EP2010567 - ANTIBODY COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR TREATMENT OF NEOPLASTIC DISEASE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 27.04.2012 Database last updated on 24.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2012 | Refusal of application | published on 30.05.2012 [2012/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Government of the United States of America, as represented by the Secretary, Department of Health and Human Services Suite 325 6011 Executive Boulevard Rockville, MD 20852 / US | [2009/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DIMITROV, Dimiter S. 1741 Northridge Lane Frederick, Maryland 21702 / US | 02 /
ZHU, Zhongyu 2501 Carrington Way Frederick, Maryland 21702 / US | [2009/02] | Representative(s) | Gowshall, Jonathan Vallance, et al Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/13] | Gowshall, Jonathan Vallance, et al Forrester & Boehmert SkyGarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/22] | Gowshall, Jonathan Vallance, et al Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/15] | Gowshall, Jonathan Vallance, et al Forresters Forresters House 52 Bounds Green Road London N11 2EY / GB | ||
Former [2009/51] | Hallybone, Huw George, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [2009/02] | Hallybone, Huw George, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 07760279.5 | 06.04.2007 | [2009/02] | WO2007US66180 | Priority number, date | US20060790512P | 07.04.2006 Original published format: US 790512 P | [2009/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007118214 | Date: | 18.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/42] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2010567 | Date: | 07.01.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.10.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/22, G01N33/00, C12N15/13, C12N5/10, A61K39/395, A61P35/00 | [2009/02] | CPC: |
C07K16/22 (EP,KR,US);
A61K39/395 (KR);
A61K47/6817 (EP,US);
A61K47/6843 (EP,US);
A61K51/1018 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P35/04 (EP);
C12N15/11 (KR);
G01N33/00 (KR);
G01N33/5011 (EP,US);
G01N33/574 (EP,US);
G01N33/74 (EP,US);
C07K2317/55 (EP,US);
C07K2317/565 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/02] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANTIKÖRPERZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON NEOPLASIEN | [2009/02] | English: | ANTIBODY COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR TREATMENT OF NEOPLASTIC DISEASE | [2009/02] | French: | COMPOSITIONS D'ANTICORPS ET MÉTHODES DE TRAITEMENT D'UNE MALADIE NÉOPLASIQUE | [2009/02] | Entry into regional phase | 07.11.2008 | National basic fee paid | 07.11.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.11.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.11.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/02] | 16.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.11.2011 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 24.11.2011 | 24.11.2011 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 17.01.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2012/22] | 27.01.2012 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2012/22] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.02.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP1505075 (KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO KK [JP]) | Examination | WO03100008 |