Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9416341 | Global Dossier | 16.08.2016 | B2 | US2007218133 | 20.09.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US68854307 | 20.03.2007 | US78409106 | 20.03.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2007226945B | Global Dossier | 01.09.2011 | B2 | AU2007226945 | 27.09.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2007US64391 | 20.03.2007 | US78409106 | 20.03.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2007868 | Global Dossier | 18.01.2017 | B1 | EP2007868 | 31.12.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2007US64391 | 20.03.2007 | US78409106 | 20.03.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2621573T | 04.07.2017 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2007US64391 | 20.03.2007 | US78409106 | 20.03.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007109662 | Global Dossier | 13.12.2007 | A3 | WO2007109662 | 27.09.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US78409106 | 20.03.2006 |