EP2170213 - DENTAL IMPLANT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 09.10.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dentalpoint AG Hohlstrasse 614 8048 Zürich / CH | [2012/27] |
Former [2010/14] | For all designated states Dentalpoint Ag Hohlstrasse 614 8048 Zürich / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KÖNIG, Arno Susenbergstr. 86 8044 Zürich / CH | [2010/26] |
Former [2010/14] | 01 /
KÖNIG, Arno Florastrasse 14 CH-8800 Thalwil / CH | Representative(s) | Rentsch Partner AG Kirchenweg 8 Postfach 8034 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2012/16] | Rentsch Partner AG Assoc. No. 254 Fraumünsterstrasse 9 Postfach 9 P.O. Box 2441 8022 Zürich / CH | ||
Former [2010/14] | Rentsch & Partner Rechtsanwälte und Patentanwälte Fraumünsterstrasse 9 Postfach 2441 8022 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 07763946.6 | 16.07.2007 | [2010/14] | WO2007CH00343 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009009911 | Date: | 22.01.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2170213 | Date: | 07.04.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.01.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2170213 | Date: | 04.07.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61C8/00 | [2010/14] | CPC: |
A61C8/005 (EP,US);
A61C8/006 (EP,US);
A61C8/0018 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/14] | Title | German: | ZAHNIMPLANTAT | [2010/14] | English: | DENTAL IMPLANT | [2010/14] | French: | IMPLANT DENTAIRE | [2010/14] | Entry into regional phase | 22.01.2010 | National basic fee paid | 22.01.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.01.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/14] | 17.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.01.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.05.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 19.05.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.11.2010 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
04.04.2013
ADMISSIBLE Nobel Biocare AB Västra Hamngatan 1 402 26 Göteborg / SE Opponent's representative Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/20] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
04.04.2013
ADMISSIBLE Nobel Biocare AB Västra Hamngatan 1 402 26 Göteborg / SE Opponent's representative HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | 10.05.2013 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 19.11.2013 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 23.04.2015 | Date of oral proceedings | 13.05.2015 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 13.05.2015 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 11.09.2015 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2015/46] | Appeal following opposition | 16.07.2015 | Appeal received No. T1451/15 | 11.09.2015 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 16.02.2010 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   14.04.2010 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.07.2007 | CH | 04.07.2012 | CY | 04.07.2012 | CZ | 04.07.2012 | DK | 04.07.2012 | EE | 04.07.2012 | FI | 04.07.2012 | LI | 04.07.2012 | LT | 04.07.2012 | LV | 04.07.2012 | MT | 04.07.2012 | NL | 04.07.2012 | PL | 04.07.2012 | RO | 04.07.2012 | SE | 04.07.2012 | SI | 04.07.2012 | SK | 04.07.2012 | IE | 16.07.2012 | LU | 16.07.2012 | BE | 31.07.2012 | MC | 31.07.2012 | BG | 04.10.2012 | GR | 05.10.2012 | IS | 04.11.2012 | PT | 05.11.2012 | IT | 16.07.2015 | ES | 17.07.2015 | [2020/33] |
Former [2016/21] | HU | 16.07.2007 | |
CH | 04.07.2012 | ||
CY | 04.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2012 | ||
DK | 04.07.2012 | ||
EE | 04.07.2012 | ||
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
LI | 04.07.2012 | ||
LT | 04.07.2012 | ||
LV | 04.07.2012 | ||
MT | 04.07.2012 | ||
NL | 04.07.2012 | ||
PL | 04.07.2012 | ||
RO | 04.07.2012 | ||
SE | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
SK | 04.07.2012 | ||
IE | 16.07.2012 | ||
LU | 16.07.2012 | ||
BE | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
BG | 04.10.2012 | ||
GR | 05.10.2012 | ||
IS | 04.11.2012 | ||
PT | 05.11.2012 | ||
IT | 16.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/06] | HU | 16.07.2007 | |
CH | 04.07.2012 | ||
CY | 04.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2012 | ||
DK | 04.07.2012 | ||
EE | 04.07.2012 | ||
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
LI | 04.07.2012 | ||
LT | 04.07.2012 | ||
LV | 04.07.2012 | ||
MT | 04.07.2012 | ||
NL | 04.07.2012 | ||
PL | 04.07.2012 | ||
RO | 04.07.2012 | ||
SE | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
SK | 04.07.2012 | ||
IE | 16.07.2012 | ||
LU | 16.07.2012 | ||
BE | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
BG | 04.10.2012 | ||
GR | 05.10.2012 | ||
IS | 04.11.2012 | ||
PT | 05.11.2012 | ||
Former [2014/34] | HU | 16.07.2007 | |
CY | 04.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2012 | ||
DK | 04.07.2012 | ||
EE | 04.07.2012 | ||
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
LT | 04.07.2012 | ||
LV | 04.07.2012 | ||
MT | 04.07.2012 | ||
NL | 04.07.2012 | ||
PL | 04.07.2012 | ||
RO | 04.07.2012 | ||
SE | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
SK | 04.07.2012 | ||
IE | 16.07.2012 | ||
LU | 16.07.2012 | ||
BE | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
BG | 04.10.2012 | ||
GR | 05.10.2012 | ||
IS | 04.11.2012 | ||
PT | 05.11.2012 | ||
Former [2014/27] | CY | 04.07.2012 | |
CZ | 04.07.2012 | ||
DK | 04.07.2012 | ||
EE | 04.07.2012 | ||
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
LT | 04.07.2012 | ||
LV | 04.07.2012 | ||
MT | 04.07.2012 | ||
NL | 04.07.2012 | ||
PL | 04.07.2012 | ||
RO | 04.07.2012 | ||
SE | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
SK | 04.07.2012 | ||
IE | 16.07.2012 | ||
LU | 16.07.2012 | ||
BE | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
BG | 04.10.2012 | ||
GR | 05.10.2012 | ||
IS | 04.11.2012 | ||
PT | 05.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | CY | 04.07.2012 | |
CZ | 04.07.2012 | ||
DK | 04.07.2012 | ||
EE | 04.07.2012 | ||
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
LT | 04.07.2012 | ||
LV | 04.07.2012 | ||
MT | 04.07.2012 | ||
NL | 04.07.2012 | ||
PL | 04.07.2012 | ||
RO | 04.07.2012 | ||
SE | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
SK | 04.07.2012 | ||
IE | 16.07.2012 | ||
BE | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
BG | 04.10.2012 | ||
GR | 05.10.2012 | ||
IS | 04.11.2012 | ||
PT | 05.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | CY | 04.07.2012 | |
CZ | 04.07.2012 | ||
DK | 04.07.2012 | ||
EE | 04.07.2012 | ||
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
LT | 04.07.2012 | ||
LV | 04.07.2012 | ||
NL | 04.07.2012 | ||
PL | 04.07.2012 | ||
RO | 04.07.2012 | ||
SE | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
SK | 04.07.2012 | ||
IE | 16.07.2012 | ||
BE | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
GR | 05.10.2012 | ||
IS | 04.11.2012 | ||
PT | 05.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/15] | CY | 04.07.2012 | |
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
LT | 04.07.2012 | ||
LV | 04.07.2012 | ||
NL | 04.07.2012 | ||
PL | 04.07.2012 | ||
SE | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
GR | 05.10.2012 | ||
IS | 04.11.2012 | ||
PT | 05.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | CY | 04.07.2012 | |
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
LT | 04.07.2012 | ||
LV | 04.07.2012 | ||
PL | 04.07.2012 | ||
SE | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
GR | 05.10.2012 | ||
IS | 04.11.2012 | ||
PT | 05.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | CY | 04.07.2012 | |
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
LT | 04.07.2012 | ||
LV | 04.07.2012 | ||
PL | 04.07.2012 | ||
SE | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
GR | 05.10.2012 | ||
IS | 04.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | CY | 04.07.2012 | |
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
LT | 04.07.2012 | ||
LV | 04.07.2012 | ||
PL | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
GR | 05.10.2012 | ||
IS | 04.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CY | 04.07.2012 | |
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
LT | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
IS | 04.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | FI | 04.07.2012 | |
LT | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | LT | 04.07.2012 | |
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | SI | 04.07.2012 | Cited in | International search | [X]DE102005032938 (BRASSELER GMBH & CO KG GEB [DE]) [X] 1-11 * paragraphs [0008] , [0023] - [0026]; figures 3,4 *; | [X]DE19633570 (IMZ FERTIGUNG VERTRIEB [DE]) [X] 1-3,6 * column 4, lines 34-46; figures 1,2 *; | [X]US2002031748 (CRUDO VINCENZO [IT]) [X] 1-6,11 * figures 1-4 *; | [X]EP1792580 (ZITERION GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-9,11 * paragraphs [0034] , [0078] , [0082] , [0083]; figures 2,4 *; | [X]DE19534979 (IMZ FERTIGUNG VERTRIEB [DE]) [X] 1-5,11 * column 3, line 43 - column 4, line 5; figures 1-5 * | by applicant | DE102005032938 |