EP2026988 - VEHICLE POWER UNIT DESIGNED AS RETROFITTABLE AXLE COMPRISING MOTOR, BATTERY AND SUSPENSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 25.02.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.02.2011 | Refusal of application | published on 30.03.2011 [2011/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BluWav Systems, LLC 1613 Star Batt Drive Rochester Hills MI 48309 / US | [2009/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GLOCERI, Gary J. 5412 Murray Court Waterford, MI 48327 / US | 02 /
KENDALL, Todd A. 47714 Nola Drive Macomb, MI 48044 / US | 03 /
LI, Zhesheng 500 Jacob Way, 201 Rochester, MI 48307 / US | 04 /
DAWSON, Matthew J. 1834 Boulan Troy, MI 48084 / US | 05 /
ZHAO, Zilai 24520 Perceval Lane Novi, MI 48375 / US | [2010/08] |
Former [2009/09] | 01 /
GLOCERI, Gary J. 5412 Murray Court Waterford, MI 48327 / US | ||
02 /
KENDALL, Todd A. 47714 Nola Drive Macomb, MI 48044 / US | |||
03 /
ZHESHENG, Li 500 Jacob Way, 201 Rochester, MI 48307 / US | |||
04 /
DAWSON, Matthew J. 1834 Boulan Troy, MI 48084 / US | |||
05 /
ZHAO, Zilai 24520 Perceval Lane Novi, MI 48375 / US | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/09] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07760031.0 | 03.04.2007 | [2009/09] | WO2007US65865 | Priority number, date | US20060788041P | 03.04.2006 Original published format: US 788041 P | US20060823043P | 21.08.2006 Original published format: US 823043 P | [2009/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007118082 | Date: | 18.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/42] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2026988 | Date: | 25.02.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.10.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B60G3/20, B60K1/02, B60K1/04, B60K7/00, B60K17/02, B60K17/04, B62D21/11, F16D27/00, B60W30/18 | [2009/09] | CPC: |
B62D21/11 (EP,US);
B60G11/15 (EP,US);
B60G3/20 (EP,US);
B60K1/04 (EP,US);
B60K17/356 (EP,US);
B60K6/52 (EP,US);
B60K7/0007 (EP,US);
B60L50/16 (EP,US);
B60L50/61 (EP,US);
F16D27/02 (EP,US);
F16D27/06 (EP,US);
B60G2200/14 (EP,US);
B60G2200/144 (EP,US);
B60G2200/18 (EP,US);
B60G2202/12 (EP,US);
B60G2204/15 (EP,US);
B60G2204/20 (EP,US);
B60G2300/50 (EP,US);
B60K17/043 (EP,US);
B60K2007/0046 (EP,US);
B60K2007/0061 (EP,US);
B60L2220/46 (EP,US);
F16D2027/002 (EP,US);
F16D2027/005 (EP,US);
Y02T10/62 (EP,US);
Y02T10/64 (US);
Y02T10/70 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/09] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FAHRZEUGANTRIEB IN FORM EINER NACHRÜSTBAREN ACHSE MIT MOTOR, BATTERIE UND AUFHÄNGUNG | [2009/09] | English: | VEHICLE POWER UNIT DESIGNED AS RETROFITTABLE AXLE COMPRISING MOTOR, BATTERY AND SUSPENSION | [2009/09] | French: | PROPULSION DE VEHICULE EN FORME D'UN AXE RATTRAPABLE AVEC UN MOTEUR, UNE BATTERIE ET UNE SUSPENSION | [2009/09] | Entry into regional phase | 03.11.2008 | National basic fee paid | 03.11.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.11.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.11.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/09] | 19.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.10.2010 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 15.11.2010 | 10.11.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2011/13] | 15.11.2010 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 20.11.2010 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2011/13] | Divisional application(s) | EP10180052.2 / EP2258569 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]FR1563321 (FROD (FRANCE) S.A.) [X] 1,4-6,11,12,14,15,44,46,51 * the whole document *; | [X]US3439767 (LYNES ARTHUR EDWARD, et al) [X] 1,4-6,11,12,14,15,44,46,51 * the whole document *; | [X]FR2691930 (PEUGEOT [FR], et al) [X] 1-3,11,12,44,45* the whole document *; | [X]DE102004022242 (VISTEON GLOBAL TECH INC [US]) [X] 1-4,11-13,44,45,49,50,65-69 * the whole document *; | [X]DE10356531 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [X] 1-4,11,12,44,45,49,65-69 * the whole document * | by applicant | CA2548815 | JP2006009657 | EP1698506 | EP1707428 | JP2006264463 | EP1736346 | US2007023211 | US2007034428 | WO2007017719 | WO2007017043 |