|
21.06.2011 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.05.2011 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.03.2011 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (translations of claims/payment missing) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.09.2010 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.09.2010 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
22.09.2010 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.09.2010 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
26 |
|
21.08.2010 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.08.2010 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
21.08.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.08.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
21.08.2010 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.08.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.08.2010 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.08.2010 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
18.08.2010 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.08.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
18.08.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.08.2010 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.08.2010 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.06.2010 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.06.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.06.2010 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.06.2010 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.2010 |
Communication confirming withdrawal from representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.2010 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.02.2010 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.02.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.02.2010 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.02.2010 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.02.2010 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.02.2010 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.02.2010 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.03.2009 |
Final instructions (loss of partial rights) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.11.2008 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.11.2008 |
Designation deemed to be withdrawn (loss of partial rights) |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.11.2008 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.11.2008 |
Refund order search fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.10.2008 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.10.2008 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
21.10.2008 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
26.09.2008 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
26.09.2008 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.09.2008 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
01.08.2008 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.07.2008 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
03.07.2008 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
03.07.2008 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
6 |
|
03.07.2008 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
6 |
|
03.07.2008 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
03.07.2008 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
03.07.2008 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
03.07.2008 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
07.02.2008 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
07.02.2008 |
International publication of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.02.2008 |
International publication of the international search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.02.2008 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
04.02.2008 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
6 |
|
04.02.2008 |
Reply to International Search Opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
11.12.2007 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
07.12.2007 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
03.12.2007 |
Notification of election of EPO |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.11.2007 |
Annex |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
29.11.2007 |
Annex |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
29.11.2007 |
Annex |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
29.11.2007 |
Annex |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
29.11.2007 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
29.11.2007 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/404 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
15.11.2007 |
Invitation to correct defects in demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
15.11.2007 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
15.11.2007 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
23.10.2007 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
32 |
|
23.10.2007 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
38 |
|
16.10.2007 |
Document concerning fees and payments |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
16.10.2007 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
27.09.2007 |
Published international application - A2 |
Search / examination |
27 |
|
04.05.2007 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
6 |
|
04.05.2007 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
16 |
|
04.05.2007 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
4 |