EP2016047 - BIPHENYL AMIDE LACTAM DERIVATIVES AS INHIBITORS OF 11- BETA-HYDROXYSTEROID DEHYDROGENASE 1 [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.07.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.11.2016 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): ES | published on 14.12.2016 [2016/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELI LILLY AND COMPANY Lilly Corporate Center Indianapolis, IN 46285 / US | [2013/35] |
Former [2009/04] | For all designated states ELI LILLY AND COMPANY Lilly Corporate Center Indianapolis IN 46285 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AICHER, Thomas, Daniel 3070 North Torrey's Peak Drive Superior, Colorado 80027 / US | 02 /
CHEN, Zhaogen 10532 Titan Run Carmel, IN 46032 / US | 03 /
HINKLIN, Ronald, Jay 3515 Bluestem Avenue Longmont, Colorado 80503 / US | 04 /
HITE, Gary, Alan 4305 South Asbury Street Indianapolis, Indiana 46227 / US | 05 /
KRASUTSKY, Alexei, Pavlovych 7923 Gold Brook Dr. Indianapolis, IN 46237 / US | 06 /
LI, Renhua 10493 Hollowood Court Fishers, Indiana 46038 / US | 07 /
MCCOWAN, Jefferson, Ray 2653 Crescent Hill Lane Indianapolis, Indiana 46228 / US | 08 /
SAEED, Ashraf 13248 Lorenzo Boulevard Westfield, Indiana 46074 / US | 09 /
SNYDER, Nancy, June 3830 West 850 North Lizton, Indiana 46149 / US | 10 /
TOTH, James, Lee 4642 South 625 West Knightstown, Indiana 46148 / US | 11 /
WALLACE, Owen, Brendan 13297 Mink Lane Westfield, Indiana 46074 / US | 12 /
WINNEROSKI, JUNIOR, Leonard, Larry 587 Thoroughbred Lane Greenwood, Indiana 46142 / US | 13 /
XU, Yanping 6676 Pennan Court Noblesville, Indiana 46062 / US | 14 /
YORK, Jeremy, Schulenburg 16095 Tenor Way Noblesville, Indiana 46060 / US | [2009/10] |
Former [2009/04] | 01 /
AICHER, Thomas, Daniel 3070 North Torrey's Peak Drive Superior, Colorado 80027 / US | ||
02 /
CHEN, Zhaogen 735 Canal Court No.B Indianapolis, IN 46202 / US | |||
03 /
HINKLIN, Ronald, Jay 3515 Bluestem Avenue Longmont, Colorado 80503 / US | |||
04 /
HITE, Gary, Alan 4305 South Asbury Street Indianapolis, Indiana 46227 / US | |||
05 /
KRASUTSKY, Alexei, Pavlovych 6787 Woodcliff Circle Zionsville, Indiana 46077 / US | |||
06 /
LI, Renhua 10493 Hollowood Court Fishers, Indiana 46038 / US | |||
07 /
MCCOWAN, Jefferson, Ray 2653 Crescent Hill Lane Indianapolis, Indiana 46228 / US | |||
08 /
SAEED, Ashraf 13248 Lorenzo Boulevard Westfield, Indiana 46074 / US | |||
09 /
SNYDER, Nancy, June 3830 West 850 North Lizton, Indiana 46149 / US | |||
10 /
TOTH, James, Lee 4642 South 625 West Knightstown, Indiana 46148 / US | |||
11 /
WALLACE, Owen, Brendan 13297 Mink Lane Westfield, Indiana 46074 / US | |||
12 /
WINNEROSKI, JUNIOR, Leonard, Larry 587 Thoroughbred Lane Greenwood, Indiana 46142 / US | |||
13 /
XU, Yanping 6676 Pennan Court Noblesville, Indiana 46062 / US | |||
14 /
YORK, Jeremy, Schulenburg 16095 Tenor Way Noblesville, Indiana 46060 / US | Representative(s) | Smith, Andrew George, et al Eli Lilly and Company Limited Lilly Research Centre Erl Wood Manor Sunninghill Road Windlesham, Surrey GU20 6PH / GB | [2009/04] | Application number, filing date | 07760877.6 | 19.04.2007 | [2009/04] | WO2007US66921 | Priority number, date | US20060745311P | 21.04.2006 Original published format: US 745311 P | [2009/30] |
Former [2009/04] | US20060745321P | 21.04.2006 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007124337 | Date: | 01.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2016047 | Date: | 21.01.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.11.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2016047 | Date: | 28.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C07D207/12, C07D401/10, C07D401/12, C07D403/10, C07D413/10, C07D417/10, C07D417/14, C07D471/04, C07D487/04, C07D487/08, C07D491/08, C07D491/10, C07D498/04, A61P3/10, A61K31/4015 | [2009/04] | CPC: |
C07D207/12 (EP,US);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P3/06 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
C07D401/10 (EP,US);
C07D401/12 (EP,US);
C07D403/10 (EP,US);
C07D405/14 (EP,US);
C07D413/10 (EP,US);
C07D417/10 (EP,US);
C07D417/14 (EP,US);
C07D471/04 (EP,US);
C07D487/04 (EP,US);
C07D487/08 (EP,US);
C07D491/08 (EP,US);
C07D491/10 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/04] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BIPHENYLAMID-LACTAM-DERIVATE ALS INHIBITOREN VON 11-BETA-HYDROXYSTEROIDDEHYDROGENASE 1 | [2009/04] | English: | BIPHENYL AMIDE LACTAM DERIVATIVES AS INHIBITORS OF 11- BETA-HYDROXYSTEROID DEHYDROGENASE 1 | [2009/04] | French: | DÉRIVÉS DE BIPHÉNYLAMIDO-LACTAME EN TANT QU'INHIBITEURS DE LA 11-BÊTA-HYDROXYSTÉROÏDE DÉSHYDROGÉNASE 1 | [2009/04] | Entry into regional phase | 21.11.2008 | National basic fee paid | 21.11.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.11.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.11.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/04] | 16.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.07.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 18.07.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.04.2009 | Opposition(s) | 30.05.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.04.2007 | AT | 28.08.2013 | BE | 28.08.2013 | BG | 28.08.2013 | CY | 28.08.2013 | CZ | 28.08.2013 | DK | 28.08.2013 | EE | 28.08.2013 | FI | 28.08.2013 | LT | 28.08.2013 | LV | 28.08.2013 | MC | 28.08.2013 | MT | 28.08.2013 | NL | 28.08.2013 | PL | 28.08.2013 | RO | 28.08.2013 | SE | 28.08.2013 | SI | 28.08.2013 | SK | 28.08.2013 | TR | 28.08.2013 | GR | 29.11.2013 | IS | 28.12.2013 | PT | 30.12.2013 | GB | 19.04.2014 | IE | 19.04.2014 | IT | 19.04.2014 | LU | 19.04.2014 | ES | 20.04.2014 | CH | 30.04.2014 | FR | 30.04.2014 | LI | 30.04.2014 | [2016/50] |
Former [2016/33] | HU | 19.04.2007 | |
ES | 20.04.2007 | ||
AT | 28.08.2013 | ||
BE | 28.08.2013 | ||
BG | 28.08.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
EE | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
MC | 28.08.2013 | ||
MT | 28.08.2013 | ||
NL | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
SK | 28.08.2013 | ||
TR | 28.08.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
GB | 19.04.2014 | ||
IE | 19.04.2014 | ||
IT | 19.04.2014 | ||
LU | 19.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
FR | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 19.04.2007 | |
AT | 28.08.2013 | ||
BE | 28.08.2013 | ||
BG | 28.08.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
EE | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
MC | 28.08.2013 | ||
MT | 28.08.2013 | ||
NL | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
SK | 28.08.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
GB | 19.04.2014 | ||
IE | 19.04.2014 | ||
IT | 19.04.2014 | ||
LU | 19.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
FR | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 28.08.2013 | |
BE | 28.08.2013 | ||
BG | 28.08.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
EE | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
MC | 28.08.2013 | ||
MT | 28.08.2013 | ||
NL | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
SK | 28.08.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
GB | 19.04.2014 | ||
IE | 19.04.2014 | ||
IT | 19.04.2014 | ||
LU | 19.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
FR | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/16] | AT | 28.08.2013 | |
BE | 28.08.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
EE | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
MC | 28.08.2013 | ||
MT | 28.08.2013 | ||
NL | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
SK | 28.08.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
GB | 19.04.2014 | ||
IE | 19.04.2014 | ||
IT | 19.04.2014 | ||
LU | 19.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
FR | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/21] | AT | 28.08.2013 | |
BE | 28.08.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
EE | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
MC | 28.08.2013 | ||
NL | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
SK | 28.08.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
GB | 19.04.2014 | ||
IE | 19.04.2014 | ||
IT | 19.04.2014 | ||
LU | 19.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
FR | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/19] | AT | 28.08.2013 | |
BE | 28.08.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
EE | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
MC | 28.08.2013 | ||
NL | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
SK | 28.08.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
GB | 19.04.2014 | ||
IT | 19.04.2014 | ||
LU | 19.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
FR | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/14] | AT | 28.08.2013 | |
BE | 28.08.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
EE | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
MC | 28.08.2013 | ||
NL | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
SK | 28.08.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
GB | 19.04.2014 | ||
LU | 19.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
FR | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | AT | 28.08.2013 | |
BE | 28.08.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
EE | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
MC | 28.08.2013 | ||
NL | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
SK | 28.08.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
GB | 19.04.2014 | ||
LU | 19.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 28.08.2013 | |
BE | 28.08.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
EE | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
MC | 28.08.2013 | ||
NL | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
SK | 28.08.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
LU | 19.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/01] | AT | 28.08.2013 | |
BE | 28.08.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
EE | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
MC | 28.08.2013 | ||
NL | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
SK | 28.08.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
LU | 19.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/52] | AT | 28.08.2013 | |
BE | 28.08.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
EE | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
MC | 28.08.2013 | ||
NL | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
SK | 28.08.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | AT | 28.08.2013 | |
BE | 28.08.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
EE | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
NL | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
SK | 28.08.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | AT | 28.08.2013 | |
BE | 28.08.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
NL | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 28.08.2013 | |
BE | 28.08.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | AT | 28.08.2013 | |
BE | 28.08.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | CY | 24.07.2013 | |
AT | 28.08.2013 | ||
BE | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | CY | 24.07.2013 | |
AT | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CY | 24.07.2013 | |
AT | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CY | 24.07.2013 | |
AT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 28.08.2013 | |
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 28.08.2013 | |
PT | 30.12.2013 | Cited in | International search | [AD]WO2005108361 (JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA NV [BE], et al) [AD] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [PX]WO2006049952 (LILLY CO ELI [US], et al) [PX] 1-20* the whole document, in particular examples 142-145 *; | WO2006104280 [ ] (TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL [JP], et al); | [PX] - "Preparation of 3-benzylpyrrolidin-2-one and N-benzylimidazolidin-2-one derivaties as prophylactic/therapeutic agents for diabetes", CAPLUS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, XP002449024 [PX] 1-20 * abstract; compounds RN 911722-70-8 and RN911724-34-0; column A * | by applicant | WO2005108360 | WO2005108361 | WO2006049952 |