13.02.2015 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 18.03.2015 [2015/12] |
21.01.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.11.2014 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
05.06.2014 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
01.02.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.01.2014 |
Change - representative |
published on 12.02.2014 [2014/07] |
30.01.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.07.2012 |
Change - extension states |
published on 08.08.2012 [2012/32] |
28.01.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.01.2012 |
Change - representative |
published on 22.02.2012 [2012/08] |
28.01.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.07.2010 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
16.03.2010 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
09.03.2010 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
09.03.2010 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
05.03.2010 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
28.01.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.12.2009 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
11.09.2009 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
19.06.2009 |
Change - applicant |
published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] |
08.05.2009 |
First examination report |
|
05.05.2009 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
10.02.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.01.2009 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 04.03.2009 [2009/10] |
03.10.2008 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 05.11.2008 [2008/45] |
03.10.2008 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 05.11.2008 [2008/45] |
01.10.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.09.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.09.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.09.2008 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
08.12.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.09.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.08.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|