EP1996736 - METHOD OF MAKING STEEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.01.2016 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.02.2016 [2016/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nucor Corporation 1915 Rexford Road Charlotte, NC 28211 / US | [2008/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MANNING, Christopher, P. 1354B Cassidy Court Mount Pleasant, SC 29464 / US | [2008/49] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/49] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07757181.8 | 19.02.2007 | [2008/49] | WO2007US62386 | Priority number, date | US20060307744 | 20.02.2006 Original published format: US 307744 | [2008/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007098429 | Date: | 30.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/35] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1996736 | Date: | 03.12.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.08.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 18.12.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C21C7/04 | [2008/49] | CPC: |
C21C7/04 (EP,US);
C21C2007/0062 (EP,US);
Y02P10/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/49] | Extension states | AL | 16.09.2008 | BA | 16.09.2008 | HR | 16.09.2008 | MK | 16.09.2008 | RS | 16.09.2008 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR STAHLHERSTELLUNG | [2008/49] | English: | METHOD OF MAKING STEEL | [2008/49] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'ACIER | [2008/49] | Entry into regional phase | 16.09.2008 | National basic fee paid | 16.09.2008 | Search fee paid | 16.09.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.09.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/49] | 09.05.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.09.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/06] | 29.09.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/06] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 09.05.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 09.05.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.05.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2013 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   12.04.2013 | 28.02.2015 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2376998 (FULTON WILLIAM J) [A] 1-26 * column 1, line 50 - column 2, line 31 * * page 3, line 11 - line 24 ** page 4, line 10 - line 27 *; | [X]CA1158865 (HOWELL PHILLIP C) [X] 1-26 * abstract * * page 3, line 4 - page 7, line 37 * * page 8, line 2 - line 5 * * claim 1 * * figure 1 * | International search | [Y]US2376998 (FULTON WILLIAM J); | [Y] - SCHAUWINHOLD ET AL., Steel: In Ullmann's Encyclopedia of Industrial Chemistry, (20000615), pages 1 - 68 | [Y] - DAHL ET AL., "Roll-press briquetting helps lows producer retain perviously wasted fines as valuable product", POWDER HANDLING AND PROCESSING, (19931224), vol. 13, no. 2, pages 1 - 14, XP008130605 | [Y] - KOMAREK R., "Roll-press briquetting can help lime producers improve materials handling", MINING ENGINEERING, (19931224), pages 1 - 4, XP008130606 |