EP1996021 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS TO TREAT DISEASES CHARACTERIZED BY CELLULAR PROLIFERATION AND ANGIOGENESIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.10.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.11.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.02.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, PT | published on 08.07.2020 [2020/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Paloma Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 2150 East Lake Cook Road, Suite 750 Buffalo Grove, IL 60089 / US | [2015/21] |
Former [2008/49] | For all designated states Paloma Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 37 Neillian Crescent Jamaica Plain, MA 02130 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHERRIS, David, I. c/o Paloma Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 2150 East Lake Cook Road Suite 750 Buffalo Grove, IL 60089 / US | 02 /
GILL, Manjinder Niper Campus Sector 67 SAS Nagar Punjab, India 160062 / IN | 03 /
MA, Fupeng 315-1 Oak Grove Avenue Melrose, MA 02176 / US | 04 /
KAUR BHAL, Sanjivanjit 448 Maple Avenue Oakville, ON L6J 2J3 / CA | 05 /
FEHER, Miklos 229 West 60th Street Apartment 22M New York NY 10023 / US | 06 /
REDDEN, Peter 1273 Parkhurst Drive Oakville, Ontario, L6M 3X3 / CA | 07 /
SCHMIDT, Jonathan 112 Wellington Road 7 Elora, Ontario N0B 1S0 / CA | 08 /
DUNN-DUFAULT, Robert 30 Marksam Road Guelph, Ontario, N1H 1X2 / CA | [2017/50] |
Former [2015/44] | 01 /
SHERRIS, David, I. c/o Paloma Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 2150 East Lake Cook Road Suite 750 Buffalo Grove, IL 60089 / US | ||
02 /
GILL, Manjinder Niper Campus Sector 67 SAS Nagar Punjab, India 160062 / IN | |||
03 /
MA, Fupeng 315-1 Oak Grove Avenue Melrose, MA 02176 / US | |||
04 /
KAUR BHAL, Sanjivanjit 448 Maple Avenue Oakville, ON L6J 2J3 / CA | |||
05 /
FEHER, Miklos 229 West 60th Street Apartment 22M New York NY 10023 / US | |||
06 /
REDDEN, Peter 1273 Parkhurst Drive Oakville Ontario, L6M 3X3 / CA | |||
07 /
SCHMIDT, Jonathan 112 Wellington Road 7 Elora Ontario N0B 1S0 / CA | |||
08 /
DUNN-DUFAULT, Robert 30 Marksam Road Guelph Ontario, N1H 1X2 / CA | |||
Former [2015/21] | 01 /
SHERRIS, David, I. c/o Paloma Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 2150 East Lake Cook Road Suite 750 Buffalo Grove, IL 60089 / US | ||
Former [2008/49] | 01 /
SHERRIS, David, I. c/o Paloma Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 37 Neillian Crescent Jamaica Plain, Massachusetts 02130 / US | Representative(s) | FRKelly Waterways House Grand Canal Quay Dublin D02 PD39 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/50] | FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Dublin D04 F838 / IE | ||
Former [2008/49] | Jennings, Tara Romaine, et al F. R. Kelly & Co. 27 Clyde Road Ballsbridge Dublin 4 / IE | Application number, filing date | 07757634.6 | 28.02.2007 | [2008/49] | WO2007US62971 | Priority number, date | US20060777318P | 28.02.2006 Original published format: US 777318 P | US20060412618 | 27.04.2006 Original published format: US 412618 | [2008/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007101247 | Date: | 07.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/36] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1996021 | Date: | 03.12.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.09.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1996021 | Date: | 13.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 13.12.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/35, A01N43/16, A61K31/352, A61K31/353, A61K31/366, A61K31/382, A61K31/473, A61K31/517, C07D311/16, C07D311/18, C07D311/80, A61P35/00 | [2016/42] | CPC: |
C07D311/80 (EP,US);
A61K31/192 (EP,US);
A61K31/235 (EP,US);
A61K31/352 (EP,US);
A61K31/353 (EP,US);
A61K31/366 (EP,US);
A61K31/382 (EP,US);
A61K31/4433 (EP,US);
A61K31/473 (EP,US);
A61K31/517 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P15/08 (EP);
A61P15/12 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P17/04 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P19/06 (EP);
A61P19/10 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/02 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/10 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P31/18 (EP);
A61P33/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P5/00 (EP);
A61P7/00 (EP);
A61P7/06 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
C07C65/40 (US);
C07C69/78 (US);
C07D239/90 (EP,US);
C07D311/16 (EP,US);
C07D311/18 (EP,US);
C07D405/06 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/352, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/353, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/366, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/473, A61K2300/00 (US,EP); |
Former IPC [2016/39] | A61K31/35, A01N43/16, A61K31/352, A61K31/353, A61K31/366, A61K31/382, A61K31/473, A61K31/517, C07D311/16, C07D311/18, C07D311/80 | ||
Former IPC [2010/11] | A61K31/35, A01N43/16, A61K31/352 | ||
Former IPC [2008/49] | A01N43/16, A61K31/35 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/50] |
Former [2008/49] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON DURCH ZELLULÄRE PROLIFERATION UND ANGIOGENESE VERMITTELTEN LEIDEN | [2008/49] | English: | COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS TO TREAT DISEASES CHARACTERIZED BY CELLULAR PROLIFERATION AND ANGIOGENESIS | [2008/49] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ET MÉTHODES DE TRAITEMENT DE MALADIES CARACTÉRISÉES PAR LA PROLIFÉRATION CELLULAIRE ET L'ANGIOGENÈSE | [2008/49] | Entry into regional phase | 29.09.2008 | National basic fee paid | 29.09.2008 | Search fee paid | 29.09.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.09.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.09.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/49] | 14.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.04.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.08.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.02.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.11.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.04.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.08.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.02.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.01.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 24.02.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.08.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 23.10.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 23.10.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.10.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP12171834.0 / EP2543371 | EP12171847.2 / EP2543367 | EP12171867.0 / EP2545913 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.06.2010 | Opposition(s) | 14.09.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/47] | Request for further processing for: | 23.10.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 23.10.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.11.2017 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 23.10.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 23.10.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.11.2017 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 07.04.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 07.04.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.04.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 13.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.02.2007 | AT | 13.12.2017 | CY | 13.12.2017 | CZ | 13.12.2017 | DK | 13.12.2017 | EE | 13.12.2017 | ES | 13.12.2017 | FI | 13.12.2017 | IT | 13.12.2017 | LT | 13.12.2017 | LV | 13.12.2017 | MC | 13.12.2017 | NL | 13.12.2017 | PL | 13.12.2017 | PT | 13.12.2017 | RO | 13.12.2017 | SE | 13.12.2017 | SI | 13.12.2017 | SK | 13.12.2017 | TR | 13.12.2017 | BE | 28.02.2018 | LU | 28.02.2018 | BG | 13.03.2018 | GR | 14.03.2018 | IS | 13.04.2018 | [2020/27] |
Former [2020/16] | AT | 13.12.2017 | |
CY | 13.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
DK | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
ES | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
IT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MC | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RO | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SI | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
TR | 13.12.2017 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
LU | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 13.12.2017 | |
CY | 13.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
DK | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
ES | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
IT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MC | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RO | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SI | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
LU | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 13.12.2017 | |
CY | 13.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
DK | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
ES | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
IT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MC | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RO | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
LU | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AT | 13.12.2017 | |
CY | 13.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
DK | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
ES | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
IT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MC | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RO | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/44] | AT | 13.12.2017 | |
CY | 13.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
ES | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
IT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MC | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RO | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 13.12.2017 | |
CY | 13.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
ES | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
IT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RO | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 13.12.2017 | |
CY | 13.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
ES | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
IT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/38] | AT | 13.12.2017 | |
CY | 13.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
ES | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 13.12.2017 | |
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
ES | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/34] | FI | 13.12.2017 | |
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | FI | 13.12.2017 | |
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | FI | 13.12.2017 | |
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | FI | 13.12.2017 | |
LT | 13.12.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2002115711 (SCHMIDT JOHNATHAN MARTIN [CA], et al) [X] 1-15 * 0001; 0007; 0010; claim 1, claim 4; example 3; 0039; 0046 *; | [PX]US2006257337 (SHERRIS DAVID [US]) [PX] 1-15 * example 1; table II; claim 7 *; | [X] - SCHMIDT J M ET AL, "Synthesis and evaluation of a novel nonsteroidal-specific endothelial cell proliferation inhibitor", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY 20030410 US, (20030410), vol. 46, no. 8, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 1289 - 1292, XP002563534 [X] 1-15 * compounds 9a, 10; scheme 2; last of p. 1289 to second of p. 1290; penultimate of section "conclusion" on p. 1291 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm034007d | [X] - KENNER, G. W.; MURRAY, M. A.; TYLOR, C. M. B., "Oxidative cyclization of 2-biphenylcarboxylic acid", HCAPLUS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (1958), Database accession no. 1958:1811, URL: STN, XP002563536 [X] 1,5 * the whole document * | [X] - FARINA, VITTORIO ET AL, "The Stille reaction", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 2008:1383562, URL: STN, XP002563537 [X] 1,5 * abstract * | [X] - ADAMS, ROGER ET AL, "Structure of cannabinol. I. Preparation of an isomer, 3-hydroxy-1-amyl-6,6,9-trimethyl-6-dibenzopyran", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 1940:43275, URL: STN, XP002563538 [X] 1,5 * abstract * | [X] - AOYAMA, NORIHITO; TAKENAKA, HIDEKI; MIIKE, AKIRA, "Coumarin derivatives for quantitative determination of peroxidation-active substances by chemiluminescence analysis", HCAPLUS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (19930805), Database accession no. 1993:577137, URL: STN, XP002563539 [X] 1,5 * the whole document * | [X] - RIGAUDY, JEAN ET AL, "Dehydration of meso-dihydroanthracene alcohols. 9,10-Dihydro-9-anthryl tertiary carbinols. A case of elimination (of water) according to Hofmann's rule", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 1958:11057, URL: STN, XP002563540 [X] 1,5 * abstract * | [X] - GARAZD, YA. L. ET AL, "Modified Coumarins. 6. Synthesis of Substituted 5,6-Benzopsoralens", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 2003:73980, URL: STN, XP002563541 [X] 1,5 * abstract * | [PA] - LARROSA MAR ET AL, "Urolithins, ellagic acid-derived metabolites produced by human colonic microflora, exhibit estrogenic and antiestrogenic activities.", JOURNAL OF AGRICULTURAL AND FOOD CHEMISTRY 8 MAR 2006, (20060308), vol. 54, no. 5, ISSN 0021-8561, pages 1611 - 1620, XP002563535 [PA] 1-15 * fig. 3; p. 1615, col. 2 to p. 1616, col. 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jf0527403 | International search | [X]US2005245490 (PINNEY KEVIN G [US], et al); | [X]US2004242593 (MOORE BOB M [US], et al); | [X]US6849757 (KAWAI MEGUMI [US], et al); | [Y]US2004198750 (GREEN JEREMY [US], et al); | [Y]US6908917 (ORTWINE DANIEL FRED [US]) | Examination | DE2459076 | - NOVAROLI ET AL, "Human recombinant monoamine oxidase B as reliable and efficient enzyme source for inhibitor screening", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, PERGAMON, GB, (20051115), vol. 13, no. 22, doi:10.1016/J.BMC.2005.06.043, ISSN 0968-0896, pages 6212 - 6217, XP005098160 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bmc.2005.06.043 | by applicant | US2002115711 | - SCHMIDT J M ET AL., "Synthesis and evaluation of a novel nonsteroidal-specific endothelial cell proliferation inhibitor", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY 20030410 US, (20030410), vol. 46, no. 8, pages 1289 - 1292 | - Remington's Pharmaceuticals Sciences |