EP1983865 - END PANEL FOR A PATIENT-SUPPORT APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.01.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.01.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.03.2016 [2016/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hill-Rom Services, Inc. 1069 State Route 46 East Batesville IN 47006 / US | [2012/47] |
Former [2008/44] | For all designated states Hill-Rom Services, Inc. 300 Delaware Avenue, Suite 530 Wilmington, DE 19801 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NEWKIRK, David, C. 1274 Skyview Circle Lawrenceburg, IN 47025 / US | 02 /
MEYER, Kenneth, W. 1257 State Road 229 Batesville, IN 47006 / US | 03 /
WILKER, John, B., Jr. 3340 S. CR 350 E. Dillsboro, Indiana 47018 / US | 04 /
HEIMBROCK, Richard, Henry 1041 Pine Knot Drive Cincinnati, OH 45238 / US | 05 /
WALKE, James, L. 26014 Arbor Lake Drive Batesville, IN 47006 / US | 06 /
ZERHUSEN, Robert, Mark 10186 Owl Creek Road Cincinnati, OH 45252 / US | 07 /
FRONDORF, Michael, M. 333 Farmington Drive Lakeside Park, KY 41017 / US | [2009/09] |
Former [2008/44] | 01 /
NEWKIRK, David, C. 1274 Skyview Circle Lawrenceburg, IN 47025 / US | ||
02 /
MEYER, Kenneth, W. 1257 State Road 229 Batesville, IN 47006 / US | |||
03 /
WILKER, John, B., Jr. 1418 Aaron Drive Shelbyville, IN 46176 / US | |||
04 /
HEIMBROCK, Richard, Henry 1041 Pine Knot Drive Cincinnati, OH 45238 / US | |||
05 /
WALKE, James, L. 26014 Arbor Lake Drive Batesville, IN 47006 / US | |||
06 /
ZERHUSEN, Robert, Mark 10186 Owl Creek Road Cincinnati, OH 45252 / US | |||
07 /
FRONDORF, Michael, M. 333 Farmington Drive Lakeside Park, KY 41017 / US | Representative(s) | Findlay, Alice Rosemary Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/13] | Findlay, Alice Rosemary Reddie & Grose LLP 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2008/44] | Findlay, Alice Rosemary Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 07763571.2 | 07.02.2007 | [2008/44] | WO2007US03311 | Priority number, date | US20060771318P | 08.02.2006 Original published format: US 771318 P | [2008/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007092526 | Date: | 16.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/33] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1983865 | Date: | 29.10.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.08.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1983865 | Date: | 25.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.06.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61G7/05, A47C21/08 | [2014/39] | CPC: |
A61G7/0503 (EP);
A61G7/0524 (EP,US);
A61G7/002 (EP);
A61G7/018 (EP);
A61G7/05 (US);
A61G7/0506 (EP);
A61G7/0507 (EP,US);
A61G7/051 (EP);
A61G7/0513 (EP);
A61G7/0519 (EP);
A47C21/08 (US);
A61G2203/723 (EP);
A61G7/015 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2010/10] | A61G7/018 | ||
Former IPC [2008/44] | A47C21/08 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2009/26] |
Former [2008/44] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ENDPLATTE FÜR PATIENTENAUFLAGEVORRICHTUNG | [2008/44] | English: | END PANEL FOR A PATIENT-SUPPORT APPARATUS | [2008/44] | French: | PANNEAU D'EXTRÉMITÉ DESTINÉ À UN APPAREIL SERVANT DE SUPPORT À UN PATIENT | [2008/44] | Entry into regional phase | 05.09.2008 | National basic fee paid | 05.09.2008 | Search fee paid | 05.09.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.09.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.08.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/44] | 03.02.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 14.04.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 13.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.01.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.01.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 21.01.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.01.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP12188561.0 / EP2556811 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.10.2010 | Opposition(s) | 05.01.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US3048857 (HUTT CLYDE B) [X] 1-2,6,10,14 * column 2, line 50 - column 4, line 39 * * figures 1-7 * [A] 8-9,11-12 [I] 3-5,7,13; | [A]US6289539 (ALPERN ERWIN A [US]) [A] 1,3,5,12-13 * column 2, line 66 - column 3, line 38 ** figures 1-8 * | International search | [A]US3967334 (RICKE MAURINE E, et al); | [A]US4030149 (KATO MIKIO); | [A]US4139917 (FENWICK LOEL); | [Y]US4409695 (JOHNSTON BRUCE L [US], et al); | [Y]US2002066142 (OSBORNE EUGENE E [US], et al); | [A]US2002095724 (HORNBACH DAVID W [US], et al); | [A]US6496993 (ALLEN E DAVID [US], et al); | [A]US2003093860 (KRAMER KENNETH L [US], et al); | [Y]US6851142 (STRYKER MARTIN [US], et al) | by applicant | US3048857 | US20060771318 |