EP2027024 - ARTICLE SUPPLY SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.12.2009 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.01.2010 [2010/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MeadWestvaco Packaging Systems, LLC 11013 West Broad Street Glen Allen, VA 23060 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/09] | For all designated states MeadWestvaco Packaging Systems LLC 11013 West Broad Street Glen Allen, VA 23060 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
POGET, Pierre-yves 93 rue de Strasbourg F-36000 Chateauroux / FR | 02 /
POUTOT, Benoit 28 rue Arthur Rimbaud F-36000 Chateauroux / FR | [2009/09] | Representative(s) | Coulson, Elizabeth Eve, et al Coulson & Rule 13 Whitehall Road Rugby, Warwickshire CV21 3AE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/09] | Coulson, Elizabeth Eve, et al Coulson & Associates 1st Floor Suite 5 Newbold Road Rugby CV21 2LQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 07762249.6 | 18.05.2007 | [2009/09] | WO2007US69251 | Priority number, date | GB20060009884 | 19.05.2006 Original published format: GB 0609884 | [2009/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007137165 | Date: | 29.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/48] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2027024 | Date: | 25.02.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.11.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B65B35/18 | [2009/09] | CPC: |
B65B5/024 (EP,US);
B65B9/045 (GB);
B65B35/18 (EP,US);
B65B35/24 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/09] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ARTIKELLIEFERUNGSSYSTEM | [2009/09] | English: | ARTICLE SUPPLY SYSTEM | [2009/09] | French: | SYSTÈME DE FOURNITURE D'ARTICLES | [2009/09] | Entry into regional phase | 10.11.2008 | National basic fee paid | 10.11.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.11.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/09] | 16.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.07.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/03] | 01.09.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]GB700930 (JOHNSON & JOHNSON); | [A]DE102004020549 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | [XDA]WO2006010086 (MEADWESTVACO PACKAGING SYSTEMS [US], et al) |