EP2001473 - COMPLIANT ELECTRICAL STIMULATION LEADS AND METHODS OF FABRICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.02.2015 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.02.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.03.2015 [2015/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ADVANCED NEUROMODULATION SYSTEMS, INC. 6901 Preston Road Plano, TX 75024 / US | For all designated states Daglow, Terry, D. 1005 Ashland Court Allen TX 75013 / US | [2008/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAGLOW, Terry, D. 1005 Ashland Court Allen, TX 75013 / US | 02 /
FRANZ, Brian 6225 Eagle Creek Drive Flower Mound, TX 75028 / US | 03 /
BOOGAARD, Jerome P.O. Box 381 Forest Grove, Oregon 97116 / US | 04 /
SOSEBEE, Tom 906 Tyler Court Allen, Texas 75013 / US | 05 /
GOLDMAN, Stephen L. 5063 Stillwater Trail Frisco, TX 75034 / US | 06 /
SWANSON, John 5105 SW Garden Home Road Portland, Oregon 97219 / US | 07 /
DAS, Sarah 2323 N. Field Street No.1943 Dallas, Texas 75201 / US | 08 /
DIGIACOMO, Michael 13327 NW Yvonne Lane Portland, Oregon 97229 / US | [2008/52] |
Former [2008/51] | 01 /
DAGLOW, Terry, D. 1005 Ashland Court Allen, TX 75013 / US | ||
02 /
FRANZ, Brian 6225 Eagle Creek Drive Flower Mound, TX 75028 / US | |||
03 /
BOOGAARD, Jerome P.O. Box 381 Forest Grove, Oregon 97116 / US | |||
04 /
SOSEBEE, Tom 906 Tyler Court Allen, Texas 75013 / US | |||
05 /
GOLDMAN, Stephen L. 5063 Stillwater Trail Frisco, TX 75034 / US | |||
06 /
SWANSON, John 5105 SW Garden Home Road Portland, Oregon 97219 / US | |||
07 /
DAS, Sarah 2323 N. Field Street 1943 Dallas, Texas 75201 / US | |||
08 /
DIGIACOMO, Michael 13327 NW Yvonne Lane Portland, Oregon 97229 / US | Representative(s) | Lawrence, John, et al Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/51] | Lawrence, John, et al Barker Brettell LLP 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 9PW / GB | Application number, filing date | 07759864.7 | 30.03.2007 | [2008/51] | WO2007US65677 | Priority number, date | US20060788518P | 31.03.2006 Original published format: US 788518 P | [2008/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007115198 | Date: | 11.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/41] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2001473 | Date: | 17.12.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.10.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.04.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/05, H01B7/04, H01R43/20, H01B13/008 | [2012/52] | CPC: |
A61N1/0551 (EP,US);
A61N1/0504 (EP,US);
A61N1/0558 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49208 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/51] | A61K31/47 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/51] | Title | German: | NACHGIEBIGE ELEKTROSTIMULATIONSLEITUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG | [2008/51] | English: | COMPLIANT ELECTRICAL STIMULATION LEADS AND METHODS OF FABRICATION | [2008/51] | French: | FILS DE STIMULATION ELECTRIQUE CONFORMES ET PROCEDES DE FABRICATION | [2008/51] | Entry into regional phase | 10.10.2008 | National basic fee paid | 10.10.2008 | Search fee paid | 10.10.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.10.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.10.2008 | Examination requested [2008/51] | 24.06.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/12] | 03.11.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2014 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US4559951 (DAHL ROGER W [US] ET AL) [X] 1-3,5,6,8-12,15 * column 5, line 19 - column 6, line 68; figures 1-5 * [I] 4,7,13,14; | [X]US2003236562 (KUZMA JANUSZ A [US]) [X] 1-3,6,8-12,15 * paragraphs [0035] - [0040] - [0055] - [0057]; figures 1-3, 8B *; | [X]US6477427 (STOLZ BRIAN T [US] ET AL) [X] 1-3,6,8-12,15 * column 3, line 22 - column 5, line 42; figures 2-5, 8, 12 *; | [X]US5466253 (DOAN PHONG D [US]) [X] 1-3,6,8-12,15 * column 2, lines 43-60; figure 1 * * column 3, line 46 - column 4, line 37; figure 5 *; | [A]EP0408358 (UNIV CASE WESTERN RESERVE [US]) [A] 1-15 * column 3, line 27 - column 5, line 28; figures 1A-1D *; | [A]US2005027338 (HILL ROGER JOHN [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0017] - [0036]; figures 1-3 * | International search | [Y]US2006041295 (OSYPKA THOMAS P [US]); | [Y]US2139055 (MAURICE WRIGHT GEORGE, et al); | [Y]US5378234 (HAMMERSLAG GARY R [US], et al) | by applicant | US4559951 | US2003236562 | US6477427 | US5466253 |