EP1986791 - DRUG DELIVERY SYSTEM AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.09.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Exogenesis Corporation 20 Fortune Drive Billerica, MA 01821 / US | [2015/43] |
Former [2010/23] | For all designated states Exogenesis Corporation 10 Manning Road Billerica, MA 01821 / US | ||
Former [2008/45] | For all designated states Exogenesis Corporation 30 Washington Street Wellesley Hills MA 02481 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BLINN, Stephen, M. c/o Exogenesis Corporation 30 Washington Street Wellesley Hills, MA 02481 / US | 02 /
SVRLUGA, Richard, C. c/o Exogenesis Corporation 30 Washington Street Wellesley Hills, Massachusetts 02481 / US | [2015/44] |
Former [2008/45] | 01 /
BLINN, Stephen, M. c/o Exogenesis Corporation 30 Washington Street Wellesley Hills, MA 02481 / US | ||
02 /
SVRLUGA, Richard, C. c/o Exogenesis Corporation 30 Washington Street Wellesley Hills, Massachusetts 02481 / US | Representative(s) | Casey, Lindsay Joseph, et al FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Dublin D04 F838 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/44] | Casey, Lindsay Joseph, et al FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Ballsbridge Dublin 4 / IE | ||
Former [2008/45] | Casey, Lindsay Joseph, et al F. R. Kelly & Co. 27 Clyde Road Ballsbridge Dublin 4 / IE | Application number, filing date | 07763398.0 | 07.02.2007 | [2008/45] | WO2007US61787 | Priority number, date | US20060349483 | 07.02.2006 Original published format: US 349483 | US20060550069 | 17.10.2006 Original published format: US 550069 | [2008/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007092894 | Date: | 16.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/33] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1986791 | Date: | 05.11.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.08.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1986791 | Date: | 28.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/44] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP1986791 | Date: | 31.05.2017 | [2017/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 19.06.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.08.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B05D3/08, B05D1/08, B05D5/00, A61L31/16 | [2011/39] | CPC: |
A61L31/16 (EP,US);
A61F2/82 (EP,US);
A61L31/12 (US);
A61P3/06 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P7/02 (EP);
C23C14/022 (EP,US);
C23C14/221 (EP,US);
C23C14/505 (EP,US);
A61F2250/0067 (EP,US);
A61L2300/406 (EP,US);
A61L2300/416 (EP,US);
A61L2300/42 (EP,US);
A61L2300/426 (EP,US);
A61L2300/61 (EP,US);
A61L2300/62 (EP,US);
A61L2400/18 (EP,US);
H01J2237/0812 (EP,US);
Y10T428/249988 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31504 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2008/45] | B05D3/08, B05D1/08, B05D5/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/44] |
Former [2008/45] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ARZNEIMITTELVERABREICHUNGSSYSTEM UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2008/45] | English: | DRUG DELIVERY SYSTEM AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING THEREOF | [2008/45] | French: | SYSTÈME DE DÉLIVRANCE DE MÉDICAMENTS ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2008/45] | Entry into regional phase | 08.09.2008 | National basic fee paid | 08.09.2008 | Search fee paid | 19.12.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.12.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/07] | 22.03.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.11.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.05.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.07.2015 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 22.07.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 22.07.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.08.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.08.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.11.2012 | Opposition(s) | 29.07.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.02.2007 | AT | 28.10.2015 | BG | 28.10.2015 | CY | 28.10.2015 | CZ | 28.10.2015 | DK | 28.10.2015 | EE | 28.10.2015 | FI | 28.10.2015 | LT | 28.10.2015 | LV | 28.10.2015 | MC | 28.10.2015 | PL | 28.10.2015 | RO | 28.10.2015 | SI | 28.10.2015 | SK | 28.10.2015 | TR | 28.10.2015 | GR | 29.01.2016 | LU | 07.02.2016 | IS | 28.02.2016 | PT | 29.02.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/33] | HU | 07.02.2007 | |
AT | 28.10.2015 | ||
CY | 28.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 28.10.2015 | ||
DK | 28.10.2015 | ||
EE | 28.10.2015 | ||
FI | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LV | 28.10.2015 | ||
MC | 28.10.2015 | ||
PL | 28.10.2015 | ||
RO | 28.10.2015 | ||
SI | 28.10.2015 | ||
SK | 28.10.2015 | ||
TR | 28.10.2015 | ||
GR | 29.01.2016 | ||
LU | 07.02.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
PT | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 07.02.2007 | |
AT | 28.10.2015 | ||
CY | 28.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 28.10.2015 | ||
DK | 28.10.2015 | ||
EE | 28.10.2015 | ||
FI | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LV | 28.10.2015 | ||
MC | 28.10.2015 | ||
PL | 28.10.2015 | ||
RO | 28.10.2015 | ||
SI | 28.10.2015 | ||
SK | 28.10.2015 | ||
GR | 29.01.2016 | ||
LU | 07.02.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
PT | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 28.10.2015 | |
CZ | 28.10.2015 | ||
DK | 28.10.2015 | ||
EE | 28.10.2015 | ||
FI | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LV | 28.10.2015 | ||
MC | 28.10.2015 | ||
PL | 28.10.2015 | ||
RO | 28.10.2015 | ||
SI | 28.10.2015 | ||
SK | 28.10.2015 | ||
GR | 29.01.2016 | ||
LU | 07.02.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
PT | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/43] | AT | 28.10.2015 | |
CZ | 28.10.2015 | ||
DK | 28.10.2015 | ||
EE | 28.10.2015 | ||
FI | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LV | 28.10.2015 | ||
MC | 28.10.2015 | ||
PL | 28.10.2015 | ||
RO | 28.10.2015 | ||
SK | 28.10.2015 | ||
GR | 29.01.2016 | ||
LU | 07.02.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
PT | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/42] | AT | 28.10.2015 | |
CZ | 28.10.2015 | ||
DK | 28.10.2015 | ||
EE | 28.10.2015 | ||
FI | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LV | 28.10.2015 | ||
MC | 28.10.2015 | ||
PL | 28.10.2015 | ||
RO | 28.10.2015 | ||
SK | 28.10.2015 | ||
GR | 29.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
PT | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 28.10.2015 | |
CZ | 28.10.2015 | ||
DK | 28.10.2015 | ||
EE | 28.10.2015 | ||
FI | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LV | 28.10.2015 | ||
PL | 28.10.2015 | ||
RO | 28.10.2015 | ||
SK | 28.10.2015 | ||
GR | 29.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
PT | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 28.10.2015 | |
CZ | 28.10.2015 | ||
EE | 28.10.2015 | ||
FI | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LV | 28.10.2015 | ||
PL | 28.10.2015 | ||
RO | 28.10.2015 | ||
SK | 28.10.2015 | ||
GR | 29.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
PT | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 28.10.2015 | |
CZ | 28.10.2015 | ||
FI | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LV | 28.10.2015 | ||
PL | 28.10.2015 | ||
GR | 29.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
PT | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 28.10.2015 | |
FI | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LV | 28.10.2015 | ||
PL | 28.10.2015 | ||
GR | 29.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
PT | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 28.10.2015 | |
FI | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
PL | 28.10.2015 | ||
GR | 29.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
PT | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | LT | 28.10.2015 | |
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | LT | 28.10.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2005079200 (RATHENOW JORG [DE], et al) [X] 10-13 * page 2, paragraph 18 - paragraph 24 * * page 3, paragraphs 40,42,44 * * page 4, paragraph 51 * * page 8, paragraphs 99,100 *[A] 1-9,14,15 | International search | [Y]US5763504 (MATSUDA TAKEHISA [JP], et al); | [A]US6143354 (KOULIK EDOUARD [NL], et al); | [X]US2002188324 (BLINN STEPHEN M [US], et al); | [Y]US2003143315 (PUI DAVID Y H [US], et al); | [Y]US6676989 (KIRKPATRICK ALLEN R [US], et al); | [Y]US6746773 (LLANOS GERARD H [US], et al); | [Y]US2005043787 (KUTRYK MICHAEL JOHN BRADLEY [CA], et al); | [A]US2005244453 (STUCKE SEAN M [US], et al); | [Y]US6984404 (TALTON JAMES D [US], et al) |