EP2008445 - IMPROVED PLENOPTIC CAMERA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.08.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.09.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2019 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 05.06.2019 [2019/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Adobe Systems Incorporated 345 Park Avenue San Jose, CA 95110-2704 / US | [2009/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GEORGIEV, Todor G. 1515 Cormorant Court Sunnyvale, CA 94087 / US | [2009/01] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/42] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2009/01] | Meldrum, David James D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 07760021.1 | 03.04.2007 | [2009/01] | WO2007US65855 | Priority number, date | US20060398403 | 04.04.2006 Original published format: US 398403 | [2009/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007115281 | Date: | 11.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2008445 | Date: | 31.12.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.10.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2008445 | Date: | 18.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/225 | [2009/01] | CPC: |
G02B27/0075 (EP,KR,US);
H04N23/957 (EP,US);
G02B3/0056 (EP,KR,US);
G02B5/045 (EP,KR,US);
H04N23/959 (EP,US);
G02B3/0006 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2017/42] |
Former [2009/20] | DE, FR, GB | ||
Former [2009/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERBESSERTE PLENOPTISCHE KAMERA | [2009/01] | English: | IMPROVED PLENOPTIC CAMERA | [2009/01] | French: | CAMERA A FONCTION PLENOPTIQUE AMELIOREE | [2009/01] | Entry into regional phase | 04.11.2008 | National basic fee paid | 04.11.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.11.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.11.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/01] | 05.11.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 22.12.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 21.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.05.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.09.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 08.09.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 08.09.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.04.2010 | Opposition(s) | 19.07.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 03.04.2018 | FR | 30.04.2018 | [2019/23] |
Former [2019/13] | GB | 03.04.2018 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US3985419 (MATSUMOTO KAZUYA, et al) [Y] 1-20 * column 4, lines 40-43 * * column 4, line 58 - column 5, line 60 * * figure 11 *; | [A]US4193093 (ST CLAIR RICHARD C [US]) [A] 1,9,17* column 1, line 9 - line 14 *; | [A]US5361127 (DAILY MICHAEL J [US]) [A] 1-20 * column 5, line 7 - column 6, line 56 *; | [Y]US5729011 (SEKIGUCHI NOBUTOSHI [JP]) [Y] 6-8,14-17,19,20 * column 3, line 33 - column 10, line 6 * * figures 1-9 *; | [Y]US2005088714 (KREMEN STANLEY H [US]) [Y] 1-20 * paragraph [0054] *; | [PA]WO2006057838 (KREMEN STANLEY H [US]) [PA] 1,9,17 * page 21, line 35 - page 22, line 27 * * figures 12a-12b * | by applicant | US3985419 | US5361127 | US5729011 | US2001012149 | US2001050813 | US6351269 | US2005088714 |