EP1999608 - A SYSTEM, METHOD, AND APPARATUS FOR VISUAL BROWSING, DEEP TAGGING, AND SYNCHRONIZED COMMENTING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.10.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.10.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.11.2011 [2011/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P. 11445 Compaq Center Drive West Houston, TX 77070 / US | [2010/35] |
Former [2008/50] | For all designated states Motionbox, Inc. 55 Broad Street, 10th Floor New York, NY 10004 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
O'BRIEN, Christopher J. 118 Bergen Street Brooklyn, NY 11201 / US | 02 /
WASON, Andrew 6 Victorian Woods Drive Atlantic Highlands, NJ 07716 / US | [2008/50] | Representative(s) | Frankhuizen, Jan, et al Hewlett-Packard Española, S.L. Legal Department Camí de Can Graells, 1-21 08174 Sant Cugat del Vallès / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2010/35] | Frankhuizen, Jan, et al Hewlett-Packard Española, S.L. Legal Department Camí de Can Graells, 1-21 08174 Sant Cugat del Vallés / ES | ||
Former [2008/50] | Patentanwälte Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner Am Riettor 5 78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | Application number, filing date | 07759725.0 | 29.03.2007 | [2008/50] | WO2007US65534 | Priority number, date | US20060787393P | 29.03.2006 Original published format: US 787393 P | US20060746193P | 02.05.2006 Original published format: US 746193 P | US20060822925P | 18.08.2006 Original published format: US 822925 P | US20060822927P | 19.08.2006 Original published format: US 822927 P | WO2007US65387 | 28.03.2007 Original published format: PCT/US2007/065387 | WO2007US65391 | 28.03.2007 Original published format: PCT/US2007/065391 | [2009/13] |
Former [2008/50] | US20060787393P | 29.03.2006 | |
US20060746193P | 02.05.2006 | ||
US20060822925P | 18.08.2006 | ||
US20060822927P | 19.08.2006 | ||
WO2007US06538 | 28.03.2007 | ||
WO2007US06539 | 28.03.2007 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008060655 | Date: | 22.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/21] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1999608 | Date: | 10.12.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.10.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G06F15/00, G06F17/00, G06F17/30 | [2010/38] | CPC: |
G11B27/34 (EP,US);
G06F16/743 (EP,US);
G06F16/745 (EP,US);
G06F16/78 (EP,US);
G11B27/034 (EP,US);
G11B27/105 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/18] | G06F15/00, G06F17/00 | ||
Former IPC [2008/50] | G06F15/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/50] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM, VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG FÜR VISUELLE DURCHSUCHE, DEEP-TAGGING UND SYNCHRONISIERTE KOMMENTIERUNG | [2008/50] | English: | A SYSTEM, METHOD, AND APPARATUS FOR VISUAL BROWSING, DEEP TAGGING, AND SYNCHRONIZED COMMENTING | [2008/50] | French: | SYSTÈME, PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE NAVIGATION VISUELLE, D'INDEXATION ("DEEP TAGGING") ET DE SYNCHRONISATION DE COMMENTAIRES | [2008/50] | Entry into regional phase | 26.09.2008 | National basic fee paid | 26.09.2008 | Search fee paid | 26.09.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.09.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/50] | 09.12.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.04.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/48] | 09.06.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2002069218 (SULL SANGHOON [KR], et al) [X] 1-4,11-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0050] - [0054] - [0060] * * paragraphs [0069] - [0072] * * paragraphs [0075] , [0077] * * paragraphs [0162] - [0177] * * paragraphs [0204] - [0208] * * paragraphs [0214] - [0222] * * paragraphs [0460] - [0484] *; | [X] - XIAN-SHENG HUA ET AL, "Personal media sharing and authoring on the Web", 13TH ANNUAL ACM INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON MULTIMEDIA ACM NEW YORK, NY, USA, (20051106), ISBN 1-59593-044-2, pages 375 - 378, XP002595825 [X] 1-4,11-15 * abstract * * page 375, paragraph 2 - page 378, paragraph 5 * | [X] - DAUBER K ET AL, "The diver project: interactive digital video repurposing", IEEE MULTIMEDIA, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, NEW YORK, US, (20040101), vol. 11, no. 1, ISSN 1070-986X, pages 54 - 61, XP011105675 [X] 1-4,11-15 * abstract * * pages 54,56-58 * * page 59, column l, lines 1-4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MMUL.2004.1261108 | [X] - SCHROETER, R ET AL., "Vannotea: A Collaborative Video Indexing, Annotation and Discussion System For Broadband Networks", KNOWLEDGE MARKUP AND SEMANTIC ANNOTATION WORKSHOP, K-CAP 2003, SANIBEL, FLORIDA, USA, 26 OCTOBER, 2003, (20031026), pages 1 - 8, URL: http://espace.library.uq.edu.au/view/UQ:7897, (20100805), XP002595826 [X] 1-4,11-15 * abstract * * page 2, column r - page 3, column r * * page 5, column r - page 7, column l * * Appendix A * | [X] - Yamamoto D. et al., "iVAS: Web-based Video Annotation System and its Applications", 3rd International Semantic Web Conference (ISWC2004) 7-11 November 2004, Hiroshima, Japan, Demonstration Session 10.11.2004, (20041110), URL: http://iswc2004.semanticweb.org/demos/29/paper.pdf, (20100805), XP002595827 [X] 1-4,11-15 * abstract * * page 1, paragraph 2 - page 3, paragraph 3.3 * * pages 3-4, paragraph 5.1 * | [X] - PAN P ET AL, "I-Views: a community-oriented system for sharing streaming video on the Internet", COMPUTER NETWORKS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V., AMSTERDAM, (20000601), vol. 33, no. 1-6, ISSN 1389-1286, pages 567 - 581, XP004304792 [X] 1-4,11-15 * abstract * * page 568, column r * * page 571, paragraph 3 - page 575, paragraph 3.4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1389-1286(00)00052-9 | [A] - XIAN-SHENG HUA ET AL, "LazyCut - content-aware template-based video authoring", 13TH ANNUAL ACM INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON MULTIMEDIA, ACM, NEW YORK, USA, (20051106), ISBN 1-59593-044-2, pages 792 - 793, XP002595828 [A] 1-4,11-15 * figures 1-3 * * page 792, column l, line l - page 793, column r, line l * | International search | [A]US2005286546 (BASSOLI ARIANNA [IT], et al); | [A]US2005144305 (FEGAN MICHAEL P II [US], et al); | [AE]US2008080392 (WALSH RICHARD J [US], et al); | [AE]US2008092168 (LOGAN JAMES D [US], et al); | [AE]US2008141303 (WALKER TODD A [US], et al); | [AE]US2008141180 (REED OGDEN CARTWRIGHT [US], et al); | [A]US2004220926 (LAMKIN ALLAN B [US], et al); | [A]US7065709 (ELLIS MICHAEL D [US], et al); | [A]US6977667 (BURKE TREVOR JOHN [GB]); | [A]US6006241 (PURNAVEJA AUDI [US], et al); | [A]US2003225641 (GRITZMACHER THOMAS J [US], et al) |