T | 28.11.2019 | T2 | Priority number | Date | US82388806 | 29.08.2006 | US77453206 | 16.02.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT1988779E | 04.09.2015 | E | Priority number | Date | US82388806 | 29.08.2006 | US77453206 | 16.02.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT2719388T | 11.06.2019 | T | Priority number | Date | US82388806 | 29.08.2006 | US77453206 | 16.02.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2642628 | 25.01.2018 | C2 | RU2013152132 | 27.05.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US82388806 | 29.08.2006 | US77453206 | 16.02.2006 | Type | ![]() | EP2719388 |