EP1998631 - PLANT-DERIVED PROTEIN COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.06.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.06.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.07.2010 [2010/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Specialty Protein Producers, LLC 4 One Green Plant P.O. 456 South Sioux City NE 68776 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | For all designated states Speciality Protein Producers, LLC 4 One Green Plant P.O. 456 South Sioux City NE 68776 / US | ||
Former [2008/50] | For all designated states Specialty Protein Producers, Inc. 200 West Grand Avenue, Suite B Port Washington, WI 53074 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CRANK, Donald, L. 707 Lake Street Alexandria, MN 56308 / US | [2008/50] | Representative(s) | Kremer, Simon Mark, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/50] | Kremer, Simon Mark, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House, 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 07757793.0 | 02.03.2007 | [2008/50] | WO2007US63174 | Priority number, date | US20060779108P | 03.03.2006 Original published format: US 779108 P | [2008/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007103785 | Date: | 13.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/37] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1998631 | Date: | 10.12.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.09.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A23J1/00, A23J1/14, A23J3/14, A23J3/16, A23L1/314, A23L1/317 | [2008/50] | CPC: |
A23C11/103 (EP,US);
A23C11/106 (EP,US);
A23J1/14 (EP,US);
A23J3/16 (EP,US);
A23L11/05 (EP,US);
A23L11/65 (EP,US);
A23L13/426 (EP,US);
A23L13/67 (EP,US);
A23L2/66 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A23V2002/00, A23V2300/46 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/50] | Extension states | AL | 25.09.2008 | BA | 25.09.2008 | HR | 25.09.2008 | MK | 25.09.2008 | RS | 25.09.2008 | Title | German: | AUS PFLANZEN GEWONNENE PROTEINZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [2008/50] | English: | PLANT-DERIVED PROTEIN COMPOSITIONS | [2008/50] | French: | COMPOSITIONS À BASE DE PROTÉINES D'ORIGINE VÉGÉTALE | [2008/50] | Entry into regional phase | 25.09.2008 | National basic fee paid | 25.09.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.09.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.09.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/50] | 26.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.01.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/29] | 15.02.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3966982 (BECKER KENNETH W, et al) [A] 1-25 * claims 1,3,10 * * column 3, line 30 - line 46 *; | [XA]US4493854 (FRIEDRICH JOHN P [US], et al) [X] 3-25 * claims 1-3,7-12 * * example - * * column 2, line 41 - column 3, line 1 * * column 1, line 8 - line 40 * * column 4, line 6 - line 18 * [A] 1,2; | [A]US5290959 (RICE WAYNE K [US]) [A] 1-25 * claims 1,3-5,7-10 * * examples 2-12,18,39 * * column 7, line 20 - column 9, line 12 * * figure - * * column 2, line 32 - line 50 *; | [PA]WO2006047308 (UNIV IOWA STATE RES FOUND INC [US], et al) [PA] 1-25 * claims 1,21,23,33 * * figure 5 ** page 11, paragraph 4 - page 12, paragraph 1 *; | [PA]WO2006099412 (CROWN IRON WORKS CO [US], et al) [PA] 1-25 * claim - * * figure . * * example - * * page 1, line 8 - line 22 * * page 5, line 18 - page 6, line 29 * * page 8, line 24 - page 10, line 11 * * page 11, line 9 - line 20 * |