EP2064834 - ZIGBEE/IP GATEWAY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.11.2013 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications AB Nya Vattentornet 221 88 Lund / SE | [2009/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OSBORN, William, Richard 107 Waterloo Station Drive Cary, NC 27513 / US | 02 /
BENNETT, Jesse, W. 1113 Capitata Crossing Apex, NC 27502 / US | [2009/23] | Representative(s) | Banzer, Hans-Jörg Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/52] | Banzer, Hans-Jörg Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/23] | Banzer, Hans-Jörg Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07759609.6 | 28.03.2007 | [2009/23] | WO2007US65396 | Priority number, date | US20060468925 | 31.08.2006 Original published format: US 468925 | [2009/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008027615 | Date: | 06.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2064834 | Date: | 03.06.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.03.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2064834 | Date: | 26.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, H04L29/12, H04L12/56, H04L12/46, H04L12/28 | [2012/24] | CPC: |
H04L12/2834 (EP,US);
H04L12/4625 (EP,US);
H04L45/54 (EP,US);
H04L61/106 (EP,US);
H04L69/08 (US);
H04L69/085 (EP);
H04W4/38 (EP);
H04L2012/2841 (EP,US);
H04L2012/285 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2009/23] | H04L12/28, H04L12/46 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/23] | Title | German: | ZIGPEE/IP-GATEWAY | [2009/23] | English: | ZIGBEE/IP GATEWAY | [2009/23] | French: | PASSERELLE ZIGBEE/IP | [2009/23] | Entry into regional phase | 24.03.2009 | National basic fee paid | 24.03.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.03.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.06.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.03.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/23] | 30.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.07.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.11.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 08.11.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP11008235.1 / EP2408146 | EP11008236.9 / EP2408147 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.03.2010 | Opposition(s) | 27.09.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.03.2007 | AT | 26.12.2012 | BE | 26.12.2012 | CY | 26.12.2012 | CZ | 26.12.2012 | DK | 26.12.2012 | EE | 26.12.2012 | FI | 26.12.2012 | IT | 26.12.2012 | LT | 26.12.2012 | LV | 26.12.2012 | MT | 26.12.2012 | PL | 26.12.2012 | RO | 26.12.2012 | SE | 26.12.2012 | SI | 26.12.2012 | SK | 26.12.2012 | TR | 26.12.2012 | BG | 26.03.2013 | GR | 27.03.2013 | IE | 28.03.2013 | LU | 28.03.2013 | CH | 31.03.2013 | LI | 31.03.2013 | MC | 31.03.2013 | ES | 06.04.2013 | IS | 26.04.2013 | PT | 26.04.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 26.12.2012 | |
BE | 26.12.2012 | ||
CY | 26.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2012 | ||
DK | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
IT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
MT | 26.12.2012 | ||
PL | 26.12.2012 | ||
RO | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
TR | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
IE | 28.03.2013 | ||
CH | 31.03.2013 | ||
LI | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
ES | 06.04.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
PT | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/32] | AT | 26.12.2012 | |
BE | 26.12.2012 | ||
CY | 26.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2012 | ||
DK | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
IT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
MT | 26.12.2012 | ||
PL | 26.12.2012 | ||
RO | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
IE | 28.03.2013 | ||
CH | 31.03.2013 | ||
LI | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
ES | 06.04.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
PT | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | AT | 26.12.2012 | |
BE | 26.12.2012 | ||
CY | 26.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2012 | ||
DK | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
IT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
PL | 26.12.2012 | ||
RO | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
IE | 28.03.2013 | ||
CH | 31.03.2013 | ||
LI | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
ES | 06.04.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
PT | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | AT | 26.12.2012 | |
BE | 26.12.2012 | ||
CY | 26.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2012 | ||
DK | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
IT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
PL | 26.12.2012 | ||
RO | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
IE | 28.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
ES | 06.04.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
PT | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/03] | AT | 26.12.2012 | |
BE | 26.12.2012 | ||
CY | 26.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2012 | ||
DK | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
IT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
PL | 26.12.2012 | ||
RO | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
ES | 06.04.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
PT | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 26.12.2012 | |
BE | 26.12.2012 | ||
CY | 26.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2012 | ||
DK | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
PL | 26.12.2012 | ||
RO | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
ES | 06.04.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
PT | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 26.12.2012 | |
BE | 26.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2012 | ||
DK | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
PL | 26.12.2012 | ||
RO | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
ES | 06.04.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
PT | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | AT | 26.12.2012 | |
BE | 26.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
PL | 26.12.2012 | ||
RO | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
ES | 06.04.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
PT | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | AT | 26.12.2012 | |
BE | 26.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
PL | 26.12.2012 | ||
RO | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
ES | 06.04.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
PT | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 26.12.2012 | |
BE | 26.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
PL | 26.12.2012 | ||
RO | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
ES | 06.04.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | AT | 26.12.2012 | |
BE | 26.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
PL | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
ES | 06.04.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | BE | 26.12.2012 | |
CZ | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | BE | 26.12.2012 | |
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | BE | 26.12.2012 | |
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | FI | 26.12.2012 | |
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | FI | 26.12.2012 | |
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | FI | 26.12.2012 | |
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 26.12.2012 | |
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | LT | 26.12.2012 | |
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | LT | 26.12.2012 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2002163895 (HALLER AMIT [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * column A *; | [X]US2002196771 (VIJ VIKRAM [US], et al) [X] 1-6,8-12 * paragraphs [0062] - [0079]; figures 1,6,7,10 *; | [X]WO2004015927 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 14-16,21,24 * page 21, line 3 - page 22, line 19; figures 11,12 *; | [X]DE10245760 (DEUTSCHE TELEKOM AG [DE]) [X] 14,21 * paragraphs [0022] , [0046] , [0049] , [0051]; figures 1-3 *; | [XP]US2007030848 (MIYATA HIROSHI [JP], et al) [XP] 1-13 * paragraphs [0086] - [0097] - [0232]; figures 7,22 *; | [A] - ANONYMOUS, "Cirronet ZG-2400E Ethernet Gateway", (200601), URL: http://www.tekmodul.de/fileadmin/Redakteure/pdf/Gateway_ZG-2400E.pdf, (20071025), XP002456479 [A] 1-13 * the whole document * | [A] - S. SAKANE, Y. ISHII, K. TOBA, K. KAMADA, N. OKABE, "A translation method between 802.15.4 and IPv6 nodes", (20060127), pages 1 - 19, URL: http://www.taca.jp/docs/saint2006/saint06-ws.pdf, (20071025), XP002456480 [A] 1-13 * the whole document * | [A] - LOUATI W ET AL, "Network-based virtual personal overlay networks using programmable virtual routers", IEEE COMMUNICATIONS MAGAZINE, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, US, (200508), vol. 43, no. 8, ISSN 0163-6804, pages 86 - 94, XP011137986 [A] 14-26 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MCOM.2005.1497558 | by applicant | US2002196771 | WO2004015927 | DE10245760 |