EP2049327 - METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF PACKAGING BAGS HAVING A REINFORCED BASE REGION AND DEVICE FOR CARRYING OUT THE METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.12.2013 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.12.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.01.2014 [2014/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Water-Line SA Postfach 149 6805 Mezzovico / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2009/17] | For all designated states Water-Line S.A. Postfach 149 6805 Mezzovico / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COLLA, Tiziano Via dra Caveta 21 CH-6967 Dino / CH | [2009/17] | Representative(s) | Liebetanz, Michael Isler & Pedrazzini AG Giesshübelstrasse 45 Postfach 1772 8027 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2009/17] | Liebetanz, Michael Isler & Pedrazzini AG Gotthardstrasse 53 Postfach 1772 8027 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 07763957.3 | 20.07.2007 | [2009/17] | WO2007CH00357 | Priority number, date | CH20060001225 | 27.07.2006 Original published format: CH 12252006 | [2009/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008011740 | Date: | 31.01.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2049327 | Date: | 22.04.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.01.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B31B19/62, B31B23/00, B31B19/52 | [2009/17] | CPC: |
B31B70/00 (EP,US);
B31B70/62 (EP,US);
B31B2160/10 (EP,US);
B31B2160/102 (EP,US);
B31B70/008 (EP,US);
B31B70/261 (EP,US);
B31B70/52 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/17] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN VON VERPACKUNGSBEUTELN MIT VERSTÄRKTEM BODENBEREICH SOWIE VORRICHTUNG ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG DES VERFAHRENS | [2009/17] | English: | METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF PACKAGING BAGS HAVING A REINFORCED BASE REGION AND DEVICE FOR CARRYING OUT THE METHOD | [2009/17] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE SACHETS D'EMBALLAGE AVEC UNE ZONE DE FOND RENFORCÉE AINSI QUE DISPOSITIF DE RÉALISATION DU PROCÉDÉ | [2009/17] | Entry into regional phase | 20.02.2009 | National basic fee paid | 20.02.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.02.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/17] | 14.04.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 01.06.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.01.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 13.08.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/04] | 16.09.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/04] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.08.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2011 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   30.01.2012 | 31.07.2012 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   30.01.2013 | 31.07.2013 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]LU29171 (STEFFEN HAMMER) [X] 1-3,14,17,30 * the whole document * [Y] 5-13,19,28; | [Y]DE4241176 (FOCKE & CO [DE]) [Y] 9,10,12,19,28 * column 1, lines 28-36 * * column 1, lines 49-57 * * column 4, lines 56-64 * * column 5, lines 9,10; figure - *; | [Y]GB1325802 (A C I OPERATIONS) [Y] 5-7 * page 2, lines 75-106 *; | [AY]GB2002264 (NORDSON CORP) [A] 1-31 * page 3, lines 83-130 * * page 5, lines 65-80; figure - * [Y] 8,11,13; | [A]US5503477 (SCHLOUGH DEBRA [US]) [A] 1-31 * column 4, lines 25-33; figure 1 *; | [A]US4099666 (WELLES THEODORE W) [A] 1-31 * column 4, lines 32-38; figure 5 *; | [A]EP0920919 (FOCKE & CO [DE]) [A] 1-31 * paragraphs [0026] , [0027]; figure - *; | [A]FR1015015 (E S & A ROBINSON) [A] 1-31 * the whole document * |