|
13.10.2015 |
Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (opponent) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.10.2015 |
Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (proprietor) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.10.2015 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.09.2015 |
Refund of fees |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.09.2015 |
F3324 Closure of the appeal proceedings: withdrawal of the appeal/ application/ opposition |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.09.2015 |
F3324 Closure of the appeal proceedings: withdrawal of the appeal/ application/ opposition |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.09.2015 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.09.2015 |
Withdrawal of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.08.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.07.2015 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.07.2015 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.07.2015 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.07.2015 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.07.2015 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.07.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.07.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.07.2015 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.07.2015 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.07.2015 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.07.2015 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.06.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.05.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.05.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.05.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.05.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.05.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.05.2015 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
13.05.2015 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.05.2015 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.05.2015 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
13 |
|
13.05.2015 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.05.2015 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.05.2015 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.05.2015 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.05.2015 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.05.2015 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.05.2015 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
13.05.2015 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
23.04.2015 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.03.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.03.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
28.03.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
28.03.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
28.03.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
28.03.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
28.03.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
28.03.2015 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.03.2015 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.03.2015 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
28.03.2015 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
28.03.2015 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.03.2015 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
9 |
|
28.03.2015 |
Main request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
23.03.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
23.03.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
23.03.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
23.03.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
23.03.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
23.03.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
23.03.2015 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.03.2015 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.03.2015 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
23.03.2015 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.03.2015 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
23.03.2015 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
9 |
|
23.03.2015 |
Main request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
26.02.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.02.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.02.2015 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.02.2015 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.02.2015 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.02.2015 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.02.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.02.2015 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.02.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.01.2015 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.11.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.11.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.10.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.10.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.10.2014 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.10.2014 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.10.2014 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
29.10.2014 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
29.10.2014 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.10.2014 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.10.2014 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.10.2014 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.07.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.07.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.07.2014 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.07.2014 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
50 |
|
10.07.2014 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
28 |
|
10.07.2014 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
17 |
|
10.07.2014 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
13 |
|
26.11.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.11.2013 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.11.2013 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
14 |
|
22.11.2013 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
16 |
|
19.11.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.11.2013 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
16 |
|
06.09.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
06.09.2013 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.09.2013 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.09.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.09.2013 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.05.2013 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.05.2013 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.04.2013 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.04.2013 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
21 |
|
04.04.2013 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
04.04.2013 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
04.04.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
04.04.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
53 |
|
04.04.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.04.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
04.04.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
04.04.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
30 |
|
04.04.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
61 |
|
04.04.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
04.04.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
04.04.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
04.04.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
04.04.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
22 |
|
04.04.2013 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.07.2012 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.06.2012 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.06.2012 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.05.2012 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.05.2012 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.05.2012 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.03.2012 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.03.2012 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.03.2012 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.03.2012 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
27 |
|
27.01.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.01.2012 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.01.2012 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.01.2012 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.01.2012 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.10.2011 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.10.2011 |
Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.10.2011 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.07.2011 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.05.2011 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.03.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
31.03.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
31.03.2011 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.03.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.03.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.03.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.03.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.03.2011 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.03.2011 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
17.11.2010 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.11.2010 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.05.2010 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.04.2010 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.03.2010 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.03.2010 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.03.2010 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.03.2010 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.02.2010 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
22.01.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.01.2010 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.11.2009 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.01.2009 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.01.2009 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.01.2009 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
28 |
|
31.10.2007 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
21.08.2007 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
21.08.2007 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
21.08.2007 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
17 |
|
21.08.2007 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
6 |