EP2007312 - A SHAPE-BASED APPROACH FOR SCAFFOLDLESS TISSUE ENGINEERING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.12.2015 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.12.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.01.2016 [2016/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states William Marsh Rice University Office Of Technology Transfer MS 705 P.O. Box 1892 Houston TX 77152-1892 / US | [2009/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ATHANASIOU, Kyriacos, A. 2991 MacArthur Street Houston, TX 77030 / US | 02 /
HU, Jerry 12038 Sea Shore Houston, TX 77072 / US | 03 /
AUFDERHEIDE, Adam 3606 Deal Street Houston, TX 77025 / US | [2009/01] | Representative(s) | Potter Clarkson Chapel Quarter Mount Street Nottingham NG1 6HQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/37] | Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | ||
Former [2010/15] | Pilkington, Stephanie Joan, et al Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | ||
Former [2009/01] | Grubert, Andreas Baker Botts (UK) LLP 41 Lothbury London EC2R 7HF / GB | Application number, filing date | 07760209.2 | 05.04.2007 | [2009/01] | WO2007US66089 | Priority number, date | US20060789853P | 05.04.2006 Original published format: US 789853 P | US20060789851P | 05.04.2006 Original published format: US 789851 P | US20060789855P | 05.04.2006 Original published format: US 789855 P | [2009/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007115336 | Date: | 11.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/41] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2007312 | Date: | 31.12.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.10.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.05.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/02, C12N5/00, A61K35/32 | [2009/01] | CPC: |
A61L27/3895 (EP);
A61L27/3817 (EP);
A61L27/3843 (EP);
A61L27/3886 (EP);
C12N5/0655 (EP);
A61K35/12 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/01] | Title | German: | FORMBASIERTES VERFAHREN FÜR GERÜSTLOSE GEWEBEZÜCHTUNG | [2009/01] | English: | A SHAPE-BASED APPROACH FOR SCAFFOLDLESS TISSUE ENGINEERING | [2009/01] | French: | APPROCHE BASÉE SUR LA FORME POUR INGÉNIÉRIE TISSULAIRE SANS ÉCHAFAUDAGE | [2009/01] | Entry into regional phase | 04.11.2008 | National basic fee paid | 04.11.2008 | Search fee paid | 04.11.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.11.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/01] | 30.01.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.05.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.02.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.08.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/03] | 03.09.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/03] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.05.2013 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 12.02.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 13.02.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 03.03.2014 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2015 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]WO2006017176 (UNIV RICE WILLIAM M [US]; ATHANASIOU KYRIACOS A [US]; HU JERRY C [US]) [X] 1,5,6,9-11 * page 2, lines 4-23 * * page 8, lines 16-22 * [Y] 4,8 [I] 1-3,5-7,9-11; | [Y]US2002106625 (HUNG CLARK T [US] ET AL) [Y] 4 * paragraphs [0001] , [0044] , [0063] - [0074] * * figures 6-13 *; | [Y] - C R LEE ET AL, "Modulation of the Contractile and Biosynthetic Activity of Chondroxytes Seeded in Collagen-Glycosaminoglycan Matrices", TISSUE ENGINEERING, (20030101), vol. 9, no. 1, pages 27 - 36, XP055032370 [Y] 8 * the whole document * | International search | [X]WO2006017176 ; | [X]US2004082063 ; | [X] - MAINIL-VARLET ET AL., "Articular cartilage repair using a tissue-engineered cartilage-like implant: an animal study", OSTEOARTHRITIS AND CARTILAGE, (2001), vol. 9, pages S6 - S15, XP008130665 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1053/joca.2001.0438 | [Y] - HUNG ET AL., "Anatomically shaped osteochrondral constructs for articular cartilage repair", JOURNAL OF BIOMECHANICS, (2003), vol. 36, no. 12, pages 1853 - 1864, XP002526466 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0021-9290(03)00213-6 | [XP] - AUFDERHEIDE ET AL., "Assessment of a Bovine Co-culture, Scaffold-Free Method for Growing Meniscus-Shaped Constructs", TISSUE ENGINEERING, (2007), vol. 13, no. 9, pages 2195 - 2205, XP008131020 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1089/ten.2006.0291 | [XP] - HU ET AL., "A Self-Assembling Processes in Articular Cartilage Tissue Engineering", TISSUE ENGINEERING, (2006), vol. 12, no. 4, pages 969 - 979, XP008131890 | [A] - MASUDA ET AL., "A novel two-step method for the formation of tissue-engineered cartilage by mature bovine chondrocytes: the alginate-recovered-chondrocyte (ARC) method", JOURNAL OF ORTHOPAEDIC RESEARCH, (2003), vol. 21, no. 1, pages 139 - 148, XP008131016 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0736-0266(02)00109-2 | [AP] - HOBEN ET AL., "Self-Assembly of Fibrochondrocytes and Chondrocytes for Tissue Engineering of the Knee Meniscus", TISSUE ENGINEERING, 2007, (2007), vol. 13, no. 5, pages 939 - 946, XP008130987 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1089/ten.2006.0116 |