Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2007216308 | Global Dossier | 20.09.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US37657606 | 16.03.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7288882 | Global Dossier | 30.10.2007 | B1 | US2007216282 | 20.09.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US67825707 | 23.02.2007 | US37657606 | 16.03.2006 | US52254706 | 14.09.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2005462 | Global Dossier | 24.12.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2007US63539 | 08.03.2007 | US37657606 | 16.03.2006 | US52254706 | 14.09.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0707057 | 19.04.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2007US63539 | 08.03.2007 | US37657606 | 16.03.2006 | US52254706 | 14.09.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007109427 | Global Dossier | 20.03.2008 | B1 | WO2007109427 | 07.02.2008 | A3 | WO2007109427 | 27.09.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US37657606 | 16.03.2006 | US52254706 | 14.09.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7625258 | Global Dossier | 01.12.2009 | B2 | US2007216309 | 20.09.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US37657606 | 16.03.2006 | US52254706 | 14.09.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2008140695 | 27.04.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | US37657606 | 16.03.2006 | US52254706 | 14.09.2006 |