EP2171269 - BOUNDARY LAYER WIND TURBINE WITH TANGENTIAL ROTOR BLADES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/14] | BOUNDARY LAYER WIND TURBINE WITH TANGETIAL ROTOR BLADES | ||
[2014/50] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.11.2015 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.12.2015 [2015/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nica, Horia 101 Avenue Lavoisier Laval, Québec H7N 3J3 / CA | [2010/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2010/14] | Representative(s) | Jaunez, Xavier, et al Cabinet Boettcher 16, rue Médéric 75017 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/14] | Jaunez, Xavier, et al Cabinet Boettcher, 22, rue du Général Foy 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 07763863.3 | 09.07.2007 | [2010/14] | WO2007CA01200 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009006721 | Date: | 15.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2171269 | Date: | 07.04.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.01.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 15.01.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.03.2014 | Classification | IPC: | F03D3/00, F03D3/06, F03D3/04 | [2014/18] | CPC: |
F03D3/005 (EP,KR,US);
F03D3/062 (EP,KR,US);
F03D3/0409 (EP,KR);
F03D3/0427 (US);
F03D3/061 (KR);
F03D9/25 (US);
F05B2240/213 (KR);
F05B2240/232 (EP,KR,US);
Y02E10/72 (EP,KR,US);
Y02E10/74 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2010/14] | F03D3/06, F03D11/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/14] | Title | German: | GRENZSCHICHTWINDTURBINE MIT TANGENTIALEN ROTORFLÜGELN | [2010/14] | English: | BOUNDARY LAYER WIND TURBINE WITH TANGENTIAL ROTOR BLADES | [2014/50] | French: | ÉOLIENNE À COUCHE LIMITE POURVUE D'AUBES TANGENTIELLES | [2010/14] |
Former [2010/14] | BOUNDARY LAYER WIND TURBINE WITH TANGETIAL ROTOR BLADES | Entry into regional phase | 04.01.2010 | National basic fee paid | 04.01.2010 | Search fee paid | 04.01.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.01.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.01.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/14] | 29.01.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.06.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/49] | 15.07.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2015/49] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.01.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2015 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2110766 (GLASS BENJAMIN GORDON) [A] 1-15 * page 1, line 89 - page 2, line 68; figure - *; | [A]US6210116 (KUCZAJ JOHN E [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]US1764052 (PFEIFER FERDINAND A) [A] 1-15 * page 1, line 71 - page 2, line 37 * * page 2, line 128 - page 3, line 51; figure - *; | [A]US1489930 (CLARY JAMES R) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [A]WO2006089425 (NICA NORIA [CA]); | [A]GB185939 (BUNJI HASHIMOTO, et al); | [A]US3994621 (BOGIE TOWNSEND); | [A]EP0867615 (SCHEMBRI ANDREW JOSEPH [AU], et al); | [A]US2006222483 (SEIFORD DONALD S SR [US]); | [A]US5391926 (STALEY FREDERICK J [US], et al); | [A]US6328527 (CONRAD WAYNE ERNEST [CA], et al); | [A]US4047834 (MAGOVENY GEORGE S, et al) |