EP2022099 - SOLAR COLLECTOR ARRANGEMENT WITH REFLECTING SURFACE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 04.09.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.09.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 07.10.2009 [2009/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SunPower Corporation, Systems 1414 Harbour Way South Richmond, CA 94804 / US | [2009/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHUGAR, Daniel, S. 150 Tehama Court San Bruno, CA 94066 / US | 02 /
PEURACH, John 63 Potomac Street San Francisco, CA 94117 / US | 03 /
CAMPBELL, Matthew, Paul 1534 Scenic Avenue Berkeley, CA 94708 / US | [2009/16] |
Former [2009/07] | 01 /
SHUGAR, Daniel, S. 150 Tehama Court San Bruno, CA 94066 / US | ||
02 /
PEURACH, John 63 Potomac Street San Francisco, CA 94117 / US | |||
03 /
CAMPBELL, Matthew, Paul 3140 Eton Avenue Berkeley, CA 94705 / US | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/07] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07761069.9 | 20.04.2007 | [2009/07] | WO2007US67151 | Priority number, date | US20060745324P | 21.04.2006 Original published format: US 745324 P | [2009/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007124462 | Date: | 01.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/44] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2022099 | Date: | 11.02.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.11.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H01L25/00 | [2009/09] | CPC: |
H01L31/0547 (EP,US);
H01L31/054 (KR);
H01L31/048 (EP,US);
Y02E10/52 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/07] | H01L31/0248 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/07] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SONNENKOLLEKTORENANORDNUNG MIT REFLEKTIERENDER OBERFLÄCHE | [2009/07] | English: | SOLAR COLLECTOR ARRANGEMENT WITH REFLECTING SURFACE | [2009/07] | French: | DISPOSITION DE COLLECTEUR SOLAIRE AVEC SURFACE RÉFLÉCHISSANTE | [2009/07] | Entry into regional phase | 20.11.2008 | National basic fee paid | 20.11.2008 | Search fee paid | 20.11.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.11.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.11.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/07] | 26.08.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4137098 (FIELD RICHARD L); | [Y]US6051774 (YOSHIDA SHINICHIRO [JP], et al); | [X]US6232415 (AHMED IQBAL [US], et al); | [X]US6410843 (KISHI HITOSHI [JP], et al) |