EP2013864 - SYSTEM, METHOD, AND APPARATUS FOR THREE-DIMENSIONAL INPUT CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 01.05.2015 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.05.2015 | Refusal of application | published on 03.06.2015 [2015/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Computer Entertainment Inc. 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2013/31] |
Former [2013/24] | For all designated states Sony Computer Entertainment Incorporated 1-7-1 Konan, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2009/03] | For all designated states Sony Computer Entertainment Inc. 2-6-21, Minami-Aoyama, Minato-ku Tokyo 107-0062 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAO, Xiadong 919 East Hillsdale Blvd., 2nd Floor Foster City, California 94404 / US | 02 /
MARKS, Richard, L. 919 East Hillsdale Blvd., 2nd Floor Foster City, California 94404 / US | 03 /
ZALEWSKI, Gary, M. 919 East Hillsdale Blvd., 2nd Floor Foster City, California 94404 / US | 04 /
ISENBERG, Joshua 809 Corporate Way Fremont, CA 94539 / US | [2011/33] |
Former [2009/03] | 01 /
MAO, Xiadong 919 East Hillsdale Blvd., 2nd Floor Foster City, California 94404 / US | ||
02 /
MARKS, Richard, L. 919 East Hillsdale Blvd., 2nd Floor Foster City, California 94404 / US | |||
03 /
ZALEWSKI, Gary, M. 919 East Hillsdale Blvd., 2nd Floor Foster City, California 94404 / US | Representative(s) | Turner, James Arthur D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/03] | Turner, James Arthur D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 07760947.7 | 19.04.2007 | [2009/03] | WO2007US67005 | Priority number, date | US20060381729 | 04.05.2006 Original published format: US 381729 | US20060381728 | 04.05.2006 Original published format: US 381728 | US20060381725 | 04.05.2006 Original published format: US 381725 | US20060381727 | 04.05.2006 Original published format: US 381727 | US20060381724 | 04.05.2006 Original published format: US 381724 | US20060381721 | 04.05.2006 Original published format: US 381721 | US20060418988 | 04.05.2006 Original published format: US 418988 | US20060418989 | 04.05.2006 Original published format: US 418989 | US20060429047 | 04.05.2006 Original published format: US 429047 | US20060429133 | 04.05.2006 Original published format: US 429133 | US20060429414 | 04.05.2006 Original published format: US 429414 | WO2006US27483 | 04.05.2006 Original published format: PCT/US2006/027483 | US20060259350 | 06.05.2006 Original published format: US 259350 | US20060259348 | 06.05.2006 Original published format: US 259348 | US20060798031P | 06.05.2006 Original published format: US 798031 P | US20060382038 | 06.05.2006 Original published format: US 382038 | US20060382034 | 06.05.2006 Original published format: US 382034 | US20060382037 | 06.05.2006 Original published format: US 382037 | US20060382031 | 06.05.2006 Original published format: US 382031 | US20060382032 | 06.05.2006 Original published format: US 382032 | US20060382033 | 06.05.2006 Original published format: US 382033 | US20060382035 | 06.05.2006 Original published format: US 382035 | US20060382036 | 06.05.2006 Original published format: US 382036 | US20060259349 | 06.05.2006 Original published format: US 259349 | US20060382043 | 07.05.2006 Original published format: US 382043 | US20060382039 | 07.05.2006 Original published format: US 382039 | US20060382041 | 07.05.2006 Original published format: US 382041 | US20060382040 | 07.05.2006 Original published format: US 382040 | US20060382252 | 08.05.2006 Original published format: US 382252 | US20060430594 | 08.05.2006 Original published format: US 430594 | US20060430593 | 08.05.2006 Original published format: US 430593 | US20060382259 | 08.05.2006 Original published format: US 382259 | US20060382258 | 08.05.2006 Original published format: US 382258 | US20060382251 | 08.05.2006 Original published format: US 382251 | US20060382256 | 08.05.2006 Original published format: US 382256 | US20060382250 | 08.05.2006 Original published format: US 382250 | US20060246744 | 08.05.2006 Original published format: US 246744 | US20060246743 | 08.05.2006 Original published format: US 246743 | US20060246767 | 08.05.2006 Original published format: US 246767 | US20060246768 | 08.05.2006 Original published format: US 246768 | US20060246763 | 08.05.2006 Original published format: US 246763 | US20060246759 | 08.05.2006 Original published format: US 246759 | US20060246765 | 08.05.2006 Original published format: US 246765 | US20060246766 | 08.05.2006 Original published format: US 246766 | US20060246764 | 08.05.2006 Original published format: US 246764 | US20060246762 | 08.05.2006 Original published format: US 246762 | [2009/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007130792 | Date: | 15.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/46] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2013864 | Date: | 14.01.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.11.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.09.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A63F13/00, G06F3/033, A63F13/06 | [2010/51] | CPC: |
A63F13/211 (EP,KR,US);
A63F13/20 (KR);
A63F13/428 (US);
A63F13/424 (US);
A63F2300/105 (EP,KR);
A63F2300/6045 (EP,KR)
|
Former IPC [2009/03] | G09G5/00, G09G5/08, G06F3/033, A63F9/24, A63F13/00, G06F17/00, G06F19/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/03] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM, VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR STEUERUNG DREIDIMENSIONALER EINGABEN | [2009/03] | English: | SYSTEM, METHOD, AND APPARATUS FOR THREE-DIMENSIONAL INPUT CONTROL | [2009/03] | French: | SYSTEME, PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE COMMANDE D'ENTREE TRIDIMENSIONNEL | [2009/03] | Entry into regional phase | 20.11.2008 | National basic fee paid | 20.11.2008 | Search fee paid | 20.11.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.11.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/03] | 06.06.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.06.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.12.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.2014 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2015/23] | 23.10.2014 | Date of oral proceedings | 20.01.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2015/23] | 20.01.2015 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.06.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5181181 (GLYNN BRIAN J [US]) [Y] 2-15 * figures 3,4,5,7 * * claims 1-18 *; | [XY]JPH11253656 (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO) [X] 1 * abstract * [Y] 2-15; | [XY]EP1332778 (SEGA ENTERPRISES KK [JP]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0133] - paragraph [0155]; figures 33-41 *[Y] 2-15 | International search | [A]US6890262 (OISHI TOSHIMITSU [JP], et al); | [A]US6417836 (KUMAR SENTHIL [US], et al); | [A]US6400374 (LANIER JARON [US]); | [A]US6022274 (TAKEDA GENYO [JP], et al); | [A]US5554980 (HASHIMOTO KOOSUKE [JP], et al) | Examination | - "accelerometer", Encyclopaedia Britannica, (20020101), pages 53 - 53, XP055064048 | by applicant | EP1332778 | JPH11253656 | US5181181 | US20060382034 | US20060429414 |