EP1981851 - KINASE INHIBITORS AND METHODS OF USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.11.2012 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.01.2013 [2013/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Array Biopharma, Inc. 3200 Walnut Street Boulder, CO 80301 / US | [2008/52] |
Former [2008/43] | For all designated states Array Biopharma, Inc. 3200 Walnut Street Boulder, CO 80301 / US | ||
For all designated states Groneberg, Robert 958 Yellow Pine Avenue Boulder CO 80304 / US | |||
For all designated states Burgess, Laurence E. 405 Oakwood Place Boulder CO 80304 / US | |||
For all designated states Harvey, Darren 3250 West Fairview Place Denver CO 80211 / US | |||
For all designated states Laird, Ellen 2435 Mallard Circle Longmont, CO 80504 / US | |||
For all designated states Munson, Mark 513 Cactus Court Louisville CO 80027 / US | |||
For all designated states Rizzi, James 7180 Longview Drive Longmont CO 80503 / US | |||
For all designated states Rodriguez, Martha 3549 Larkspur Drive Longmont CO 80503 / US | |||
For all designated states Eary, Charles Todd 4214 Da Vinci Drive Longmont CO 80503 / US | |||
For all designated states Watson, Daniel 315 North Cherrywood Drive Lafayette CO 80026 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRONEBERG, Robert 958 Yellow Pine Avenue Boulder, CO 80304 / US | 02 /
BURGESS, Laurence, E. 405 Oakwood Place Boulder, CO 80304 / US | 03 /
HARVEY, Darren 10225 King Street Westminster, CO 80031 / US | 04 /
LAIRD, Ellen 2435 Mallard Circle Longmont, CO 80504 / US | 05 /
MUNSON, Mark 513 Cactus Court Louisville, CO 80027 / US | 06 /
RIZZI, James 7180 Longview Drive Longmont, CO 80503 / US | 07 /
RODRIGUEZ, Martha 3549 Larkspur Drive Longmont, CO 80503 / US | 08 /
EARY, Charles, Todd 4214 Da Vinci Drive Longmont, CO 80503 / US | 09 /
WATSON, Daniel 315 North Cherrywood Drive Lafayette, CO 80026 / US | [2009/01] |
Former [2008/52] | 01 /
GRONEBERG, Robert 958 Yellow Pine Avenue Boulder, CO 80304 / US | ||
02 /
BURGESS, Laurence, E. 405 Oakwood Place Boulder, CO 80304 / US | |||
03 /
HARVEY, Darren 3250 West Fairview Place Denver, CO 80211 / US | |||
04 /
LAIRD, Ellen 2435 Mallard Circle Longmont, CO 80504 / US | |||
05 /
MUNSON, Mark 513 Cactus Court Louisville, CO 80027 / US | |||
06 /
RIZZI, James 7180 Longview Drive Longmont, CO 80503 / US | |||
07 /
RODRIGUEZ, Martha 3549 Larkspur Drive Longmont, CO 80503 / US | |||
08 /
EARY, Charles, Todd 4214 Da Vinci Drive Longmont, CO 80503 / US | |||
09 /
WATSON, Daniel 315 North Cherrywood Drive Lafayette, CO 80026 / US | |||
Former [2008/43] | 01 /
GRONEBERG, Robert 958 Yellow Pine Avenue Boulder CO 80304 / US | ||
02 /
BURGESS, Laurence, E. 405 Oakwood Place Boulder CO 80304 / US | |||
03 /
HARVEY, Darren 3250 West Fairview Place Denver CO 80211 / US | |||
04 /
LAIRD, Ellen 2435 Mallard Circle Longmont CO 80504 / US | |||
05 /
MUNSON, Mark 513 Cactus Court Louisville CO 80027 / US | |||
06 /
RIZZI, James 7180 Longview Drive Longmont CO 80503 / US | |||
07 /
RODRIGUEZ, Martha 3549 Larkspur Drive Longmont CO 80503 / US | |||
08 /
EARY, Charles, Todd 4214 Da Vinci Drive Longmont CO 80503 / US | |||
09 /
WATSON, Daniel 315 North Cherrywood Drive Lafayette CO 80026 / US | Representative(s) | Office Freylinger P.O. Box 48 8001 Strassen / LU | [2012/04] |
Former [2009/27] | Office Freylinger P.O. Box 48 8001 Strassen / LU | ||
Former [2008/43] | Kihn, Pierre Emile Joseph, et al Office Ernest T. Freylinger S.A. 234, route d'Arlon B.P. 48 8001 Strassen / LU | Application number, filing date | 07762713.1 | 26.01.2007 | [2008/43] | WO2007US02272 | Priority number, date | US20060763712P | 31.01.2006 Original published format: US 763712 P | [2008/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007089646 | Date: | 09.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1981851 | Date: | 22.10.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.08.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1981851 | Date: | 25.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C07D231/40, C07D231/56, A61K31/416, A61P29/00 | [2008/43] | CPC: |
C07D231/40 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/416 (KR);
A61P19/00 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P19/08 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07D231/56 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/43] | Extension states | AL | 12.08.2008 | BA | 12.08.2008 | HR | 12.08.2008 | MK | 12.08.2008 | RS | 12.08.2008 | Title | German: | KINASEHEMMER UND IHRE ANWENDUNGSVERFAHREN | [2008/43] | English: | KINASE INHIBITORS AND METHODS OF USE THEREOF | [2008/43] | French: | INHIBITEURS DE KINASE ET MÉTHODES D'UTILISATION | [2008/43] | Entry into regional phase | 12.08.2008 | National basic fee paid | 12.08.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.08.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.08.2008 | Examination requested [2008/43] | 20.08.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.10.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 25.10.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.03.2010 | Opposition(s) | 26.10.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]WO2004078116 (ARRAY BIOPHARMA INC [US], et al) [AD] 1-22 * examples 94,138 *; | [X]WO2005023761 (KEMIA INC [US], et al) [X] 22 * carbamate esters mentioned on:; page 109, line 17 ** page 119, line 14 * | by applicant | WO2004078116 | - ADVANCED DRUG DELIVERY REVIEWS, (1996), vol. 19, page 115 | - J. MED. CHEM., (1996), vol. 39, page 10 |