EP1994641 - CAPACITANCE-TO-DIGITAL INTERFACE CIRCUIT FOR DIFFERENTIAL PRESSURE SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.10.2013 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.10.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.11.2013 [2013/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fisher-Rosemount Systems, Inc. 12301 Research Boulevard Law Department Research Park Plaza, Building III Austin, Texas 78759-2369 / US | [2012/51] |
Former [2008/48] | For all designated states Fisher-Rosemount Systems, Inc. 12301 Research Boulevard Law Department Research Park Plaza, Building III Austen, Texas 78759-2369 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Rongtai c/o Fisher-Rosemount Systems, Inc. 12301 Research Boulevard - Law Department Research Park Plaza, Building III Austin, Texas 78759-2369 / US | [2012/51] |
Former [2008/48] | 01 /
WANG, Rongtai c/o Fisher-Rosemount Systems, Inc. 12301 Research Boulevard - Law Department Research Park Plaza, Building III Austin, Texas 78759-2369 / US | Representative(s) | Elsworth, Dominic Stephen Hargreaves Elsworth 26 Northumberland Square North Shields, Tyne & Wear NE30 1PW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/51] | Elsworth, Dominic Stephen Hargreaves Elsworth Cooper's Studios 14-18 Westgate Road Newcastle-upon-Tyne NE1 3NN / GB | ||
Former [2008/48] | Elsworth, Dominic Stephen Hargreaves Elsworth 6 Charlotte Square Newcastle-upon-Tyne NE1 4XF / GB | Application number, filing date | 07762743.8 | 26.01.2007 | [2008/48] | WO2007US02262 | Priority number, date | US20060339890 | 26.01.2006 Original published format: US 339890 | [2008/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007089640 | Date: | 09.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/32] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1994641 | Date: | 26.11.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.08.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1994641 | Date: | 19.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 07.05.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H03M3/00, G01L9/12, H03M3/02 | [2012/27] | CPC: |
G01L9/12 (EP,US);
H03M3/356 (EP,US);
H03M3/43 (EP,US);
H03M3/438 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/12] | H03M3/00, G01L9/12 | ||
Former IPC [2008/48] | H03M3/00 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, LI [2009/51] |
Former [2008/48] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | KAPAZITÄTS-DIGITALWANDLER-SCHNITTSTELLENSCHALTUNG FÜR EINEN DIFFERENTIALDRUCKSENSOR | [2008/48] | English: | CAPACITANCE-TO-DIGITAL INTERFACE CIRCUIT FOR DIFFERENTIAL PRESSURE SENSOR | [2008/48] | French: | CIRCUIT D'INTERFACE NUMÉRISEUR DE CAPACITÉS POUR CAPTEUR DE PRESSION DIFFÉRENTIELLE | [2008/48] | Entry into regional phase | 26.08.2008 | National basic fee paid | 26.08.2008 | Search fee paid | 09.11.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.11.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.08.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.11.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 09.11.2009 | Examination requested [2009/51] | 16.12.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 27.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.11.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 12.11.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.05.2010 | Opposition(s) | 20.09.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2010 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   02.08.2010 | 31.01.2011 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   01.08.2011 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2004128110 (SCHULTE JOHN P [US], et al) [X] 1-2,9-11 * page 2, paragraph 22 - page 4, paragraph 44; figures 1-5 * * page 4, paragraph 50 - page 6, paragraph 81; claim 1 * [Y] 3-7,12-13; | [XY]US6356085 (RYAT MARC [SE], et al) [X] 1-2,9-11 * column 3, lines 1-3; figures 1, 4, 5 * * column 3, line 23 - column 4, line 20 * [Y] 3-7,12-13; | [Y]US2002178827 (WANG RONGTAI [US]) [Y] 3-7,12-13 * page 4, paragraph 35; figures 11, 12 * * page 4, paragraph 41 - page 5, paragraph 53 *; | [A]US6975103 (BLOM ERIC D [US]) [A] 1-13 * the whole document * | International search | [X]US6356085 (RYAT MARC [SE], et al); | [Y]US2002178827 (WANG RONGTAI [US]); | [Y]US4723295 (KOSAKA MINORU [JP], et al); | [Y]US6975103 (BLOM ERIC D [US]); | [A]US5039989 (WELLAND DAVID R [IE], et al) | by applicant | US6295875 | US5083091 | US6140952 | US6509746 | US6516672 | US2004128110 | US6356085 | US2002178827 |