EP2024217 - SYSTEM, METHOD AND COMPUTER SOFTWARE CODE FOR OPTIMIZING TRAIN OPEATIONS CONSIDERING RAIL CAR PARAMETERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 12.05.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.05.2017 | Refusal of application | published on 14.06.2017 [2017/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [2009/08] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAUM, Wolfgang 5228 Annendale Drive Erie, PA 16506 / US | 02 /
HERSHEY, John Erik 4 Vines Road Ballston Lake, NY 12019 / US | 03 /
PELTZ, David Michael 4374 Parkway Drive Melbourne, FL 32934 / US | 04 /
SHAFFER, Glenn Robert 3618 Dominic Drive Erie, PA 16506 / US | 05 /
NOFFSINGER, Joseph Forrest 9520 SE Keystone Drive Lees Summit, MO 64086-9718 / US | 06 /
BORNTRAEGER, John 2034 Blue Heron Rive Melbourne, FL 32940 / US | 07 /
KUMAR, Ajith 528 Donna Drive Erie, PA 16509 / US | [2009/08] | Representative(s) | Illingworth-Law, William Illingworth GPO Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | Illingworth-Law, William Illingworth Global Patent Operation - Europe GE International Inc. 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | ||
Former [2009/08] | Illingworth-Law, William Illingworth GE London Patent Operation 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | Application number, filing date | 07760703.4 | 16.04.2007 | [2009/08] | WO2007US66697 | Priority number, date | US20060802147P | 19.05.2006 Original published format: US 802147 P | US20070621221 | 09.01.2007 Original published format: US 621221 | [2009/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007136947 | Date: | 29.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/48] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2024217 | Date: | 18.02.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.11.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B61L27/00 | [2009/08] | CPC: |
B61L15/0058 (EP,US);
B61L27/16 (EP,US);
B61L15/0027 (EP,US);
B61L15/0072 (EP,US);
B61L15/0081 (EP,US);
B61L15/009 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2009/24] |
Former [2009/08] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM, VERFAHREN UND COMPUTERSOFTWARECODE ZUR OPTIMIERUNG DES FAHRBETRIEBS UNTER BERÜCKSICHTIGUNG VON SCHIENENFAHRZEUGPARAMETERN | [2009/08] | English: | SYSTEM, METHOD AND COMPUTER SOFTWARE CODE FOR OPTIMIZING TRAIN OPEATIONS CONSIDERING RAIL CAR PARAMETERS | [2009/08] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ ET CODE D'UN LOGICIEL INFORMATIQUE D'OPTIMISATION DE CONTRÔLE DE TRAINS INTÉGRANT DES PARAMÈTRES DE VÉHICULES FERROVIAIRES | [2009/08] | Entry into regional phase | 19.12.2008 | National basic fee paid | 19.12.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.12.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/08] | 20.12.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 23.01.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 29.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.2011 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 29.11.2011 | 29.11.2011 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 20.01.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2017/24] | 19.04.2017 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2017/24] | Appeal following examination | 23.03.2012 | Appeal received No. T1398/12 | 29.05.2012 | Statement of grounds filed | 20.02.2017 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [2017/08] | 19.04.2017 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant withdrawn | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.09.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 02.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]DE19830053 (THYSSENKRUPP STAHL AG [DE]) [Y] 6,10,20,23,32,34 * column 4, line 1 - column 5, line 62; figure 1 *; | [Y]DE19935353 (ABB DAIMLER BENZ TRANSP [DE]) [Y] 10,23 * column 2, line 1 - column 3, line 26; figure 1 *; | [XY]WO2004059446 (UNION SWITCH & SIGNAL INC [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,12,15,16,19,25,27,29-31,33 * page 8, line 6 - page 13, line 26 * [Y] 4,6,10,18,20,23,32,34; | [Y]US2005065674 (HOUPT PAUL KENNETH [US], et al) [Y] 4,18 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0007]; figure 1 *; | [E]US2007219680 (KUMAR AJITH K [US], et al) [E] 1-36* paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0011] * | by applicant | WO2004059446 |