EP1991982 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR INDIRECT IMAGE DATA CONVERSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 04.09.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.09.2015 | Refusal of application | published on 07.10.2015 [2015/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Texas Instruments Incorporated P.O. Box 655474 Mail Station 3999 Dallas, TX 75265-5474 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Texas Instruments Incorporated P.O. Box 655474 Mail Station 3999 Dallas, Texas 75265-5474 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAJAN, Narendran, Melethil Melethil House Menagalam, Wadakkancherry (po) Thrissor (dist) Kerala 680623 / IN | 02 /
JAYARAMAN, Raghuram, Karthik 31-a, Thilak Street, R.s. Puram. Coimbatore, Taminadu 641002 / IN | 03 /
SHAKUNTALA, Prabhavathy 402, Mayur Paradise 25, Rama Temple Street New Tippasandra Road Bangalore 75 / IN | [2008/47] | Representative(s) | Holt, Michael, et al Texas Instruments Limited Suite 31 West Devon Business Park Brook Lane Tavistock PL19 9DP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/18] | Holt, Michael Texas Instruments Limited 3rd Floor 401 Grafton Gate Milton Keynes MK91AQ / GB | ||
Former [2008/47] | Holt, Michael Texas Instruments Limited European Patents Department 800 Pavilion Drive Northampton NN4 7YL / GB | Application number, filing date | 07757598.3 | 28.02.2007 | [2008/47] | WO2007US62931 | Priority number, date | US20060365144 | 28.02.2006 Original published format: US 365144 | [2008/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007101231 | Date: | 07.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/36] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1991982 | Date: | 19.11.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.09.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.01.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.08.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/64, G09G5/02, H04N9/67 | [2011/38] | CPC: |
G09G5/02 (EP,US);
H04N9/67 (US);
H04N1/646 (EP,US);
H04N23/85 (EP);
G09G2340/06 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/47] | G09G5/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2009/15] |
Former [2008/47] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN FÜR DIE INDIREKTE BILDDATENUMWANDLUNG | [2008/47] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR INDIRECT IMAGE DATA CONVERSION | [2008/47] | French: | SYSTEMES ET PROCEDES DE CONVERSION INDIRECTE DE DONNEES D'IMAGE | [2008/47] | Entry into regional phase | 29.09.2008 | National basic fee paid | 29.09.2008 | Search fee paid | 29.09.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.09.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/47] | 30.09.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 13.11.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 05.07.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.12.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 12.02.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.2015 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2015/41] | 07.05.2015 | Date of oral proceedings | 20.05.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2015/41] | 20.05.2015 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.04.2013 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 12.02.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 12.02.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.02.2014 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 05.07.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 05.07.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.07.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I] - CHIN CHYE KOH ET AL, "Compression of bayer color filter array data", PROCEEDINGS 2003 INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON IMAGE PROCESSING (CAT. NO.03CH37429), BARCELONA, SPAIN, 14-17 SEPT. 2003; [INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON IMAGE PROCESSING], IEEE PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20030914), vol. 2, ISBN 978-0-7803-7750-9, pages 255 - 258, XP010670091 [I] 1-10 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US6774943 (KAO SOPHIA WEI-CHUN [US], et al); | [X]US2005286778 (ATSUMI EIJI [JP]) |