EP1982411 - NOTCH FILTER FOR RIPPLE REDUCTION IN CHOPPER STABILIZED AMPLIFIERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.06.2019 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.07.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.06.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.07.2019 [2019/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Texas Instruments Incorporated P.O. Box 655474 Mail Station 3999 Dallas, TX 75265-5474 / US | [2018/33] |
Former [2008/43] | For all designated states Texas Instruments Incorporated P.O. Box 655474 Mail Station 3999 Dallas, Texas 75265-5474 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BURT, Rodney T. 9073 East Rainsage Street Tucson, AZ 85747 / US | 02 /
ZHANG, Joy Y. 10128 East Chevelon Street Tucson, AZ 85748 / US | [2018/16] |
Former [2008/43] | 01 /
BURT, Rodney, T. 9073 East Rainsage Street Tucson, AZ 85747 / US | ||
02 /
ZHANG, Joy, Y. 10128 East Chevelon Street Tucson, AZ 85748 / US | Representative(s) | Zeller, Andreas, et al Texas Instruments Deutschland GmbH Haggertystraße 1 85356 Freising / DE | [2018/33] |
Former [2008/43] | Holt, Michael Texas Instruments Limited European Patents Department 800 Pavilion Drive Northampton Business Park Northampton Northamptonshire NN4 7YL / GB | Application number, filing date | 07762382.5 | 26.01.2007 | [2008/43] | WO2007US61139 | Priority number, date | US20060340223 | 26.01.2006 Original published format: US 340223 | [2008/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007087630 | Date: | 02.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/31] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1982411 | Date: | 22.10.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.08.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1982411 | Date: | 15.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.11.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H03F1/02, H03F1/26, H03F3/00, H03F3/387 | [2009/20] | CPC: |
H03F3/45968 (EP,US);
H03F1/02 (KR);
H03F1/26 (EP,US);
H03F3/005 (EP,US);
H03F3/387 (EP,US);
H03F3/45 (KR);
H03H19/004 (EP,US);
H03F2200/261 (EP,US);
H03F2200/459 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2008/43] | H03F1/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2018/33] |
Former [2009/25] | DE, FR, GB, NL | ||
Former [2008/43] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SPERRFILTER FÜR WELLIGKEITSREDUKTION IN STABILISIERTEN CHOPPER-VERSTÄRKERN | [2008/43] | English: | NOTCH FILTER FOR RIPPLE REDUCTION IN CHOPPER STABILIZED AMPLIFIERS | [2008/43] | French: | FILTRE COUPE-BANDE À BANDE ÉTROITE POUR LA DIMINUTION D'ONDULATION RÉSIDUELLE DANS DES AMPLIFICATEURS STABILISÉS PAR DÉCOUPAGE | [2008/43] | Entry into regional phase | 26.08.2008 | National basic fee paid | 26.08.2008 | Search fee paid | 06.05.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.05.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.03.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 06.05.2009 | Examination requested [2009/25] | 08.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.06.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 18.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.01.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.08.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 29.10.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.06.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 28.06.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.06.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.06.2009 | Opposition(s) | 16.05.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/30] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 29.10.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 29.10.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.11.2015 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 08.11.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 08.11.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.11.2010 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 01.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 15.08.2018 | [2019/09] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6351506 (LEWICKI LAURENCE DOUGLAS [US]) [X] 1-14 * column 1, lines 9-12; figures 5-7,9,9a * * column 2, lines 48-60 * * column 4, lines 3-38 ** column 5, line 5 - column 9, line 18 * | International search | [A]US7233198 (NIEDERKORN ANDREA [US]) | by applicant | US6351506 |