EP1989315 - Generation of marker-free and backbone-free transgenic plants using a single binary approach [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/46] | GENERATION OF MARKER-FREE AND BACKBONE-FREE TRANSGENIC PLANTS USING A SINGLE BINARY APPROACH | ||
[2015/12] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.05.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states J.R. Simplot Company Simplot Plant Sciences 5369 W. Irving Street Boise, ID 83706 / US | [2015/28] |
Former [2008/46] | For all designated states J.R. Simplot Company Simplot Plant Sciences 5369 W. Irving Street Boise, ID 83706 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RICHAEL, Craig 2830 NW, 3rd Street Meridian, ID 83642 / US | [2008/46] | Representative(s) | Murphy, Colm Damien, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2014/01] |
Former [2013/07] | Murphy, Colm Damien Ipulse Carrington House 123-130-Regent Street London W1B 5SE / GB | ||
Former [2011/10] | Bentham, Andrew J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2008/46] | Woods, Geoffrey Corlett J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 07763365.9 | 02.02.2007 | [2008/46] | WO2007US02892 | Priority number, date | US20060765177P | 06.02.2006 Original published format: US 765177 P | [2008/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007092308 | Date: | 16.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/33] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1989315 | Date: | 12.11.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.08.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1989315 | Date: | 08.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.09.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/82 | [2008/46] | CPC: |
C12N15/8205 (EP,US);
C12N15/821 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/28] |
Former [2008/46] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Erzeugung von markerfreien und rückgratfreien genveränderten Pflanzen mit einem einfachen binären Ansatz | [2015/12] | English: | Generation of marker-free and backbone-free transgenic plants using a single binary approach | [2015/12] | French: | Production de plantes transgéniques exemptes de marqueur et de squelette par une approche binaire simple | [2015/12] |
Former [2008/46] | ERZEUGUNG VON MARKER-FREIEN UND RÜCKRATFREIEN GEN-VERÄNDERTEN PFLANZEN MIT EINEM EINFACHEN BINÄREN ANSATZ | ||
Former [2008/46] | GENERATION OF MARKER-FREE AND BACKBONE-FREE TRANSGENIC PLANTS USING A SINGLE BINARY APPROACH | ||
Former [2008/46] | PRODUCTION DE PLANTES TRANSGÉNIQUES EXEMPTES DE MARQUEUR ET DE SQUELETTE PAR UNE APPROCHE BINAIRE SIMPLE | Entry into regional phase | 03.09.2008 | National basic fee paid | 03.09.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.09.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.09.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/46] | 25.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.04.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.10.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.05.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.01.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 26.03.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.10.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.10.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.05.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 27.05.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.05.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.05.2009 | Opposition(s) | 11.04.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/24] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 26.03.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 26.03.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.04.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.02.2007 | AT | 08.07.2015 | BG | 08.07.2015 | CY | 08.07.2015 | CZ | 08.07.2015 | DK | 08.07.2015 | EE | 08.07.2015 | FI | 08.07.2015 | IT | 08.07.2015 | LT | 08.07.2015 | LV | 08.07.2015 | MC | 08.07.2015 | RO | 08.07.2015 | SE | 08.07.2015 | SI | 08.07.2015 | SK | 08.07.2015 | TR | 08.07.2015 | GR | 09.10.2015 | IS | 08.11.2015 | PT | 09.11.2015 | LU | 02.02.2016 | CH | 29.02.2016 | LI | 29.02.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/33] | HU | 02.02.2007 | |
AT | 08.07.2015 | ||
CY | 08.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2015 | ||
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
EE | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
IT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
MC | 08.07.2015 | ||
RO | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
SI | 08.07.2015 | ||
SK | 08.07.2015 | ||
TR | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
LU | 02.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 02.02.2007 | |
AT | 08.07.2015 | ||
CY | 08.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2015 | ||
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
EE | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
IT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
MC | 08.07.2015 | ||
RO | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
SI | 08.07.2015 | ||
SK | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
LU | 02.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 08.07.2015 | |
CZ | 08.07.2015 | ||
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
EE | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
IT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
MC | 08.07.2015 | ||
RO | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
SI | 08.07.2015 | ||
SK | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
LU | 02.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/43] | AT | 08.07.2015 | |
CZ | 08.07.2015 | ||
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
EE | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
IT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
MC | 08.07.2015 | ||
RO | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
SI | 08.07.2015 | ||
SK | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
LU | 02.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/42] | AT | 08.07.2015 | |
CZ | 08.07.2015 | ||
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
EE | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
IT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
MC | 08.07.2015 | ||
RO | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
SI | 08.07.2015 | ||
SK | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 08.07.2015 | |
CZ | 08.07.2015 | ||
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
EE | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
IT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
RO | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
SI | 08.07.2015 | ||
SK | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 08.07.2015 | |
CZ | 08.07.2015 | ||
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
EE | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
IT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
RO | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
SK | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 08.07.2015 | |
CZ | 08.07.2015 | ||
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
EE | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
IT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 08.07.2015 | |
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
IT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 08.07.2015 | |
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 08.07.2015 | |
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | FI | 08.07.2015 | |
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 08.07.2015 | |
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 08.07.2015 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO03069980 (SIMPLOT CO J R [US], et al); | [A]WO03079765 (SIMPLOT CO J R [US], et al); | [A]WO2004092390 (MONSANTO TECHNOLOGY LLC [US], et al); | [A]WO2005004585 (SIMPLOT CO J R [US], et al); | Examination | - LUO KEMING ET AL, "The maize Knotted1 gene is an effective positive selectable marker gene for Agrobacterium-mediated tobacco transformation", PLANT CELL REPORTS, (200605), vol. 25, no. 5, ISSN 0721-7714, pages 403 - 409 | by applicant | US6326192 | US6407312 | US6441276 | US6452068 | US6521458 | US2003221213 | US2004107455 | US2004237142 |