|
22.11.2017 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.01.2017 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.12.2016 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.12.2016 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.12.2016 |
Information about intention to grant a patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.12.2016 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.12.2016 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
40 |
|
13.12.2016 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
40 |
|
07.12.2016 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.11.2016 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.11.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.11.2016 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
24.11.2016 |
Description |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
24.11.2016 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.11.2016 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.11.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.11.2016 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.07.2016 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.07.2016 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
26.07.2016 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.07.2016 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
40 |
|
26.07.2016 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
40 |
|
06.04.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.04.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.04.2016 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.04.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.04.2016 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.04.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.04.2016 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.02.2016 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.02.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.02.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.02.2016 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.11.2015 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.11.2015 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.07.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.07.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.07.2015 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.07.2015 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.07.2015 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.07.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.07.2015 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
20.05.2015 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.05.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.05.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.05.2015 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.01.2015 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
20.01.2015 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.09.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.09.2013 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
27.09.2013 |
Description |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
27.09.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.09.2013 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
01.08.2013 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.07.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.07.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.07.2013 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.04.2013 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.04.2013 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.09.2012 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.09.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.09.2012 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.09.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.09.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.09.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.09.2011 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.09.2011 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.12.2008 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.11.2008 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.10.2008 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
13.10.2008 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
13.10.2008 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
01.08.2008 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.07.2008 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.12.2007 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.12.2007 |
International publication of the international search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.10.2007 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
27.09.2007 |
Published international application - A2 |
Search / examination |
40 |