25.02.2011 |
Withdrawal of application |
published on 30.03.2011 [2011/13] |
13.08.2010 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 15.09.2010 [2010/37] |
18.03.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.03.2010 |
Change - designated states |
published on 07.04.2010 [2010/14] |
05.03.2010 |
Change - request for examination |
published on 07.04.2010 [2010/14] |
04.03.2010 |
Deletion: PCT data prior to European publication - basic fee paid |
|
04.03.2010 |
Deletion: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.03.2010 |
Deletion: PCT data prior to European publication - search fee paid |
|
04.03.2010 |
New entry: PCT data prior to European publication - basic fee paid |
|
04.03.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.03.2010 |
New entry: PCT data prior to European publication - search fee paid |
|
13.11.2009 |
Change - representative |
published on 16.12.2009 [2009/51] |
10.07.2009 |
Change - extension states |
published on 12.08.2009 [2009/33] |
29.01.2009 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
16.01.2009 |
Change - applicant |
published on 18.02.2009 [2009/08] |
09.01.2009 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 11.02.2009 [2009/07] |
09.01.2009 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 11.02.2009 [2009/07] |
05.01.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.12.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.12.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.12.2008 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
05.12.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.02.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.02.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.11.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.08.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|