EP1983945 - MODULAR INTERVERTEBRAL DISC REPLACEMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.11.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.12.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Depuy Spine, Inc. 325 Paramount Drive Raynham, MA 02767 / US | [2008/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
O'NEIL, Michael, J. 121 Lombard Ave. West Barnstable, MA 02668 / US | 02 /
SUTTON, Jeffrey, Karl 6 Longmeadow Lane Medway, MA 02053 / US | 03 /
DOORIS, Andrew 39 Overlook Drive E Raynham, MA 02767 / US | [2008/44] | Representative(s) | Orr, Robert Murgitroyd & Company Leeds Arena Point Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/01] | Orr, Robert Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Arena Point Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | ||
Former [2008/44] | Orr, Robert Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | Application number, filing date | 07763263.6 | 22.01.2007 | [2008/44] | WO2007US01572 | Priority number, date | US20060307369 | 03.02.2006 Original published format: US 307369 | [2008/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007092144 | Date: | 16.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/33] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1983945 | Date: | 29.10.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.08.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1983945 | Date: | 04.01.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.12.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/30, A61F2/44 | [2016/33] | CPC: |
A61F2/4425 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30332 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30354 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30364 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30383 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30426 (EP,US);
A61F2002/305 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30507 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30604 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30616 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30662 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30663 (EP,US);
A61F2002/443 (EP,US);
A61F2220/0025 (EP,US);
A61F2220/0033 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2008/44] | A61F2/44 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/01] |
Former [2008/44] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MODULARER BANDSCHEIBENERSATZ | [2008/44] | English: | MODULAR INTERVERTEBRAL DISC REPLACEMENTS | [2008/44] | French: | REMPLACEMENTS DE DISQUES INTERVERTÉBRAUX MODULAIRES | [2008/44] | Entry into regional phase | 26.08.2008 | National basic fee paid | 26.08.2008 | Search fee paid | 26.08.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.08.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.08.2008 | Examination requested [2008/44] | 05.05.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.02.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.09.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.03.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.08.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.11.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 28.11.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.11.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.10.2012 | Opposition(s) | 05.10.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.01.2007 | AT | 04.01.2017 | CY | 04.01.2017 | CZ | 04.01.2017 | DK | 04.01.2017 | EE | 04.01.2017 | ES | 04.01.2017 | FI | 04.01.2017 | IT | 04.01.2017 | LT | 04.01.2017 | LV | 04.01.2017 | MC | 04.01.2017 | NL | 04.01.2017 | PL | 04.01.2017 | RO | 04.01.2017 | SE | 04.01.2017 | SI | 04.01.2017 | SK | 04.01.2017 | TR | 04.01.2017 | IE | 22.01.2017 | LU | 22.01.2017 | BE | 31.01.2017 | FR | 06.03.2017 | BG | 04.04.2017 | GR | 05.04.2017 | IS | 04.05.2017 | PT | 04.05.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/46] | HU | 22.01.2007 | |
AT | 04.01.2017 | ||
CY | 04.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
MC | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SI | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
IE | 22.01.2017 | ||
LU | 22.01.2017 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
FR | 06.03.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 22.01.2007 | |
AT | 04.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
MC | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SI | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
IE | 22.01.2017 | ||
LU | 22.01.2017 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
FR | 06.03.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | AT | 04.01.2017 | |
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
MC | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SI | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
IE | 22.01.2017 | ||
LU | 22.01.2017 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
FR | 06.03.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | AT | 04.01.2017 | |
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
MC | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
LU | 22.01.2017 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
FR | 06.03.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 04.01.2017 | |
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
MC | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
LU | 22.01.2017 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 04.01.2017 | |
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
MC | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 04.01.2017 | |
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | AT | 04.01.2017 | |
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/40] | AT | 04.01.2017 | |
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | ES | 04.01.2017 | |
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO02089701 (LDR MEDICAL [FR], et al) [X] 1-15 * page 10, line 26 - page 13, line 6; figures 1-9b; claim - *; | [X]US2003204261 (EISERMANN LUKAS [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0034] - [0055]; figures 1-17; claim - *; | [XA]EP1250898 (LINK WALDEMAR GMBH CO [DE]) [X] 1-4 * figures 1-11; claim - * [A] 5-15; | [X]EP0955021 (LINK WALDEMAR GMBH CO [DE]) [X] 1-4 * paragraphs [0011] - [0017]; figure -; claim - *; | [X]US4759766 (BUETTNER-JANZ KARIN [DD], et al) [X] 1-4 * figures 13-19; example 5; claim - *; | [A]WO2005094736 (SDGI HOLDINGS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 15; figure 28; claim - *; | [A]WO2004041131 (SPINAL CONCEPTS INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * page 10, paragraph 4 - page 11, paragraph 4; figures 14-17; claim - * | International search | [X]US2005277938 (PARSONS MATTHEW [US]); | [Y]EP1374808 (DEPUY SPINE INC [US]) | by applicant | WO02089701 | US2003204261 | EP1250898 | EP0955021 | US4759766 | WO2004041131 |