EP1987361 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR DETECTING AND QUANTIFYING TOXIC SUBSTANCES IN DISEASE STATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.02.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.02.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.03.2015 [2015/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Life Technologies Corporation 5823 Newton Drive Carlsbad, CA 92008 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/30] | For all designated states Life Technologies Corporation 5791 Van Allen Way Carlsbad, CA 92008 / US | ||
Former [2008/45] | For all designated states INVITROGEN CORPORATION 1600 Faraday Avenue Carlsbad, CA 92008 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BEERNICK, Hans T. 5977 Palomar Circle CamariLLo, California 93012 / US | 02 /
BRODEY, Mary M. 9554 Coosa Street Ventura, California 93004 / US | [2008/45] | Representative(s) | Shah, Punita, et al HGF Limited 4th Floor, Merchant Exchange 17-19 Whitworth Street West Manchester M1 5WG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/07] | Shah, Punita, et al Harrison Goddard Foote LLP 4th Floor, Merchant Exchange 17-19 Whitworth Street West Manchester M1 5WG / GB | ||
Former [2012/08] | Harrison Goddard Foote 4th Floor, Merchant Exchange 17-19 Whitworth Street West Manchester M1 5WG / GB | ||
Former [2008/45] | Harrison Goddard Foote Orlando House 11c Compstall Road Marple Bridge Stockport SK6 5HH / GB | Application number, filing date | 07762855.0 | 30.01.2007 | [2008/45] | WO2007US61321 | Priority number, date | US20060763247P | 30.01.2006 Original published format: US 763247 P | [2008/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007090126 | Date: | 09.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/32] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1987361 | Date: | 05.11.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.08.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 06.12.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/68 | [2008/45] | CPC: |
G01N33/564 (EP,US);
G01N2333/4716 (EP,US);
G01N2800/122 (EP,US);
G01N2800/2821 (EP,US);
G01N2800/2828 (EP,US);
G01N2800/2835 (EP,US);
G01N2800/32 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/45] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR ERKENNUNG UND QUANTIFIZIERUNG TOXISCHER SUBSTANZEN IN KRANKHEITSSTADIEN | [2008/45] | English: | COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR DETECTING AND QUANTIFYING TOXIC SUBSTANCES IN DISEASE STATES | [2008/45] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ET PROCÉDÉ POUR DÉTECTER ET QUANTIFIER DES SUBSTANCES TOXIQUES DANS DES ÉTATS PATHOLOGIQUES | [2008/45] | Entry into regional phase | 28.08.2008 | National basic fee paid | 28.08.2008 | Search fee paid | 28.08.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.08.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.08.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.08.2008 | Examination requested [2008/45] | 12.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.06.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/12] | 12.11.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/12] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.05.2009 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 03.03.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 03.03.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO03000719 (UNIV RAMOT [IL], et al) [Y] 33-42 * page 13 - page 15; claims 1-22 *; | [Y] - BAINBRIDGE J ET AL, "Multiple antigenic peptides facilitate generation of anti-prion antibodies", CLINICAL AND EXPERIMENTAL IMMUNOLOGY, WILEY-BLACKWELL PUBLISHING LTD, GB, (20040801), vol. 137, no. 2, ISSN 0009-9104, pages 298 - 304, XP009110393 [Y] 33-42 * page 298 * | International search | [A]WO2004092724 (US GOV HEALTH & HUMAN SERV [US], et al); | [A] - SAITO H. ET AL., "Isolation of peptides useful for differential diagnosis of Crohn's disease and ulcerative colitis", GUT, (200304), vol. 52, pages 535 - 540, XP009088009 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1136/gut.52.4.535 | [A] - SARAVANAN P, "Use of multiple antigenic peptides related to antigenic determinants of infectious bursal disease virus (IBDV) for detection of anti-IBDV-specific antibody in ELISA-quantitative comparison with native antigen for their use in serodiagnosis", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGICAL METHODS, vol. 293, (2004), pages 61 - 70, URL: http://www.sciencedirect.com/sciece?_ob=ArticleURL&_udi=B6T2Y-4D1V35F-1&_user=9815016_coverDate=10%2F01%2F2004&-rdoc=1&_fmt=_orig=search&-sort=d&view=c&_acct=C000048939&_version=1&-urlVersion=0&_userid=981501&md5=cda50e1c14b866846235aa41cbb985e5, XP008131768 | [A] - ANGELETTI R.H., "Design of Useful Peptide Antigens", JOURNAL OF BIOMOLECULAR TECHNIQUES, vol. 10, no. 1, (19990301), pages 2 - 10, URL: http://jbt.abrf.org/cgi/reprint/10/1/2, XP009110382 |