EP1991706 - MICRORNA EXPRESSION PROFILE ASSOCIATED WITH PANCREATIC CANCER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.11.2014 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Ohio State University Research Foundation 1524 North High Street Columbus, OH 43201-1063 / US | For all designated states The Board of Regents of the University of Oklahoma 660 Parrington Oval Norman, OK 73019 / US | [2013/30] |
Former [2013/22] | For all designated states The Ohio State University Research Foundation 1524 North High Street Columbus, OH 43201-1063 / US | ||
For all designated states Brackett, Daniel J. 2812 William Blvd. Seminole, OK 74868 / US | |||
Former [2012/24] | For all designated states The Ohio State University 1524 North High Street Columbus, OH 43201 / US | ||
Former [2011/02] | For all designated states The Ohio State University 1960 Kenny Road Columbus, OH 43210 / US | ||
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states THE OHIO STATE UNIVERSITY RESEARCH FOUNDATION 1960 Kenny Road Columbus Ohio 43120 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHMITTGEN, Thomas, D. 93 Alberry Drive Granville, OH 43023 / US | 02 /
BRACKETT, Daniel, J. 2812 William Blvd. Seminole, OK 74868 / US | [2008/47] | Representative(s) | Denison, Christopher Marcus, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/03] | Denison, Christopher Marcus, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | ||
Former [2008/47] | Denison, Christopher Marcus, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 07757822.7 | 02.03.2007 | [2008/47] | WO2007US63208 | Priority number, date | US20060778271P | 02.03.2006 Original published format: US 778271 P | [2008/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007103808 | Date: | 13.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/37] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1991706 | Date: | 19.11.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.09.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1991706 | Date: | 15.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 28.02.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68, C07H21/02 | [2008/47] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6886 (EP,US);
C12Q1/686 (US);
A61P1/18 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/04 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C12Q1/6813 (US);
C12Q1/6869 (US);
C12Q2600/136 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/178 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/47] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MIKRO-RNA-EXPRESSIONSPROFIL IM ZUSAMMENHANG MIT BAUCHSPEICHELDRÜSENKREBS | [2008/47] | English: | MICRORNA EXPRESSION PROFILE ASSOCIATED WITH PANCREATIC CANCER | [2008/47] | French: | PROFIL D'EXPRESSION DE MICRO-ARN ASSOCIÉ AU CANCER DU PANCRÉAS | [2008/47] | Entry into regional phase | 19.09.2008 | National basic fee paid | 19.09.2008 | Search fee paid | 19.09.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.09.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/47] | 20.11.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.12.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.08.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.03.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.03.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 30.04.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.05.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 06.06.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.08.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.12.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 09.12.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP12168648.9 / EP2522746 | EP12168652.1 / EP2522747 | EP12168654.7 / EP2522748 | EP12168655.4 / EP2522749 | EP12168656.2 / EP2522750 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.05.2010 | Opposition(s) | 16.10.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.03.2007 | AT | 15.01.2014 | BE | 15.01.2014 | BG | 15.01.2014 | CY | 15.01.2014 | CZ | 15.01.2014 | DK | 15.01.2014 | EE | 15.01.2014 | FI | 15.01.2014 | LT | 15.01.2014 | LV | 15.01.2014 | MC | 15.01.2014 | MT | 15.01.2014 | NL | 15.01.2014 | PL | 15.01.2014 | RO | 15.01.2014 | SE | 15.01.2014 | SI | 15.01.2014 | SK | 15.01.2014 | TR | 15.01.2014 | IE | 02.03.2014 | LU | 02.03.2014 | CH | 31.03.2014 | LI | 31.03.2014 | GR | 16.04.2014 | IS | 15.05.2014 | PT | 15.05.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 02.03.2007 | |
AT | 15.01.2014 | ||
BE | 15.01.2014 | ||
BG | 15.01.2014 | ||
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
MC | 15.01.2014 | ||
MT | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
PL | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
SI | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
IE | 02.03.2014 | ||
LU | 02.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
GR | 16.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 15.01.2014 | |
BE | 15.01.2014 | ||
BG | 15.01.2014 | ||
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
MC | 15.01.2014 | ||
MT | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
PL | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
SI | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
IE | 02.03.2014 | ||
LU | 02.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
GR | 16.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/27] | AT | 15.01.2014 | |
BE | 15.01.2014 | ||
BG | 15.01.2014 | ||
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
MC | 15.01.2014 | ||
MT | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
PL | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
SI | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
IE | 02.03.2014 | ||
LU | 02.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 15.01.2014 | |
BE | 15.01.2014 | ||
BG | 15.01.2014 | ||
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
MT | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
PL | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
SI | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
IE | 02.03.2014 | ||
LU | 02.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 15.01.2014 | |
BE | 15.01.2014 | ||
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
MT | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
PL | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
SI | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
IE | 02.03.2014 | ||
LU | 02.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 15.01.2014 | |
BE | 15.01.2014 | ||
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
PL | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
SI | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
IE | 02.03.2014 | ||
LU | 02.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 15.01.2014 | |
BE | 15.01.2014 | ||
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
PL | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
IE | 02.03.2014 | ||
LU | 02.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/07] | AT | 15.01.2014 | |
BE | 15.01.2014 | ||
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
PL | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
IE | 02.03.2014 | ||
LU | 02.03.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | AT | 15.01.2014 | |
BE | 15.01.2014 | ||
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
PL | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
LU | 02.03.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | AT | 15.01.2014 | |
BE | 15.01.2014 | ||
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
LU | 02.03.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 15.01.2014 | |
BE | 15.01.2014 | ||
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
LU | 02.03.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 15.01.2014 | |
BE | 15.01.2014 | ||
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/39] | AT | 15.01.2014 | |
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 15.01.2014 | |
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 15.01.2014 | |
IS | 15.05.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2005078139 (UNIV JEFFERSON [US], et al) [X] 1-15* see whole doc. esp. claims *; | [E]WO2007081680 (UNIV OHIO STATE RES FOUND [US], et al) [E] 1-15 * see whole doc. esp. claims and Table 3 * | International search | [A]US2006019286 (HORVITZ H R [US], et al); | [XP]US2006105360 (CROCE CARLO M [US], et al); | [X] - JIANG J. ET AL., "Real-time expression profiling of microRNA precursors in human cancer cell lines", NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (20050928), vol. 33, no. 7, pages 5394 - 5403, XP002529938 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/gki863 | [A] - VOLINIA S. ET AL., "A microRNA expression signature of human solid tumors defines cancer gene targets", PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (20060214), vol. 103, no. 7, pages 2257 - 2261, XP002608380 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/PNAS.0510565103 | [XP] - ROLDO C. ET AL., "MicroRNA expression abnormalities in pancreatic endocrine and acinar tumors are associated with distinctive pathologie: features and clinical behavior", J. CLIN. ONCOL., (20061010), vol. 24, no. 29, pages 4677 - 4684, XP008078235 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1200/JCO.2005.05.5194 | by applicant | US4235871 | US4501728 | US4837028 | US4920016 | US4987071 | US5019369 | US5093246 | US5139941 | US5252479 | WO9324641 | WO9413788 | US5427916 | US5849902 | US2002086356 | US2004014113 | WO2004018176 | US2005277139 | US2006078924 | - FUKUSHIMA ET AL., CANCER BIOL THER., (2003), vol. 2, pages 78 - 83 | - ROSTY, C. ET AL., HEMATOL ONCOL CLIN NORTH AM., (2002), vol. 16, pages 37 - 52 | - MATSUBAYASHI, H. ET AL., CLINICAL CANCER RESEARCH, (2005), vol. 11, pages 573 - 583 | - GRONBORG, M. ET AL., JOURNAL OF PROTEOME RESEARCH, (2004), vol. 3, no. 5, pages 1042 - 1055 | - HEID ET AL., "Real time quantitative PCR", GENOME RES., (1996), vol. 10, pages 986 - 994 | - GIBSON ET AL., "A novel method for real time quantitative RT-PCR", GENOME RES., (1996), vol. 10, pages 995 - 1001, XP000642796 | - JIANG, J. ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (2005), vol. 33, pages 5394 - 5403 | - SCHMITTGEN T. D. ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (2004), vol. 32, page E43 | - MA YJ ET AL., "RNase protection assay", METHODS, (1996), vol. 10, pages 273 - 8 | - GRIFFITHS-JONES, S., "The microRNA Registry", NUCLEIC ACIDS RES, (2004), vol. 32, no. 1, doi:doi:10.1093/nar/gkh023, pages D109 - 11, XP002392427 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/gkh023 | - ZENG ET AL., MOLECULAR CELL, (2002), vol. 9, pages 1327 - 1333 | - TUSCHL, NAT. BIOTECHNOL, (2002), vol. 20, pages 446 - 448 | - BRUMMELKAMP ET AL., SCIENCE, (2002), vol. 296, pages 550 - 553 | - MIYAGISHI ET AL., NAT. BIOTECHNOL., (2002), vol. 20, pages 497 - 500 | - PADDISON ET AL., GENES DEV., (2002), vol. 16, pages 948 - 958 | - LEE ET AL., NAT. BIOTECHNOL., (2002), vol. 20, pages 500 - 505 | - PAUL ET AL., NAT. BIOTECHNOL., (2002), vol. 20, pages 505 - 508 | - RABINOWITZ, J.E. ET AL., J. VIROL., (2002), vol. 76, pages 791 - 801 | - DORNBURG, GENE THERAP., (1995), vol. 2, pages 301 - 310 | - EGLITIS, BIOTECHNIQUES, (1988), vol. 6, pages 608 - 614 | - MILLER, HUM. GENE THERAP., (1990), vol. 1, pages 5 - 14 | - ANDERSON, NATURE, (1998), vol. 392, pages 25 - 30 | - XIA ET AL., NAT. BIOTECH., (2002), vol. 20, pages 1006 - 1010 | - SAMULSKI ET AL., J. VIROL., (1987), vol. 61, pages 3096 - 3101 | - FISHER ET AL., J. VIROL., (1996), vol. 70, pages 520 - 532 | - SAMULSKI ET AL., J. VIROL., (1989), vol. 63, pages 3822 - 3826 | - JONES PA; BAYLIN SB, "The fundamental role of epigenetic events in cancer", NAT REV GENET., (2005), vol. 3, pages 415 - 28, XP008042555 | - KRUTZFELDT J ET AL., "Silencing of microRNAs in vivo with 'antagomirs", NATURE, (2005), vol. 438, no. 7068, pages 685 - 9 | - RYLOVA ET AL., CANCER RES, (2002), vol. 62, no. 3, pages 801 - 8 | - SHIM ET AL., INT. J. CANCER, (2001), vol. 94, no. 1, pages 6 - 15 | - MISCHIATI ET AL., INT. J. MOL. MED., (2002), vol. 9, no. 6, pages 633 - 9 | - MORISHITA ET AL., ANN. N Y ACAD. SCI., (2001), vol. 947, pages 294 - 301 | - ANDRATSCHKE ET AL., ANTICANCER RES, (2001), vol. 21, no. 5, pages 3541 - 3550 | - STEIN; CHENG, SCIENCE, (1993), vol. 261, page 1004 | - ROSSI, CURRENT BIOLOGY, (1994), vol. 4, pages 469 - 471 | - WERNER; UHLENBECK, NUCL. ACIDS RES., (1995), vol. 23, pages 2092 - 96 | - HAMMANN ET AL., ANTISENSE AND NUCLEIC ACID DRUG DEV., (1999), vol. 9, pages 25 - 31 | - SZOKA ET AL., ANN. REV. BIOPHYS. BIOENG, (1980), vol. 9, page 467 | - GABIZON ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., (1988), vol. 18, pages 6949 - 53 | - LEE ET AL., INT. J. CANCER, (2006), vol. 120, pages 1046 - 1054 | US20050656109 |